This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 12:23:32 (UTC).

Ag Navigator, LLC et al v. Top Gun Ag LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/27/2020 Ag Navigator, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Top Gun Ag LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cheryl R. Zwart and Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-00119

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cheryl R. Zwart

Presiding Judge

Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ag Navigator, LLC

Foreland Ag, LLC

Foreland Real Estate, LLC

Foreland Real Estate III, LLC

Foreland Real Estate II, LLC

Defendants

Timothy C. Barker

Ryan Russell

Lance Fulton

John Doe 1-10

Jane Doe 1-10

Top Gun Ag LLC

Top Gun LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian J. Brislen

Attorney at LAMSON, DUGAN LAW FIRM

10306 Regency Parkway Drive

Omaha, NE 68114-3743

Karson S. Kampfe

Attorney at LAMSON, DUGAN & MURRAY LLP

10306 Regency Parkway Drive

Omaha, NE 68114

Defendant Attorneys

Tim W. Thompson

Attorney at KELLEY, SCRITSMIER LAW FIRM

P.O. Box 1669

North Platte, NE 69103-1669

Cindy R. Volkmer

Attorney at KELLEY, SCRITSMIER LAW FIRM

P.O. Box 1669

North Platte, NE 69103-1669

Samantha M H Woods

Attorney at MARTIN, PRINGLE LAW FIRM - WICHITA

645 East Douglas, Suite 100

Wichita, KS 67202

Christine E. Seck

Attorney at KELLEY, SCRITSMIER LAW FIRM

P.O. Box 1669

North Platte, NE 69103-1669

William R. Griffin

Attorney at MARTIN, PRINGLE LAW FIRM - WICHITA

645 East Douglas, Suite 100

Wichita, KS 67202

 

Court Documents

45 #3

Exhibit 2 Amended Fong Declaration

45 #2

Exhibit A Email String

#45

42 #10

Exhibit H Notice

42 #9

Exhibit G Certt Mail

42 #8

Exhibit F Email

42 #7

Exhibit E Emails

42 #6

Exhibit D Member Listing

42 #5

Exhibit C Emails

42 #4

Exhibit B Russell Agreement

42 #3

Exhibit 2 Fong Declaration

42 #2

Exhibit A Email string

42 #1

Exhibit 1 Brislen Declaration

#42

10 #1

Exhibit Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice

#10

#9

#1

89 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) TEXT STRIKE ORDER that Pursuant to NEGenR 1.3(a)(4), the IndexPu #42 is stricken for the following reason(s): pursuant to Order 44. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) INDEX in support of MOTION to Remand and Award of Attorney Fees #34 Amended Index by Attorney Karson S. Kampfe on behalf of Plaintiffs Ag Navigator, LLC, Foreland Ag, LLC, Foreland Real Estate II, LLC, Foreland Real Estate III, LLC, Foreland Real Estate, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Brislen Declaration, #2 Exhibit A Email String, #3 Exhibit 2 Amended Fong Declaration, #4 Exhibit B Russell Agreement, #5 Exhibit C Emails, #6 Exhibit D Member Listing, #7 Exhibit E Emails, #8 Exhibit F Email, #9 Exhibit G Certt Mail, #10 Exhibit H Notice)(Kampfe, Karson) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) TEXT ORDER granting #43 Motion to Replace Filing. Plaintiffs indicate certain typographical errors exist in the Fong Declaration attached to their Index in Support of Motion to Remand at Filing No. [42-3]. On or before May 22, 2020, Plaintiffs may file an Amended Index, incorporating the corrected Fong Declaration, a copy of which was attached to their motion. Upon filing of the Amended Index, the court will strike Plaintiffs' previous index and exhibits at Filing No. #42 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JLK) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) MOTION to Replace Exhibit regarding Index,, #42 by Attorney Karson S. Kampfe on behalf of Plaintiffs Ag Navigator, LLC, Foreland Ag, LLC, Foreland Real Estate II, LLC, Foreland Real Estate III, LLC, Foreland Real Estate, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Amended Declaration Fong)(Kampfe, Karson) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) STRICKEN - INDEX in support of MOTION to Remand and Award of Attorney Fees #34 by Attorney Karson S. Kampfe on behalf of Plaintiffs Ag Navigator, LLC, Foreland Ag, LLC, Foreland Real Estate II, LLC, Foreland Real Estate III, LLC, Foreland Real Estate, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Brislen Declaration, #2 Exhibit A Email string, #3 Exhibit 2 Fong Declaration, #4 Exhibit B Russell Agreement, #5 Exhibit C Emails, #6 Exhibit D Member Listing, #7 Exhibit E Emails, #8 Exhibit F Email, #9 Exhibit G Certt Mail, #10 Exhibit H Notice)(Kampfe, Karson) Modified on 5/22/2020 to strike per Order 46 (TCL). (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION to Remand and Award of Attorney Fees #34 by Attorney Karson S. Kampfe on behalf of Plaintiffs Ag Navigator, LLC, Foreland Ag, LLC, Foreland Real Estate II, LLC, Foreland Real Estate III, LLC, Foreland Real Estate, LLC.(Kampfe, Karson) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) RESPONSE regarding MOTION to Remand and Award of Attorney Fees #34 Response by Defendants Top Gun Ag LLC,Barker, Fulton, and Russell by Attorney Christine E. Seck on behalf of Defendant Top Gun Ag LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fulton Affidavit to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit First Amendment to 2nd Restated Operating Agreement, #3 Exhibit Fulton Affidavit to Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit Russell Affidavit to Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit Business Entity Amendment to Cancel, #6 Exhibit Woods' Letter Dated 04-27-20, #7 Exhibit Second Operating Agreement, #8 Exhibit Fulton Affidavit dated 05-12-20)(Seck, Christine) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) TEXT ORDER granting #38 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend the response deadline as to Plaintiffs' MOTION to Remand and Award of Attorney Fees #34 . Defendants' deadline is now May 12, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CEW) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Attorney Christine E. Seck on behalf of Defendant Top Gun Ag LLC.(Seck, Christine) Modified on 5/5/2020 to correct event type (CEW). (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) TEXT ORDER granting #36 Motion to Stay. All deadlines, including deadlines for responding to the Defendants' motions to dismiss, are stayed pending a ruling on whether this court has subject matter jurisdiction over the Plaintiffs' claims. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4141024 by Attorney Tim W. Thompson on behalf of Defendants Timothy C. Barker, Lance Fulton, Ryan Russell, Top Gun Ag LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Thompson, Tim) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Karson S. Kampfe has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • Docket(#8) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Top Gun Ag LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • Docket(#7) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Foreland Real Estate, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • Docket(#6) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Foreland Real Estate III, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • Docket(#5) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Foreland Real Estate II, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • Docket(#4) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Foreland Ag, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • Docket(#3) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Ag Navigator, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • Docket(#2) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against All Plaintiffs from District Court of Phelps County, Nebraska, Case number 19-116 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4137947) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Tim W. Thompson on behalf of Top Gun Ag LLC(Thompson, Tim) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOP GUN LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karson S. Kampfe

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian J. Brislen