This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/17/2022 at 07:50:22 (UTC).

Affiliated FM Insurance Company et al v. Kuehne + Nagel Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/18/2022 Affiliated FM Insurance Company filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against Kuehne Nagel Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-03160

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Affiliated FM Insurance Company

Falvey Cargo Underwriting, LTD.

Defendants

Kuehne + Nagel Inc.

Kuehne + Nagel Inc. doing business as Blue Anchor America Line

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Justin Matthew Heilig

Attorney at Hill Rivkins LLP

45 Broadway, Suite 1500

Ny, NY 10006

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Kuehne + Nagel Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26021225)Document filed by Affiliated FM Insurance Company, Falvey Cargo Underwriting, LTD...(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

#3

(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21-cv-8183. Document filed by Affiliated FM Insurance Company, Falvey Cargo Underwriting, LTD...(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kuehne + Nagel d/b/a Blue Anchor America Line, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Affiliated FM Insurance Company, Falvey Cargo Underwriting, LTD...(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kuehne + Nagel Inc.. (sj) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#6

(#6) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Kuehne + Nagel Inc..Document filed by Affiliated FM Insurance Company, Falvey Cargo Underwriting, LTD.. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#7

(#7) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kuehne + Nagel d/b/a Blue Anchor America Line, re: #6 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Affiliated FM Insurance Company, Falvey Cargo Underwriting, LTD...(Heilig, Justin) Modified on 5/18/2022 (vf). (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#8

(#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Kuehne + Nagel d/b/a Blue Anchor America Line, re: #6 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Affiliated FM Insurance Company, Falvey Cargo Underwriting, LTD...(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

#9

(#9) ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kuehne + Nagel Inc...(pc) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kuehne + Nagel Inc...(pc) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Kuehne + Nagel d/b/a Blue Anchor America Line, re: #6 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Affiliated FM Insurance Company, Falvey Cargo Underwriting, LTD...(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Justin Matthew Heilig to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kuehne + Nagel d/b/a Blue Anchor America Line, re: #6 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Affiliated FM Insurance Company, Falvey Cargo Underwriting, LTD...(Heilig, Justin) Modified on 5/18/2022 (vf). (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Kuehne + Nagel Inc..Document filed by Affiliated FM Insurance Company, Falvey Cargo Underwriting, LTD.. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kuehne + Nagel Inc.. (sj) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketCASE REFERRED TO Judge Colleen McMahon as possibly related to 1:21cv8183. (sj) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kuehne + Nagel d/b/a Blue Anchor America Line, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Affiliated FM Insurance Company, Falvey Cargo Underwriting, LTD...(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21-cv-8183. Document filed by Affiliated FM Insurance Company, Falvey Cargo Underwriting, LTD...(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Kuehne + Nagel Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26021225)Document filed by Affiliated FM Insurance Company, Falvey Cargo Underwriting, LTD...(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FAILVEY CARGO UNDERWRITING LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where KUEHNE + NAGEL INC is a litigant

Latest cases where AFFILIATED FM INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Justin Matthew Heilig