This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/02/2021 at 08:50:14 (UTC).

AGIS Software Development LLC v. T-Mobile USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 AGIS Software Development LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against T-Mobile USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00072

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AGIS Software Development LLC

Defendants

T-Mobile USA, Inc.

T-Mobile US, Inc.

Consolidated Defendants

WhatsApp, Inc.

Uber Technologies Inc. d/b/a Uber

Lyft, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alfred Ross Fabricant

Attorney at Fabricant LLP - NY

230 Park Avenue, 3Rd Floor W.

New York, NY 10169

Enrique William Iturralde

Attorney at Fabricant LLP - NY

230 Park Avenue, 3Rd Floor W.

New York, NY 10169

Peter Lambrianakos

Attorney at Fabricant LLP - NY

230 Park Avenue, 3Rd Floor W.

New York, NY 10169

Vincent J Rubino, III

Attorney at Fabricant LLP - NY

230 Park Avenue, 3Rd Floor W.

New York, NY 10169

Justine Minseon Park

Attorney at Fabricant LLP - NY

230 Park Avenue, 3Rd Floor W.

New York, NY 10169

Defendant and Consolidated Defendant Attorneys

Jassiem N Moore

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP - Seattle

1201 Third Avenue, 49Th Floor

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

Ryan J McBrayer

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP - Seattle

1201 Third Avenue, 49Th Floor

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

Miguel Jose Bombach

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP - San Diego

11452 El Camino Real, Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92130-2080

Lisa K Nguyen

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP - Menlo Park

140 Scott Drive

Menlo Park, CA 94025-1008

Michael E Jones

Attorney at Potter Minton, a Professional Corporation

110 North College Avenue, Suite 500

Tyler, TX 75702

Richard G Frenkel

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP - Menlo Park

140 Scott Drive

Menlo Park, CA 94025-1008

Robert Anthony Vincent

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP - Dallas

2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 2100

Dallas, TX 75201

Ashbey N Morgan

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 2100, Dallas

Dallas, TX 75201

Nathan Robert Curtis

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLC - Dallas

2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 2100

Dallas, TX 75201

Mark Nolan Reiter

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher

2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 2100, Dallas

Dallas, TX 75201

Jeremy John Taylor

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP Palo Alto

1001 Page Mill Road, Building One Suite 200

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Deron R Dacus

Attorney at The Dacus Firm, PC

821 Ese Loop 323, Suite 430

Tyler, TX 75701

Bethany R Salpietra

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP - Dallas

2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201-2980

 

Court Documents

#38

#37

#36

#35

34 #9

Exhibit 1 - Land Plat Survey

34 #8

AGIS Davis Declaration ISO Facebook Motion to Dismiss

34 #4

Exhibit D - Plat Survey

23 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#23

#2

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

77 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard G Frenkel on behalf of WhatsApp, Inc. (Frenkel, Richard) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lisa K Nguyen on behalf of WhatsApp, Inc. (Nguyen, Lisa) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER granting #23 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for AGIS to Comply with P. R. 3-1 & 3-2 (Infringement Contentions) and for Defendants to Comply with P. R. 3-3 & 3-4 (Invalidity Contentions). Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/28/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by WhatsApp, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Facebook, Inc. for WhatsApp, Inc.. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue [to Dkt 1, Complaint in 2:21cv29] by WhatsApp, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Tarranty County Record 1, #2 Exhibit B - Tarranty County Record 2, #3 Exhibit C - Tarrant County Record 3, #4 Exhibit D - Plat Survey, #5 Exhibit E - Tarrant Appraisal Dist Property Search, #6 Exhibit F - Tax Information, #7 Exhibit G - Denton County Tax Info, #8 AGIS Davis Declaration ISO Facebook Motion to Dismiss, #9 Exhibit 1 - Land Plat Survey, #10 Exhibit 2 - Geren Article, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Miguel Jose Bombach on behalf of T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Bombach, Miguel) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Uber Technologies Inc. d/b/a Uber (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lyft, Inc. (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Lyft, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Lyft, Inc. (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by AGIS Software Development LLC. T-Mobile USA, Inc. served on 3/4/2021, answer due 3/25/2021. (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Issued as to T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(ch, ) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Enrique William Iturralde on behalf of AGIS Software Development LLC (Iturralde, Enrique) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vincent J Rubino, III on behalf of AGIS Software Development LLC (Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Lambrianakos on behalf of AGIS Software Development LLC (Lambrianakos, Peter) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alfred Ross Fabricant on behalf of AGIS Software Development LLC (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AGIS Software Development LLC identifying Corporate Parent AGIS Holdings, Inc. for AGIS Software Development LLC. (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8275173.), filed by AGIS Software Development LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AGIS Software Development LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WhatsApp Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Lyft, Inc. is a litigant