This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/10/2021 at 08:17:03 (UTC).

Ahern Rentals, Inc. v. Bilodeau

Case Summary

On 08/11/2021 Ahern Rentals, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Bilodeau. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jennifer A. Dorsey and Elayna J. Youchah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01503

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jennifer A. Dorsey

Referral Judge

Elayna J. Youchah

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ahern Rentals, Inc.

Defendant

Kaela Bilodeau

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amy L Thompson

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

3960 Howard Hughes Parkwaysuite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Charles H. Wilson

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

1301 Mckinney Streetsuite 1900

Houston, TX 77010

Defendant Attorneys

Leah A. Martin

Attorney at Leah Martin Law

601 S. Rancho Drivesuite C-26

Las Vegas, NV 89106

Kevin J. Hejmanowski

Attorney at Anderson, McPharlin & Conners LLP

601 S. Seventh Street

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Gregg M. Rosenberg

Attorney at Rosenberg & Associates

3518 Travis Streetsuite 200

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

41 #1

Index Exhibit Index

#41

11 #6

Exhibit 5

11 #5

Exhibit 4

11 #4

Exhibit 3

11 #3

Exhibit 2

11 #2

Exhibit 1

11 #1

Exhibit Index

#11

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Exhibit Summons to Kaela Bilodeau

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

83 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held via videoconference on 10/6/2021 before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. Crtrm Administrator: Danielle Cacciabaudo; Pla Counsel: Charles Wilson, Amy Thompson; Def Counsel: Gregg Rosenberg; Court Reporter: Amber McClane; Time of Hearing: 11:00 a.m. - 11:45 a.m.; Courtroom: 6D;The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears representations of counsel. As stated on the record, the Motion for Preliminary Injunction #11 is DENIED without prejudice. Court adjourns.The minutes of this proceeding and the transcript will serve as the Court's official ruling. No separate written order will be issued. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) NOTICE OF FILING OF DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT, by Ahern Rentals, Inc. re 32 Minute Order. (Attachments: #1 Index Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A) (Thompson, Amy) . (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE of Filing Exhibits, by Kaela Bilodeau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Rosenberg, Gregg) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) REPLY to Response to #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Plaintiff Ahern Rentals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1) (Thompson, Amy) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ORDER granting #36 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/21/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) RESPONSE to #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Defendant Kaela Bilodeau. Replies due by 9/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant's Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Defendant's Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Defendant's Exhibit C) (Rosenberg, Gregg) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Revised Unopposed STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #11 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, by Defendant Kaela Bilodeau. (Rosenberg, Gregg) Modified on 9/17/2021 to link document pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) (SLD). (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/16/2021. Re #34 Stipulation and Order for Extension of Time. The parties have stipulated to extend the deadline "to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Injunction." #34 . LR IA 6-1 requires the parties to "state the reasons for the extension requested." This stipulation lacks this information. Accordingly, the stipulation #34 is DENIED without prejudice to the filing of a new stipulation that complies with the rules of this court and explains the reason that the extension is needed so that the court can determine if good cause exists to approve the stipulation. The parties are also cautioned that the only motion pending at this time is one for a "Preliminary" injunction #11 , not for a "Temporary" injunction. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAD) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Unopposed STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Defendant Kaela Bilodeau. (Rosenberg, Gregg) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removed Action by Plaintiff Ahern Rentals, Inc.. (Thompson, Amy) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 8/13/2021 Re: #2 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a ruling on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and Designation of Local Counsel #2 is DEFERRED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner, Gregg M. Rosenberg, shall provide a current Certificate of Good Standing from EACH state in which Petitioner has been admitted to practice law, in accordance with the instruction set forth on Page 2, No. 3, of the Verified Petition.Petitioner shall have 14 days from the entry of this order to file the corrected Verified Petition using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event. Failure to timely remedy this deficiency will result in the denial of the Verified Petition, and Petitioner will be required to refile and to repay the filing fee. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #5 , #6 , #7 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b) by attorneys Leah Martin and Kevin Hejmanowski. Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. Do not refile document. (no image attached) (SLD) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Kaela Bilodeau. (Martin, Leah) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Kaela Bilodeau. (Martin, Leah) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 4:21-cv-02209 by Defendant Kaela Bilodeau. DEFENDANTS NOTICE RELATED CASE (Martin, Leah) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Charles Wilson and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Amy L. Thompson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6593830) by Plaintiff Ahern Rentals, Inc.. (Thompson, Amy) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 8/12/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/27/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/11/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (HAM) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) View #17 corrected image re First MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Gregg M. Rosenberg and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Kevin Hejmanowski (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6592325) by Defendant Kaela Bilodeau. (Martin, Leah) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) First PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-21-838791-B, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6592221) by Kaela Bilodeau. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint for Damages And Injunctive Relief, #3 Exhibit Summons to Kaela Bilodeau) (Martin, Leah) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AHERN RENTALS INC. (DOE 2) is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leah A. Martin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregg M. Rosenberg