This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/10/2020 at 08:40:09 (UTC).

Ahern Rentals, Inc. v. Eure et al

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 Ahern Rentals, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Eure. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brenda Weksler and Jennifer A. Dorsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01680

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Brenda Weksler

Presiding Judge

Jennifer A. Dorsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ahern Rentals, Inc.

Defendants

Samuel Eure

Action Equipment doing business as Action Rentals VPC, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Karyn M Taylor

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

200 S. Virginia Street 8Th Floor

Reno, NV 89501-1944

Patrick H. Hicks

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, PC

3960 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89109

Defendant Attorney

Rob L. Phillips

Attorney at FisherBroyles, LLP

5670 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 1800

Los Angeles, CA 90036

 

Court Documents

#28

#27

#26

RESTRICTED

#24

23 #7

Exhibit Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss

23 #6

Exhibit Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Alt

23 #2

Exhibit Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction

23 #1

Index

#23

4 #9

Exhibit 8

4 #8

Exhibit 7

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

99 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Ahern Rentals, Inc.. (Taylor, Karyn) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint, filed by Samuel Eure. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/19/2020.(Phillips, Rob) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 25 Motion Hearing held on 10/16/2020 before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. Court Reporter: Amber McClane, AM@nvd.uscourts.gov. Any Redaction Request is due by 11/23/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 12/3/2020. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 1/31/2021. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter. The Transcript Order Form is available on the court website. After that date, the transcript may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (AMM) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 10/16/2020 before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. Crtrm Administrator: Danielle Cacciabaudo; Pla Counsel: Patrick Hicks, Karyn Taylor (telephonic); Def Counsel: Rob Phillips; Court Reporter: Amber McClane; Time of Hearing: 10:15 a.m. - 11:18 a.m.; Courtroom: 6D;The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears representations of counsel on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction #7 and the Motion to Dismiss #9 . As stated on the record, the motion to dismiss, or, alternatively, to transfer venue #9 is granted in part. The motion for preliminary injunction #7 is granted in part.A written order converting the temporary restraining order into a preliminary injunction will be entered but the transcript of this proceeding will be the Court's ruling in all other respects. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER Granting in Part #7 Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Joint STATUS REPORT Concerning Removal by Plaintiff Ahern Rentals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Exhibit Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Exhibit Reply to Response to Motion for Prelimiinary Injunction, #5 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss, #6 Exhibit Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively Transfer Venue, #7 Exhibit Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss) (Taylor, Karyn) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • Docket(#22) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/7/2020. By Deputy Clerk: Danielle Cacciabaudo. Based on counsel's request and good cause appearing, out-of-state counsel may appear by telephone for this hearing. Local counsel must appear in person. Anyone who is appearing by phone is instructed to call 888-808-6929, enter the access code 2178469, and remain on the line until the Courtroom Administrator joins the call. The parties must join the call at least 5 minutes prior to the start of the scheduled hearing. The use of a cell phone or speaker phone during the call is strongly discouraged. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) REPLY to Response to #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Plaintiff Ahern Rentals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit Non-Compete, Non-Solicitation, and Non-Disclosure Agreement, #3 Exhibit Second Declaration of Marshall Samuelson, #4 Exhibit Ahern Academy Code of Conduct, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Bob Cuff, #6 Exhibit Declaration of Todd Meeks, #7 Exhibit Declaration of Derrick Sparks, #8 Exhibit Reminder of Obligations Letter, #9 Exhibit Cease and Desist Letter to Samuel Eure, #10 Exhibit Cease and Desist Letter to Action) (Taylor, Karyn) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) REPLY to Response to #9 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Action Equipment. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Phillips, Rob) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RESPONSE to #9 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Ahern Rentals, Inc.. Replies due by 10/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Index Index, #2 Exhibit Non-Compete Agreement, #3 Exhibit 2016 Onboarding Agreement, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Marshall Samuelson, #5 Exhibit Eure's Emergency Contact Information, #6 Exhibit Acquisition of Bryant, Ventures, LLC dba Action Rental, #7 Exhibit Ahern Academy Code of Conduct, #8 Exhibit Action News) (Taylor, Karyn) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss #4 Amended Complaint, by Defendant Action Equipment. Responses due by 10/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration) (Phillips, Rob) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Emergency MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Plaintiff Ahern Rentals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6) (Taylor, Karyn) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Ahern Rentals, Inc.. Responses due by 10/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Index Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13) (Taylor, Karyn) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Ahern Rentals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13) (Taylor, Karyn) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ahern Rentals, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Taylor, Karyn) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Ahern Rentals, Inc.. No changes to parties. (Attachments: #1 Index Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10) (Taylor, Karyn) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Action Equipment. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Phillips, Rob) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/11/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/26/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (MR) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court Clark County, Case Number A-20-820158-B, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6165954) by Action Equipment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Phillips, Rob) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AHERN RENTALS INC. (DOE 2) is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rob L. Phillips