This case was last updated from PACER on 08/03/2019 at 07:44:23 (UTC).

Ahders v. SEI Private Trust Company et al

Case Summary

On 06/04/2019 Ahders filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against SEI Private Trust Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Erin Wilder-Doomes and Brian A. Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00353

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

Presiding Judge

Brian A. Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert C Ahders

Defendants

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London

Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc.

Indian Harbor Insurance Company

Continental Casualty Company

Arch Insurance Company

Nutmeg Insurance Company

SEI Investments Company

SEI Private Trust Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bevan Wrynn Sabo

Attorney at Ezell Law Firm, LLC

10761 Perkins Road, Suite A

Baton Rouge, LA 70810

Defendant Attorneys

Stefan Roane Dandelles

Attorney at Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck, LLP

55 E. Monroe Street, Suite 2950

Chicago, IL 60603

Stefan R Dandelles

Attorney at Kaufman Dolowich Voluck

135 South Lasalle Street, Suite 2100

Chicago, IL 60603

Judy Y. Barrasso

Attorney at Barrasso Usdin Kupperman Freeman & Sarver LLC - NO

909 Poydras Street, 24Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70112

Michael A Balascio

Attorney at Barrasso Usdin Kupperman Freeman & Sarver LLC

909 Poydras Street, 24Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70112

Michael Anthony Balascio

Attorney at Barrasso Usdin Kupperman Freeman & Sarver, LLC

909 Poydras Street, Suite 2400

New Orleans, LA 70112

Daniel J Standish

Attorney at Wiley Rein LLP

1776 K Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Robert E. Torian

Attorney at NeunerPate

P. O. Drawer 52828

Lafayette, LA 70505

James Pate

Attorney at NeunerPate

1001 W Pinhook Road, Suite 200

Lafayette, LA 70503

James L. Pate

Attorney at NeunerPate

1001 West Pinhook Road, Suite 200

Lafayette, LA 70503

John W. Arnold

901 Main Street, Suite 6550

Dallas, TX 75202

Daniel B. Centner

Attorney at Lugenbuhl, Wheaton, Peck, Rankin & Hubbard

601 Poydras Street, Suite 2775

New Orleans, LA 70130

Seth A. Schmeeckle

Attorney at Lugenbuhl, Wheaton, Peck, Rankin & Hubbard

601 Poydras Street, Suite 2775

New Orleans, LA 70130

J. Gordon Cooney, Jr.

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

1701 Market St.

Philadelphia, PA 19103-2921

Elizabeth Hoop Fay

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius, LLP

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103-2921

 

Court Documents

#90

(#90) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brian A. Jackson for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick and Judge Brian A. Jackson on 6/17/2019. (SWE) Modified on 6/17/2019 to edit text (SWE). (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#89

(#89) Letter to Attorney John W Arnold regarding David Crowe who is Co-Counsel for party Arch Insurance Company. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (NLT) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#88

(#88) Letter to Attorney John W Arnold who is lead counsel for party Arch Insurance Company. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (NLT) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#87

(#87) Letter to Attorney Judy Barrasso regarding Diana Cochrane who is Co-Counsel for party Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.). Inc.. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (NLT) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#86

(#86) Letter to Attorney Parker Lavin regarding Daniel Standish who is Co-Counsel for party Indian Harbor Insurance Company. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (NLT) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#85

(#85) Letter to Attorney Parker Lavin who is lead counsel for party Indian Harbor Insurance Company. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (NLT) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#84

(#84) Letter to Attorney Stefan Dandelles who is lead counsel for party Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (NLT) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#83

(#83) Letter to Attorney Bevan Sabo regarding Michael Stanley who is Co-Counsel for Robert C Ahders. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (NLT) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#82

(#82) Letter to Attorney J Gordon Cooney, Jr. regarding Ryan McCarthy who is Co-Counsel for SEI Private Trust Company and SEI Investments Company. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (NLT) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#7

(#7) Summons Submitted (Ezell, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/6/2017.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.] (Entered: 12/15/2016)

#6

(#6) Summons Submitted (Ezell, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/6/2017.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.] (Entered: 12/15/2016)

#5

(#5) Summons Submitted (Ezell, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/6/2017.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.] (Entered: 12/15/2016)

#4

(#4) Summons Submitted (Ezell, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/6/2017.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.] (Entered: 12/15/2016)

#3

(#3) Summons Submitted (Ezell, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/6/2017.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.] (Entered: 12/15/2016)

#2

(#2) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/26/2017 at 03:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 1/12/2017.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/5/2016. (SGO) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/6/2017.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.] (Entered: 12/05/2016)

1 #2

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Attachment Appendix

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc., Arch Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Continental Casualty Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Nutmeg Insurance Company, SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053N-1498722.), filed by Robert C Ahders. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Appendix, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Ezell, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/6/2017.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.] (Entered: 12/01/2016)

113 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2019
  • Cases Associated:Create association to 3:16-cv-00801-BAJ-EWD. This case is consolidated with Lead Case 16-801. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE) Modified on 6/21/2019 to edit the text (SWE). (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#90) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brian A. Jackson for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick and Judge Brian A. Jackson on 6/17/2019. (SWE) Modified on 6/17/2019 to edit text (SWE). (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#89) Letter to Attorney John W Arnold regarding David Crowe who is Co-Counsel for party Arch Insurance Company. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (NLT) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#88) Letter to Attorney John W Arnold who is lead counsel for party Arch Insurance Company. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (NLT) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#87) Letter to Attorney Judy Barrasso regarding Diana Cochrane who is Co-Counsel for party Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.). Inc.. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (NLT) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#86) Letter to Attorney Parker Lavin regarding Daniel Standish who is Co-Counsel for party Indian Harbor Insurance Company. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (NLT) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#85) Letter to Attorney Parker Lavin who is lead counsel for party Indian Harbor Insurance Company. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (NLT) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#84) Letter to Attorney Stefan Dandelles who is lead counsel for party Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (NLT) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#83) Letter to Attorney Bevan Sabo regarding Michael Stanley who is Co-Counsel for Robert C Ahders. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (NLT) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#82) Letter to Attorney J Gordon Cooney, Jr. regarding Ryan McCarthy who is Co-Counsel for SEI Private Trust Company and SEI Investments Company. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (NLT) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Letter dated 12/20/2016 from Bevan W. Sabo to Judge Wilder-Doomes Re: JPMLTransfer (SGO) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/6/2017.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.] (Entered: 12/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc., Arch Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Continental Casualty Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Nutmeg Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (LLH) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/6/2017.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.] (Entered: 12/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Submitted (Ezell, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/6/2017.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.] (Entered: 12/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Submitted (Ezell, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/6/2017.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.] (Entered: 12/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Submitted (Ezell, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/6/2017.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.] (Entered: 12/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Submitted (Ezell, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/6/2017.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.] (Entered: 12/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Submitted (Ezell, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/6/2017.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.] (Entered: 12/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Submitted (Ezell, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/6/2017.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.] (Entered: 12/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/26/2017 at 03:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 1/12/2017.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/5/2016. (SGO) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/6/2017.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.] (Entered: 12/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc., Arch Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Continental Casualty Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Nutmeg Insurance Company, SEI Investments Company, SEI Private Trust Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053N-1498722.), filed by Robert C Ahders. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Appendix, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Ezell, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 1/6/2017.] [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/4/2019.] (Entered: 12/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less