This case was last updated from PACER on 08/14/2020 at 08:04:48 (UTC).

Ahern Rentals, Inc. v. Equipmentshare.com, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/13/2020 Ahern Rentals, Inc filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Equipmentshare com, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Beth Phillips. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-04143

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beth Phillips

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ahern Rentals, Inc.

Defendant

Equipmentshare.com, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin M Sutehall

Attorney at Fox Rothschild, LLP

1980 Festival Plaza Drive, Suite 700

Las Vegas, NV 89135

Lucy Clara Crow

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

1980 Festival Plaza Drive, Suite 700

Las Vegas, NV 89135

Mark J. Connot

Attorney at Fox Rothschild, LLP

1980 Festival Plaza Drive, Suite 700

Las Vegas, NV 89135

Defendant Attorneys

Colton Long

Attorney at Baker McKenzie

300 East Randolph Street

Chicago, IL 60601

Emily Anne Ellis

Attorney at Brownstein Hyatt Farber Shreck

100 North City Pkwy., Ste. 1600

Las Vegas, NV 89106

Mitchell J. Langberg

Attorney at Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP

100 City Parkway, Suite 1200

Las Vegas, NV 89106

Michael E. Brewer

Attorney at Baker & McKenzie LLP

Two Embarcadero Center, 11Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Mark D. Taylor

Attorney at Baker & McKenzie LLP

1900 North Pearl St., Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

50 #1

Attachment Non-Public Docket Sheet

#50

(#50) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Nevada; Case Number 2:19-cv-02138. (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#49

(#49) CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to the Western District of Missouri. Signed by MDL on 8/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 08/12/2020)

48 #1

MDL Minute Order

#48

(#48) MDL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to the Western District of Missouri. Signed by MDL on 8/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 MDL Minute Order) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 08/07/2020)

43 #8

Supplement 7

43 #7

Exhibit 6

#43

(#43) MOTION to Shorten Time re #42 Motion to Stay Case, by Defendant Equipmentshare.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Colton D. Long, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Supplement 7) (Ellis, Emily) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 06/30/2020)

42 #8

Exhibit 7

#9

(#9) ORDER Granting #8 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint,. Equipmentshare.com, Inc. answer due 2/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#8

(#9) ORDER Granting #8 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint,. Equipmentshare.com, Inc. answer due 2/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ahern Rentals, Inc. re #1 Complaint,. Equipmentshare.com, Inc. served on 12/16/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (Connot, Mark) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#5

(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #5 Affidavit. Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c). The wrong event was selected. The title of the docket entry does not match the title of the document. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. #5 using the appropriate docket entry title, "Summons Returned Executed". (no image attached) (EDS) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#4

(#5) ERROR: Incorrect event selected. Counsel advised to refile.AFFIDAVIT of Service re #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Issued by Plaintiff Ahern Rentals, Inc. (Connot, Mark) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#3

(#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Ahern Rentals, Inc.. (Connot, Mark) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ahern Rentals, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Don F Ahern for Ahern Rentals, Inc. added. (Connot, Mark) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 12/13/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#9) ORDER Granting #8 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint,. Equipmentshare.com, Inc. answer due 2/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 01/06/2020)

99 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Nevada; Case Number 2:19-cv-02138. (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to the Western District of Missouri. Signed by MDL on 8/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) MDL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to the Western District of Missouri. Signed by MDL on 8/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 MDL Minute Order) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that EquipmentShare's motion to stay this case #42 is GRANTED. This action is STAYED for all purposes pending the U.S. Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's decision on the motion to transfer in In re Ahern Rentals, Inc. "Trade Secret" Litigation, No. 2945. The parties must submit a status report within ten days of the Panel's decision, and any party may move to lift this stay once the Panel issues its decision. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that EquipmentShare's motion to shorten the time for determining its motion to stay #43 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/29/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) REPLY to Response to #42 Motion to Stay Case, by Defendant Equipmentshare.com, Inc.. (Ellis, Emily) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) DECLARATION of Mark J. Connot re #44 Response by Plaintiff Ahern Rentals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Connot, Mark) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) RESPONSE to #43 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, #42 Motion to Stay Case, by Plaintiff Ahern Rentals, Inc.. Replies due by 7/21/2020. (Connot, Mark) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) MOTION to Shorten Time re #42 Motion to Stay Case, by Defendant Equipmentshare.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Colton D. Long, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Supplement 7) (Ellis, Emily) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) MOTION to Stay Case by Defendant Equipmentshare.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Colton D. Long, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7) (Ellis, Emily) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) ORDER granting #36 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Colton Long for Equipmentshare.com, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Mitchell J. Langberg. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/28/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Granting #8 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint,. Equipmentshare.com, Inc. answer due 2/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) To Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Equipmentshare.com, Inc.. (Langberg, Mitchell) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ahern Rentals, Inc. re #1 Complaint,. Equipmentshare.com, Inc. served on 12/16/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (Connot, Mark) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #5 Affidavit. Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c). The wrong event was selected. The title of the docket entry does not match the title of the document. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. #5 using the appropriate docket entry title, "Summons Returned Executed". (no image attached) (EDS) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ERROR: Incorrect event selected. Counsel advised to refile.AFFIDAVIT of Service re #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Issued by Plaintiff Ahern Rentals, Inc. (Connot, Mark) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Equipmentshare.com, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (JQC) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JQC) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Ahern Rentals, Inc.. (Connot, Mark) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ahern Rentals, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Don F Ahern for Ahern Rentals, Inc. added. (Connot, Mark) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Equipmentshare.com, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5810426) by Ahern Rentals, Inc.. Proof of service due by 3/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Connot, Mark) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less