This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/22/2022 at 09:25:39 (UTC).

Agis Software Development LLC v. Waze Mobile Limited

Case Summary

On 08/23/2022 Agis Software Development LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Waze Mobile Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Beth Labson Freeman and Susan van Keulen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-04827

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beth Labson Freeman

Referral Judge

Susan van Keulen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AGIS Software Development LLC

Defendant

Waze Mobile Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alfred Ross Fabricant

Benjamin T. Wang

Enrique Iturralde

Minna Y. Chan

Peter Lambrianakos

Samuel Franklin Baxter

Defendant Attorneys

Darin Walter Snyder

David S. Almeling

Luann Loraine Simmons

Amy K Liang

Andrew Bledsoe

Bill Trac

Gregory Blake Thompson

James Mark Mann

Mark Liang

Sorin Zaharia

Stacy Yae

4 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#162

(#162) Certificate of Interested Entities by AGIS Software Development LLC identifying Corporate Parent AGIS Holdings, Inc. for AGIS Software Development LLC. (Wang, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/22/2022) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

#161

(#161) Certificate of Interested Entities by Waze Mobile Limited (Liang, Mark) (Filed on 9/21/2022) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

#160

(#160) Case Reassigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 8/31/2022. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2022) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

#159

(#159) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by Waze Mobile Limited (Liang, Mark) (Filed on 8/30/2022) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

#157

(#157) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Waze Mobile Limited.. (Liang, Mark) (Filed on 8/30/2022) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

#156

(#156) Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #155 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Vincent J Rubino, III representing Plaintiff. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2022) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

#155

(#155) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17482766.) filed by AGIS Software Development LLC. (Rubino, Vincent) (Filed on 8/26/2022) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

#154

(#154) Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #151 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Peter Lambrianakos representing Plaintiff. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2022) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

#151

(#154) Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #151 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Peter Lambrianakos representing Plaintiff. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2022) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Lambrianakos on behalf of Agis Software Development LLC (Lambrianakos, Peter) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alfred Ross Fabricant on behalf of Agis Software Development LLC (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Waze Mobile Limited. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Agis Software Development LLC identifying Corporate Parent None for Agis Software Development LLC. (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

429 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/22/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#162) Certificate of Interested Entities by AGIS Software Development LLC identifying Corporate Parent AGIS Holdings, Inc. for AGIS Software Development LLC. (Wang, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/22/2022) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#161) Certificate of Interested Entities by Waze Mobile Limited (Liang, Mark) (Filed on 9/21/2022) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#160) Case Reassigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 8/31/2022. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2022) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2022

Docket***PLEASE DISREGARD, FILED IN ERROR**Case Reassigned to Judge Magistrate Thomas S. Hixson for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Clerk on 8/31/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2022) Modified on 8/31/2022 (ark, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/31/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#159) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by Waze Mobile Limited (Liang, Mark) (Filed on 8/30/2022) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2022

Docket(#158) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2022) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#157) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Waze Mobile Limited.. (Liang, Mark) (Filed on 8/30/2022) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#156) Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #155 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Vincent J Rubino, III representing Plaintiff. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2022) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#155) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17482766.) filed by AGIS Software Development LLC. (Rubino, Vincent) (Filed on 8/26/2022) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#154) Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #151 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Peter Lambrianakos representing Plaintiff. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2022) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
150 More Docket Entries
11/22/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Enrique William Iturralde on behalf of Agis Software Development LLC (Iturralde, Enrique) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vincent J Rubino, III on behalf of Agis Software Development LLC (Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Lambrianakos on behalf of Agis Software Development LLC (Lambrianakos, Peter) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alfred Ross Fabricant on behalf of Agis Software Development LLC (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Waze Mobile Limited. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2019

DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2019

DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Agis Software Development LLC identifying Corporate Parent None for Agis Software Development LLC. (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Waze Mobile Limited ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7505772.), filed by Agis Software Development LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less