This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/30/2023 at 09:33:16 (UTC).

AGIS Software Development LLC v. Google LLC

Case Summary

On March 1, 2023, AGIS Software Development LLC (“Plaintiff”), represented by Raymond W. Mort, III of The Mort Law Firm, PLLC, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Google LLC (“Defendant”), seeking injunctive relief and damages for alleged infringement of U.S. patent owned by the plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for Western District of Texas.

In the complaint, the plaintiff stated, ”On July 3, 2012, the United States Patent and Trademark Office duly and legally issued U.S. Patent No. 8,213,970 (the ‘’970 Patent’) entitled ‘Method of Utilizing Forced Alerts for Interactive Remote Communications.’”

The plaintiff also claimed, “AGIS is the sole and exclusive owner of all right, title, and interest in the Patent--in-Suit, and holds the exclusive right to take all actions necessary to enforce its rights to the Patent-in-Suit, including the filing of this patent infringement lawsuit.”

Plaintiff further claimed, “AGIS Software has not licensed or otherwise authorized Defendant to make, use, offer for sale, sell, or import any Accused Products and/or products that embody the inventions of the ’970 Patent.”

The plaintiff then alleged, “Defendant infringes, contributes to the infringement of, and/or induces infringement of the ’970 Patent by making, using, selling, offering for sale, distributing, exporting from, and/or importing into the United States products and/or methods covered by one or more claims of the ’970 Patent including, but not limited to, the Accused Products.”

The plaintiff also alleged, “Defendant has and continues to directly infringe at least claim 10 of the ’970 Patent, either literally or under the doctrine of equivalents, by making, using, selling, offering for sale, distributing, exporting from, and/or importing into the United States the Accused Products without authority and in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271(a).”

Plaintiff further alleged, “Defendant has and continues to indirectly infringe at least claim 10 of the ’970 Patent by actively, knowingly, and intentionally inducing others to directly infringe, either literally or under the doctrine of equivalents, by making, using, selling, offering for sale, distributing, exporting from, and/or importing into the United States the Accused Products and by instructing users of the Accused Products to perform methods claimed in the ’970 Patent.”

The plaintiff additionally alleged that “Defendant has indirectly infringed and continues to indirectly infringe at least claim 10 of the ’970 Patent in the United States because Defendant’s customers use the Accused Products in accordance with Defendant’s instructions and thereby directly infringe at least claim 10 of the ’970 Patent in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271.”

The plaintiff then alleged, “Defendant has committed and continues to commit acts of infringement that Defendant actually knew or should have known constituted an unjustifiably high risk of infringement of at least one valid and enforceable claim of the ’970 Patent. Defendant’s infringement of the ’970 Patent has been and continues to be willful.”

Plaintiff presented one claim for relief for alleged infringement of the ’970 Patent.

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiff requested declaratory and injunctive relief enjoining the defendant from further acts of infringement. The plaintiff also requested an award of damages, lost profits, reasonable royalties along with all ongoing lost profits, royalties, and/or other damages caused by Defendant’s continuing infringement and treble damages.

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:23-CV-00160

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Counts

Referral Judge

Derek T. Gilliland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AGIS Software Development LLC

Defendant

Google LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Raymond W Mort, III

Defendant Attorneys

G. Blake Thompson

J. Mark Mann

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AGIS Software Development LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by AGIS Software Development LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Google LLC. (zv) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

#6

(#6) Pro Hac Vice Letter to AGIS Software Development LLC for attorney Alfred R. Fabricant. (zv) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

#7

(#7) Pro Hac Vice Letter to AGIS Software Development LLC for attorney Peter Lambrianakos. (zv) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

#8

(#8) Pro Hac Vice Letter to AGIS Software Development LLC for attorney Vincent J. Rubino, III. (zv) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

#9

(#9) ORDER AND ADVISORY. It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Signed by Judge David Counts. (zv) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION to Stay Case Pending ITC Determination by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Thompson, G.) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

10 #1

Exhibit A

10 #2

Exhibit B

10 #3

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Stay Case. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (lad) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

4 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

04/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Stay Case. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (lad) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION to Stay Case Pending ITC Determination by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Thompson, G.) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ORDER AND ADVISORY. It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Signed by Judge David Counts. (zv) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Pro Hac Vice Letter to AGIS Software Development LLC for attorney Vincent J. Rubino, III. (zv) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Pro Hac Vice Letter to AGIS Software Development LLC for attorney Peter Lambrianakos. (zv) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Pro Hac Vice Letter to AGIS Software Development LLC for attorney Alfred R. Fabricant. (zv) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Google LLC. (zv) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2023

DocketCase assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (zv) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2023

DocketPlease remember to comply with the standing orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (zv) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by AGIS Software Development LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AGIS Software Development LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-17142763), filed by AGIS Software Development LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less