This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/13/2021 at 09:22:08 (UTC).

Aguayo v. Drybar Holdings LLC

Case Summary

On 12/15/2020 Aguayo filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Drybar Holdings LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Edmond E. Chang. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-07422

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edmond E. Chang

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anastacia Aguayo

Defendant

Drybar Holdings LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kasif Khowaja

Attorney at The Khowaja Law, LLC

8 South Michigan Ave, Suite 2600

Chicago, IL 60603

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew Randall Cockroft

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

233 South Wacker Drive, Suite 8000

Chicago, IL 60606-6448

Thomas E. Ahlering

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

233 South Wacker Drive, Suite 8000

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

6 #1

Status Report Requirements

#7

#8

8 #1

Declaration of Casey Morris With Exhibits

#9

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On the Defendant's motion to compel arbitration #7 , the Plaintiff's response is due by 02/22/2021. The defense reply is due by 03/08/2021. The status report deadline of 02/04/2021 is vacated; discovery is paused for now. The tracking status hearing of 02/12/2021 is reset to 03/19/2021 at 8:30 a.m., but to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEMORANDUM by Drybar Holdings LLC in support of motion to dismiss #7 and Compel Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Casey Morris With Exhibits)(Ahlering, Thomas) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION by Defendant Drybar Holdings LLC to dismiss and Compel Arbitration (Ahlering, Thomas) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The Defendant's unopposed extension motion to respond to the complaint #4 is granted. The Defendant's answer ore response is extended from 12/22/2020 to 01/29/2021. Initial tracking status hearing set for 02/12/2021 at 8:30 a.m. to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, the Court will set the case schedule after reviewing the written status report. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements by 02/04/2021. Also, counsel (or the parties, if proceeding pro se) must carefully review Judge Chang's Case Management Procedures, available online at ilnd.uscourts.gov (navigate to Judges / District Judges / Judge Edmond E. Chang). Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel (or the party, if proceeding pro se) must read them anew even if the counsel or the party has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (mw, ) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Anastacia Aguayo by Kasif Khowaja (Khowaja, Kasif) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION by Defendant Drybar Holdings LLC for extension of time to file answer UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (Ahlering, Thomas) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Drybar Holdings LLC by Thomas E. Ahlering (Ahlering, Thomas) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Drybar Holdings LLC by Andrew Randall Cockroft (Cockroft, Andrew) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, ) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2020-CH-06575) filed by Drybar Holdings LLC Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17745137. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cockroft, Andrew) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less