Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/23/2021 at 11:17:14 (UTC).

Aether Therapeutics Inc. v. RedHill Biopharma Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 Aether Therapeutics Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against RedHill Biopharma Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00248

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aether Therapeutics Inc.

Defendant

RedHill Biopharma Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stamatios Stamoulis

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N. West Street, Third Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Richard Charles Weinblatt

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N. West Street, Third Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant Attorneys

Gabrielle Markeson

Michael E. Furrow

Daniel M. Silver

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

April Abele Isaacson

Alexandra M. Joyce

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

405 N. King Street, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Courtney S. Dabbiere

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) SO ORDERED re (21 in 1:21-cv-00248-MN, 64 in 1:20-cv-00381-MN) Stipulation and Order for Extension of Time Regarding Defendants' Invalidity Contentions for U.S. Patent No. 8,748,448. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/15/2021. (dlw) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#21

(#21) STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order for Extension of Time Regarding Defendants' Invalidity Contentions for U.S. Patent No. 8,748,448 by RedHill Biopharma Inc., AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Daiichi-Sankyo, Inc., Nektar Therapeutics, LLC. (Joyce, Alexandra) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#19

(#19) SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 4/16/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 4/16/2021. Fact Discovery completed by 2/18/2022. Opening Expert Reports due by 4/29/2022. Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 6/3/2022. Reply Expert Reports due by 6/30/2022. Expert Discovery due by 8/12/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 9/9/2022. Answering Brief due 10/14/2022. Reply Brief due 11/4/2022. Claim Construction Opening Brief served by 5/28/2021. Claim Construction Answering Brief served by 6/28/2021. Claim Construction Reply Brief served by 7/21/2021. Claim Construction Surreply Brief served by 8/6/2021. Joint Claim Construction Brief filed by 8/13/2021. A Markman Hearing is set for 8/30/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Maryellen Noreika. The Pretrial Conference and Jury Trials dates are to be determined. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/13/2021. (dlw) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#18

(#18) NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) RedHill Biopharma Inc.s Paragraph 3 Disclosures and (2) RedHill Biopharma Inc.s Rule 26(A)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by RedHill Biopharma Inc..(Joyce, Alexandra) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#17

(#17) PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/12/2021. (dlw) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#16

(#16) PROPOSED ORDER // Protective Order by RedHill Biopharma Inc. (Silver, Daniel) Modified on 4/12/2021 (dlw). (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#15

(#15) PROPOSED ORDER // Scheduling Order by RedHill Biopharma Inc. (Silver, Daniel) Modified on 4/12/2021 (dlw). (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,713,488 B2 ;US 8,748,448 B2 ;US 8,883,817 B2 ;US 9,061,024 B2. (myr) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint for Patent Infringement by RedHill Biopharma Inc. (Silver, Daniel) Modified on 3/15/2021 (dlw). (Entered: 03/12/2021)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) SO ORDERED re (21 in 1:21-cv-00248-MN, 64 in 1:20-cv-00381-MN) Stipulation and Order for Extension of Time Regarding Defendants' Invalidity Contentions for U.S. Patent No. 8,748,448. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/15/2021. (dlw) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order for Extension of Time Regarding Defendants' Invalidity Contentions for U.S. Patent No. 8,748,448 by RedHill Biopharma Inc., AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Daiichi-Sankyo, Inc., Nektar Therapeutics, LLC. (Joyce, Alexandra) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docket(#20) ORAL ORDER: This matter has been referred to Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge for ADR. Should any party (or all parties) desire to discuss mediation and its timing, the party(ies) shall contact Judge Thynge and her Law Clerk, Daniel Taylor (daniel_taylor@ded.uscourts.gov), to request that a teleconference be scheduled. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/13/2021. (Taylor, Daniel) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # https://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/ded/files/forms/StandingOrderforADR-Mediation.pdf (Taylor, Daniel) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 4/16/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 4/16/2021. Fact Discovery completed by 2/18/2022. Opening Expert Reports due by 4/29/2022. Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 6/3/2022. Reply Expert Reports due by 6/30/2022. Expert Discovery due by 8/12/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 9/9/2022. Answering Brief due 10/14/2022. Reply Brief due 11/4/2022. Claim Construction Opening Brief served by 5/28/2021. Claim Construction Answering Brief served by 6/28/2021. Claim Construction Reply Brief served by 7/21/2021. Claim Construction Surreply Brief served by 8/6/2021. Joint Claim Construction Brief filed by 8/13/2021. A Markman Hearing is set for 8/30/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Maryellen Noreika. The Pretrial Conference and Jury Trials dates are to be determined. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/13/2021. (dlw) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) RedHill Biopharma Inc.s Paragraph 3 Disclosures and (2) RedHill Biopharma Inc.s Rule 26(A)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by RedHill Biopharma Inc..(Joyce, Alexandra) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/12/2021. (dlw) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) PROPOSED ORDER // Protective Order by RedHill Biopharma Inc. (Silver, Daniel) Modified on 4/12/2021 (dlw). (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PROPOSED ORDER // Scheduling Order by RedHill Biopharma Inc. (Silver, Daniel) Modified on 4/12/2021 (dlw). (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney April Abele Isaacson for RedHill Biopharma Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2021
  • Docket(#9) ORAL ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit a proposed order, including a proposal for the length and timing of trial, to the Court no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. The parties are to use the Court's form scheduling order, which is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Noreika, Forms). If there are disputes or issues that the Court needs to address in the proposed scheduling order, the parties shall direct the Court to the paragraph numbers in which those appear in a cover letter to the Court. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/15/2021. (dlw) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent RedHill Biopharma Ltd. for RedHill Biopharma Inc. filed by RedHill Biopharma Inc.. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint for Patent Infringement by RedHill Biopharma Inc. (Silver, Daniel) Modified on 3/15/2021 (dlw). (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aether Therapeutics Inc.. RedHill Biopharma Inc. served on 2/25/2021, answer due 3/18/2021. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (myr) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Aether Therapeutics Inc.. (myr) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,713,488 B2 ;US 8,748,448 B2 ;US 8,883,817 B2 ;US 9,061,024 B2. (myr) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against RedHill Biopharma Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3537308.) - filed by Aether Therapeutics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Charles Weinblatt

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stamatios Stamoulis