This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/28/2022 at 08:54:57 (UTC).

HORIZON BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF NEW JERSEY et al v. SPEECH & LANGUAGE CENTER, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/28/2022 HORIZON BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF NEW JERSEY filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against SPEECH LANGUAGE CENTER, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A. Shipp and Douglas E. Arpert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01748

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael A. Shipp

Referral Judge

Douglas E. Arpert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HORIZON BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF NEW JERSEY

Defendants

SPEECH & LANGUAGE CENTER, LLC

JOHN DOES 1-10

ABC CORPS 1-10

CHRYSSOULA MARINOS ARSENIS

Warren, NJ 07059

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

EDWARD S. WARDELL

Attorney at CONNELL FOLEY LLP

457 Haddonfield Rd., Ste. 230

Cherry Hill, NJ 08002

PATRICIA A. LEE

Attorney at CONNELL FOLEY LLP

56 Livingston Avenue

Roseland, NJ 07068

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) BRIEF in Opposition filed by CHRYSSOULA MARINOS ARSENIS, SPEECH & LANGUAGE CENTER, LLC re #12 MOTION to Remand (Received via H.D) (abr, ) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

12 #7

Exhibit C

12 #6

Exhibit B

12 #5

Exhibit A

12 #4

Certification of Counsel

12 #3

Certificate of Service

12 #1

Brief

12 #12

Main Document

#8

(#13) Response to #8 Order to Show Cause filed by CHRYSSOULA MARINOS ARSENIS (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT A, #2 EXHIBIT B, #3 EXHIBIT C, #4 EXHIBIT D) (Filed via ECF Help Desk)(jal) Modified on 5/10/2022 (jmh). (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#7

(#7) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to CHRYSSOULA MARINOS-ARSENIS (jal, ) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

#6

(#6) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to CHRYSSOULA MARINOS-ARSENIS (jal, ) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

#5

(#5) Letter from Chryssoula Marinos-Aresnis indicating the Clerks office put the wrong address on the docket. Address information has been corrected. (Received via Help Desk 4/12/2022) (abr) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

4 #2

motion

4 #1

Exhibit

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (jdg, ) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CHRYSSOULA MARINOS-ARSENIS from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, case number SOM-L- 281-15. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number NEW046434), filed by CHRYSSOULA MARINOS-ARSENIS.(jdg, ) Modified on 4/6/2022 (jdg, ). (Entered: 03/29/2022)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketPlease be advised USB sent to Chambers on 5/25/2022 with video exhibit. (abr, ) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Exhibit to #16 Brief in Opposition to Motion by CHRYSSOULA MARINOS ARSENIS, SPEECH & LANGUAGE CENTER, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Received via H.D) (abr, )NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) BRIEF in Opposition filed by CHRYSSOULA MARINOS ARSENIS, SPEECH & LANGUAGE CENTER, LLC re #12 MOTION to Remand (Received via H.D) (abr, ) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Exhibit to #18 Brief in Opposition to Motion by CHRYSSOULA MARINOS ARSENIS, SPEECH & LANGUAGE CENTER, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit)(abr, )NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) BRIEF in Opposition filed by CHRYSSOULA MARINOS ARSENIS, SPEECH & LANGUAGE CENTER, LLC re #12 MOTION to Remand (abr, ) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Letter To Judge Shipp stating her exhibits were delivered on 5/6/2022 from Chryssoula Arsenis. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (jal, ) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Letter to Judge Shipp containing sealed exhibits from Chryssoula Marinos-Arsenis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(jal, ) Modified on 5/20/2022 (jal, ). (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Response to #8 Order to Show Cause filed by CHRYSSOULA MARINOS ARSENIS (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT A, #2 EXHIBIT B, #3 EXHIBIT C, #4 EXHIBIT D) (Filed via ECF Help Desk)(jal) Modified on 5/10/2022 (jmh). (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 6/6/2022 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, ) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Remand by HORIZON BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF NEW JERSEY. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Certification of Counsel, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C)(LEE, PATRICIA) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: By 4/29/2022 Defendants must e-file, no longer than 5 pages, Show Cause as to why his case should not be remanded to Somerset County. Response due by 5/9/2022. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 4/19/2022. (jal) Modified on 4/25/2022 (jal, ). (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to CHRYSSOULA MARINOS-ARSENIS (jal, ) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to CHRYSSOULA MARINOS-ARSENIS (jal, ) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter from Chryssoula Marinos-Aresnis indicating the Clerks office put the wrong address on the docket. Address information has been corrected. (Received via Help Desk 4/12/2022) (abr) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the Set Deadlines filed by the Clerk's office on 4/6/2022 was filed in error, please disregard. The document at #4 has been modified by the Clerk's Office to reflect the filing. This message is for informational purposes only. (jmh) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Stay. Motion set for 5/2/2022 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, ) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Superior Court filings filed by CHRYSSOULA MARINOS-ARESNIS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 motion)(jal, ) Modified on 4/6/2022 (jdg, ). Modified on 4/8/2022 (jmh). (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (jdg, ) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that although an individual is entitled to proceed pro se, a corporation must be represented by counsel. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (jdg, ) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CHRYSSOULA MARINOS-ARSENIS from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, case number SOM-L- 281-15. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number NEW046434), filed by CHRYSSOULA MARINOS-ARSENIS.(jdg, ) Modified on 4/6/2022 (jdg, ). (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HORIZON BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF NEW JERSEY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EDWARD S. WARDELL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patricia Ann Lee