This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/21/2021 at 11:25:21 (UTC).

Ahern Rentals Inc v. Helmstetler et al

Case Summary

On 04/22/2021 Ahern Rentals Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Helmstetler. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Beth Phillips. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04089

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beth Phillips

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ahern Rentals Inc

Defendants

EquipmentShare.com Inc

Timothy J Helmstetler

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert L Craig, Jr

Attorney at Craig Terrill Hale & Grantham

Po Box 1979

Lubbock, TX 79408-1979

Robert (Bob) Craig

Attorney at Craig, Terrill, Hale & Grantham, LLP

Suite 201, 9816 Slide Rd

Lubbock, TX 79424

Defendant Attorneys

Allen Said Al-Haj

Attorney at Baker McKenzie

1900 North Pearl Street

Dallas, TX 75201

Mark David Taylor

Attorney at Baker & McKenzie LLP

1900 North Pearl St., Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

Meghan Elizabeth Hausler

Attorney at Baker McKenzie LLP

1900 North Pearl St., Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

Fernando M. Bustos

Attorney at Bustos Law Firm, P.C.

P.O. Box 1980

Lubbock, TX 79408-1980

 

Court Documents

14 #1

*Restricted*

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

9 #1

Exhibit(s) A - Notice of Potential Tag-Along

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

1 #8

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #7

Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit(s) D - Certificate of Interested Persons

1 #5

Exhibit(s) C-2 - Civil/Criminal Process Request re T. Helmstetler

#1

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 6/2/2021 as Document No. 15, certificate of service. MDL notification: The document was deleted pursuant to the Case Management Order 1 (doc 3) in 20-md-2945. (Warren, Melissa) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docket(#15) This document has been deleted. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES of Plaintiff Ahern Rentals, Inc. filed by Robert (Bob) Craig on behalf of Plaintiff Ahern Rentals Inc.(Attorney Robert (Bob) Craig added to party Ahern Rentals Inc(pty:pla))(Craig, Robert (Bob)) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 1:21-cv-00061. (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-7): The JPML has issued the attached order in MDL 2945, and that order has now been filed in the Western District of Missouri. (jak) [Transferred from txnd on 4/22/2021.] (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Timothy J Helmstetler. (Bustos, Fernando) [Transferred from txnd on 4/22/2021.] (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Timothy J Helmstetler. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Fernando M Bustos added to party Timothy J Helmstetler(pty:dft) (Bustos, Fernando) [Transferred from txnd on 4/22/2021.] (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER. The Court enters this Order to promote possible early settlement and to facilitate entry of a scheduling order. Lead counsel for each party and any unrepresented party shall confer at a scheduling conference as soon as practicable, but no later than April 23, 2021. As a result of the scheduling conference, counsel shall prepare and submit a Joint Report Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order. The Joint Report shall also include a status report on settlement negotiations but shall not disclose settlement figures. The Joint Report, which shall be filed on or before May 7, 2021, shall include the items listed herein in separate numbered paragraphs, but not in a proposed-order format. The parties are warned that failing to comply with any part of this order may result in the imposition of sanctions. See Order for further details and information. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 4/9/2021) (jak) [Transferred from txnd on 4/22/2021.] (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Filing with the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by EquipmentShare.com Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Notice of Potential Tag-Along) (Hausler, Meghan) [Transferred from txnd on 4/22/2021.] (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint filed by EquipmentShare.com Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Hausler, Meghan) [Transferred from txnd on 4/22/2021.] (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed. (Craig, Robert) [Transferred from txnd on 4/22/2021.] (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Timothy J Helmstetler. (jak) [Transferred from txnd on 4/22/2021.] (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to issue summons filed by Ahern Rentals Inc. (Craig, Robert) (Main Document 5 replaced on 3/25/2021) (jak). [Transferred from txnd on 4/22/2021.] (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Exhibit D to #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant EquipmentShare.com Inc. (Hausler, Meghan) Modified on 3/19/2021 - document refiled as a 'flattened' PDF document (jak). [Transferred from txnd on 4/22/2021.] (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Related Case filed by EquipmentShare.com Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Conditional Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit(s) B- Notice of Transfer and Request to Transfer Case) (Hausler, Meghan) [Transferred from txnd on 4/22/2021.] (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) **Disregard-previously filed as Exhibit D at docket entry #1 ** CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by EquipmentShare.com Inc. (Hausler, Meghan) Modified on 3/19/2021 (jak). [Transferred from txnd on 4/22/2021.] (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by EquipmentShare.com Inc. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-11710185) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Original Petition, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Docket, #3 Exhibit(s) C - Index of State Court Documents, #4 Exhibit(s) C-1 - Original Petition, #5 Exhibit(s) C-2 - Civil/Criminal Process Request re T. Helmstetler, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Certificate of Interested Persons, #7 Cover Sheet, #8 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Hausler, Meghan) [Transferred from txnd on 4/22/2021.] (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Equipmentshare.com, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where AHERN RENTALS INC. (DOE 2) is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark D. Taylor

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meghan Elizabeth Hausler