Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/19/2021 at 07:13:48 (UTC).

Aguilar v. Nally et al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 Aguilar filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Nally. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Marvin E. Aspen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00914

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marvin E. Aspen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Esteban Aguilar

Mt. Sterling, IL 62353

Defendants

Hardekopf

Tousigna

Multiple John Doe Officers

Nally

Meza

Unknown Officer Badge #422

Gillum

Multiple John Doe Health Care Workers

Houston

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Illinois Department of Corrections

100 West Randolph, Suite 4-200

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis R. #3 is granted. The Court authorizes and orders the trust fund officer at Plaintiff's place of incarceration to deduct $64.83 from his account for payment to the Clerk of Court as an initial partial payment of the filing fee, and to continue making monthly deductions in accordance with this order. However, summonses shall not issue at this time. The complaint on file R. #1 is dismissed without prejudice. The Court directs Plaintiff to submit an amended complaint limited to a single set of related facts. Failure to comply by May 21, 2021, will result in dismissal of this lawsuit in its entirety. The Court directs the Clerk to (1) forward copies of this order to the Fiscal Department and to the trust account office at Plaintiff's place of confinement; and (2) provide Plaintiff with an amended civil rights complaint form, instructions, and eight blank USM-285 (Marshals service) forms. Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 4/16/2021. Mailed notice. (kl, ) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#3

(#3) APPLICATION to sue or defend as a poor person by Plaintiff Esteban Aguilar. (Exhibits) (ph, ) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#2

(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (ph, ) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#1

(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Esteban Aguilar. (Exhibits) (Envelope postmarked 2/11/2021) (ph, ) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketMAILED an amended complaint form, 8 blank USM-285 forms, and instructions along with a copy of the order dated 4/16/2021 to plaintiff Esteban Aguilar; MAILED a copy of the order dated 4/16/2021 to the trust account office at Plaintiff's place of confinement; EMAILED copy of order dated 4/16/2021 to the court's Fiscal Department. (kl, ) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis R. #3 is granted. The Court authorizes and orders the trust fund officer at Plaintiff's place of incarceration to deduct $64.83 from his account for payment to the Clerk of Court as an initial partial payment of the filing fee, and to continue making monthly deductions in accordance with this order. However, summonses shall not issue at this time. The complaint on file R. #1 is dismissed without prejudice. The Court directs Plaintiff to submit an amended complaint limited to a single set of related facts. Failure to comply by May 21, 2021, will result in dismissal of this lawsuit in its entirety. The Court directs the Clerk to (1) forward copies of this order to the Fiscal Department and to the trust account office at Plaintiff's place of confinement; and (2) provide Plaintiff with an amended civil rights complaint form, instructions, and eight blank USM-285 (Marshals service) forms. Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 4/16/2021. Mailed notice. (kl, ) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION to sue or defend as a poor person by Plaintiff Esteban Aguilar. (Exhibits) (ph, ) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (ph, ) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Esteban Aguilar. (Exhibits) (Envelope postmarked 2/11/2021) (ph, ) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOUSTON'S is a litigant

Latest cases where MEZA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO HELIODORO MEZA OBDULIA is a litigant