This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/05/2022 at 08:32:59 (UTC).

Agin et al v. Thor Motor Coach Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 10/06/2022 Agin filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Thor Motor Coach Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael T Liburdi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01713

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael T Liburdi

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Anthony Edward Agin

Emily Jean Agin

Defendants

Thor Motor Coach Incorporated

Arizona RV Centers LLC

Manchester Tank & Equipment Company

Engineered Controls International LLC

Rotarex North America Incorporated

Rochester Gauges LLC

Firefly Integrations LLC

Unknown Parties

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alicyn Marie Freeman

Robert Thomas Aquinas Sullivan

Defendant Attorneys

Amanda Emily Heitz

John Sear

Megha Singh

Randy Jiro Aoyama

Nicole Marie Stewart

Patrick C Quinlivan

Ryan Shawn Patterson

Bradley R Jardine

Joshua Hart Burday

Tonya Newman

James J Osborne

Gina Marie Bartoszek

Michael Patrick Obert, Jr.

Lori A Metcalf

15 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#47

(#47) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Engineered Controls International LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dover Corporation for Engineered Controls International LLC. (Jardine, Bradley) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

#46

(#46) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/30/2023. Dispositive motions due by 2/16/2024. See order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 11/28/2022. (LMR) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#45

(#45) SECOND NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AS TO ENGINEERED CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL LLC: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed NOT LATER THAN 12/5/2022. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Engineered Controls International LLC. (LMR) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#44

(#44) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Michael T. Liburdi: Scheduling Conference held on 11/28/2022. Stipulation for Extension of Time (Doc. #28 ) is granted. Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Pleading Caption (Doc. #41 ) is granted. Joint Report due 12/9/2022. See attachment for details. (Court Reporter Catherine Taylor.) Hearing held 3:31 PM to 4:23 PM.(LMR) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

42 #42

Main Document

41 #1

Proposed Order

41 #41

Main Document

28 #1

Proposed Order

28 #28

Main Document

8 #1

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Cover Sheet

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Arizona RV Centers LLC. Amendment to #6 Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel . (Aoyama, Randy) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

#6

(#7) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Arizona RV Centers LLC. Amendment to #6 Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel . (Aoyama, Randy) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Arizona RV Centers LLC, Engineered Controls International LLC, Firefly Integrations LLC, Manchester Tank & Equipment Company, Rochester Gauges LLC, Rotarex North America Incorporated, Thor Motor Coach Incorporated. (BAC) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

#2

(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21182237. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Liburdi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-01713-PHX-MTL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibits 1-9

1 #1

Main Document

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/29/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#47) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Engineered Controls International LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dover Corporation for Engineered Controls International LLC. (Jardine, Bradley) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2022

DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Joshua Hart Burday on behalf of Defendant Engineered Controls International LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#46) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/30/2023. Dispositive motions due by 2/16/2024. See order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 11/28/2022. (LMR) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#45) SECOND NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AS TO ENGINEERED CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL LLC: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed NOT LATER THAN 12/5/2022. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Engineered Controls International LLC. (LMR) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#44) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Michael T. Liburdi: Scheduling Conference held on 11/28/2022. Stipulation for Extension of Time (Doc. #28 ) is granted. Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Pleading Caption (Doc. #41 ) is granted. Joint Report due 12/9/2022. See attachment for details. (Court Reporter Catherine Taylor.) Hearing held 3:31 PM to 4:23 PM.(LMR) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#43) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED the motion for leave to appear telephonically (Doc. #42 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED John Sear may appear telephonically for the scheduling conference set for November 28, 2022 at 3:30 pm (Arizona time) in Courtroom 504, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Federal Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona 85003 before Judge Michael T. Liburdi. Counsel should call (888) 363-4735 and use Access Code: 9604594. Please avoid the use of speaker phones and headsets. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 11/28/2022. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#42) MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically for Rule 16 Conference on November 28, 2022 at 3:30 pm by Arizona RV Centers LLC, Thor Motor Coach Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sear, John) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#41) First MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Pleading Caption by Anthony Edward Agin, Emily Jean Agin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Freeman, Alicyn) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#40) ORDER granting #36 , #38 Motions for Leave to Appear Telephonically. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Patrick Quinlivan and James Ozog may appear telephonically for the scheduling conference set for November 28, 2022 at 3:30pm (Arizona time) in Courtroom 504, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Federal Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona 85003 before Judge Michael T. Liburdi. Counsel should call (888) 363-4735 and use Access Code: 9604594. Please avoid the use of speaker phones and head sets. Ordered by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 11/22/22. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MJW) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#39) NOTICE of Errata re Motion to Appear Telephonically at Rule 16 Conference by Defendants Manchester Tank & Equipment Company, McWane Incorporated.. (Patterson, Ryan) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
35 More Docket Entries
10/10/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Rochester Gauges LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Additional Page to Supplemental Cover Sheet)(Obert, Michael) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Arizona RV Centers LLC. Amendment to #6 Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel . (Aoyama, Randy) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Randy Jiro Aoyama on behalf of Arizona RV Centers LLC. (Aoyama, Randy) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Arizona RV Centers LLC, Engineered Controls International LLC, Firefly Integrations LLC, Manchester Tank & Equipment Company, Rochester Gauges LLC, Rotarex North America Incorporated, Thor Motor Coach Incorporated. (BAC) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Rochester Gauges LLC. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please file a Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Rochester Gauges LLC. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please re-file the Civil Cover Sheet, using the correct format. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21182237. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Liburdi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-01713-PHX-MTL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2022

Docket***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED: ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Thor Motor Coach Incorporated. ENTERED IN DISTRICT COURT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES***(BAC) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2022

Docket***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED: SERVICE EXECUTED: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons: Waiver signed on 9/30/22 to Rochester Gauges LLC(Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 9/28/22); signed on 9/22/22 Arizona RV Centers LLC(Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 9/23/22); signed on 9/23/22 Manchester Tank & Equipment Company(Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 9/28/22).(BAC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Entered: 10/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2022-008173. Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21182237 filed by Rochester Gauges LLC. (Obert, Michael) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-9, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less