This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/01/2022 at 08:53:06 (UTC).

Priscilla Aguilar et al v. Owens-Brockway Glass Container, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/03/2021 Priscilla Aguilar filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Owens-Brockway Glass Container, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha and Alexander F. MacKinnon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-09403

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha

Referral Judge

Alexander F. MacKinnon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Priscilla Aguilar

Julian Haro

Juan Madera

Richard Nunez

Defendants

Owens-Brockway Glass Container, Inc.

DOES 1-50, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christina M Lucio

Attorney at James Hawkins APLC

9880 Research Drive Suite 200

Irvine, CA 92618

James R Hawkins

Attorney at James Hawkins APLC

9880 Research Drive Suite 200

Irvine, CA 92618

Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth J MacGregor

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

560 Mission Street Suite 3100

San Francisco, CA 94105

Candace Sheri Bertoldi

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

601 South Figueroa Street Suite 3300

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Nolan Richard Theurer

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

560 Mission Street 31St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 08/25/2023. (tf) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#21

(#21) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial Plaintiffs (14-18 Court days)/Defendants (45 Court days), filed by Plaintiffs Priscilla Aguilar, Julian Haro, Juan Madera, Richard Nunez.. (Lucio, Christina) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

#20

(#20) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Scheduling Conference set for 2/11/2022 at 01:00 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#19

(#19) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#18

(#18) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:21-cv-00146 FLA(AFMx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian and Judge Mark C. Scarsi to Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-09403 FLA(AFMx). Signed by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha (rn) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

17 #1

Exhibit Exh. to Supplement to Notice of Removal

17 #17

Main Document

#16

(#16) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Miscellaneous Document, #13 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The document is accepted as filed. (smo) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#13

(#14) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document, #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Proof of service subsequent documents. Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Nolan R Theurer on behalf of Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container, Inc. (Theurer, Nolan) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#6

(#6) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Candace Sheri Bertoldi counsel for Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container, Inc.. Adding Candace Bertoldi as counsel of record for Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc. (Attorney Candace Sheri Bertoldi added to party Owens-Brockway Glass Container, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bertoldi, Candace) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container, Inc. (MacGregor, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container, Inc., identifying 1. Priscilla Aguilar, Plaintiff 2. Julian Haro, Plaintiff 3. Juan Madera, Plaintiff 4. Richard Nunez, Plaintiff 5. Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc., Defendant 6. O-I Glass, Inc.. (MacGregor, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#3

(#3) DECLARATION of Rita Paul re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container, Inc.. (MacGregor, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container, Inc.. (MacGregor, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

1 #2

Exhibit B to Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit A to Notice of Removal

1 #1

Main Document

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 08/25/2023. (tf) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • Docket(#22) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: On the court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference currently set for hearing on February 11, 2022, at 1:00 p.m. is hereby VACATED. No appearances are necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial Plaintiffs (14-18 Court days)/Defendants (45 Court days), filed by Plaintiffs Priscilla Aguilar, Julian Haro, Juan Madera, Richard Nunez.. (Lucio, Christina) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Scheduling Conference set for 2/11/2022 at 01:00 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:21-cv-00146 FLA(AFMx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian and Judge Mark C. Scarsi to Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-09403 FLA(AFMx). Signed by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha (rn) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. to Supplement to Notice of Removal)(MacGregor, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Miscellaneous Document, #13 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The document is accepted as filed. (smo) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container, Inc., re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #8 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #12 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #10 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #9 served on December 8, 2021. (MacGregor, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document, #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Proof of service subsequent documents. Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Nolan R Theurer on behalf of Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container, Inc. (Theurer, Nolan) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Candace Sheri Bertoldi counsel for Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container, Inc.. Adding Candace Bertoldi as counsel of record for Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc. (Attorney Candace Sheri Bertoldi added to party Owens-Brockway Glass Container, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bertoldi, Candace) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container, Inc. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 12/02/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Owens-Brockway Glass Container, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Richard Nunez, Priscilla Aguilar, Juan Madera, Julian Haro. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 8/8/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container, Inc. (MacGregor, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container, Inc., identifying 1. Priscilla Aguilar, Plaintiff 2. Julian Haro, Plaintiff 3. Juan Madera, Plaintiff 4. Richard Nunez, Plaintiff 5. Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc., Defendant 6. O-I Glass, Inc.. (MacGregor, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Rita Paul re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container, Inc.. (MacGregor, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container, Inc.. (MacGregor, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court, County of Los Angeles, case number 21STCV33017 Receipt No: ACACDC-32424782 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Owens-Brockway Glass Container, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal) (Attorney Elizabeth J MacGregor added to party Owens-Brockway Glass Container, Inc.(pty:dft))(MacGregor, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Owens-Brockway Glass Container, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elizabeth J MacGregor

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Candace Sheri Bertoldi