This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/14/2023 at 07:40:49 (UTC).

Aguilar et al v. First Community Mortgage, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 Aguilar filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against First Community Mortgage, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sim Lake. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-00141

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sim Lake

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Silvia Aguilar

Mike Azayed

Houston, TX 77057

Defendants

First Community Mortgage, Inc.

PennyMac Loan Services, LLC

Private National Mortgage Acceptance Company, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eleanor Glencora Curry

Attorney at The Curry Law Firm, PLLC

2000 Crawford St, Ste. 1200

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas George Yoxall

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

2200 Ross Ave, Ste 2800

Dallas, TX 75201-6776

Elizabeth Kristin Duffy

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

2200 Ross Ave, Ste 2800

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A - Index

1 #2

Exhibit B - State Court Docket Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Original Petition and Defendant's Original Ans

1 #4

Exhibit D - TRO

1 #5

Exhibit E - List of Counsel

1 #6

Exhibit F - Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement

1 #7

Exhibit G - Harris County Appraisal District

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, filed.(Duffy, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

#3

(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/3/2023 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas G. Yoxall on behalf of PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, filed. (Yoxall, Thomas) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt Lance Krolikowski on behalf of PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, filed. (Krolikowski, Kurt) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

#6

(#6) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, filed.(Duffy, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

#7

(#7) CLERKS NOTICE OF CANCELLATION - Initial Conference set for 3/3/2023 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sim Lake is CANCELED. Parties notified, filed. (sanderson, 4) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

#8

(#8) DOCKET CONTROL ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/5/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 5/5/2023. Pltf Expert Witness List/Reports due by 8/25/2023. Deft Expert Witness List/Reports due by 9/29/2023. Discovery due by 12/22/2023. Pretrial Motions/Motions in Limine due by 2/2/2024. Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/1/2024...*** Docket Call set for 3/8/2024 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DOCKET CONTROL ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/5/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 5/5/2023. Pltf Expert Witness List/Reports due by 8/25/2023. Deft Expert Witness List/Reports due by 9/29/2023. Discovery due by 12/22/2023. Pretrial Motions/Motions in Limine due by 2/2/2024. Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/1/2024...*** Docket Call set for 3/8/2024 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLERKS NOTICE OF CANCELLATION - Initial Conference set for 3/3/2023 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sim Lake is CANCELED. Parties notified, filed. (sanderson, 4) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, filed.(Duffy, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt Lance Krolikowski on behalf of PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, filed. (Krolikowski, Kurt) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas G. Yoxall on behalf of PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, filed. (Yoxall, Thomas) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/3/2023 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, filed.(Duffy, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-29323636) filed by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Original Petition and Defendant's Original Answer, #4 Exhibit D - TRO, #5 Exhibit E - List of Counsel, #6 Exhibit F - Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, #7 Exhibit G - Harris County Appraisal District)(Duffy, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less