This case was last updated from PACER on 08/09/2020 at 10:29:57 (UTC).

Advanced Training Group Worldwide, Inc. v. Proactive Technologies, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/10/2020 Advanced Training Group Worldwide, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Proactive Technologies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are T. S. Ellis, III and Theresa Carroll Buchanan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00646

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

T. S. Ellis, III

Referral Judge

Theresa Carroll Buchanan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Advanced Training Group Worldwide, Inc.

Defendants

Proactive Technologies, Inc.

Miles & Stockbridge, P.C.

CFO Moner Attwa

Principal Alfred M. Wurglitz

COO Richard Stockton

Oak Grove Technologies, L.L.C.

CEO Mark Gross

F3EA, Inc.

CEO Robert Acevado

CEO Timothy Pearson

Pro-Active Technologies, L.L.C.

Alfred M. Wurglitz

Timothy Pearson

Robert Acevado

Dick Stockton

Mark Gross

Moner Attwa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Susan Anne Austin

Attorney at Whitcomb, Selinsky PC

2201 Cooperative Way, Suite 600

Herndon, VA 20171

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan Richard Mook

Attorney at DiMuroGinsberg PC

1101 King Street, Suite 610

Alexandria, VA 22314-2956

Miles Jarrad Wright

Attorney at DimuroGinsberg PC

1101 King St, Suite 610

Alexandria, VA 22314

Bernard Joseph DiMuro

Attorney at DiMuroGinsberg PC

1101 King Street, Suite 610

Alexandria, VA 22314-2956

Brian Richard Iverson

Attorney at Bass Berry & Sims PLC (DC)

1201 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw, Suite 300

Washington, DC 20004

Todd Robert Overman

Attorney at Bass Berry & Sims PLC (DC)

1201 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw, Suite 300

Washington, DC 20004

John David Folds

Attorney at Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz PC (DC)

901 K St Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

#86

(#86) Notice of Hearing Date re #80 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, (Austin, Susan) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#85

(#85) Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Advanced Training Group Worldwide, Inc. re #83 MOTION to Seal Exhibit to First Amended Complaint, #84 Memorandum in Support (Austin, Susan) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#84

(#84) Memorandum in Support re #83 MOTION to Seal Exhibit to First Amended Complaint . (Austin, Susan) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

83 #2

Proposed Order

83 #1

Proposed Order

#83

(#83) MOTION to Seal Exhibit to First Amended Complaint by Advanced Training Group Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order)(Austin, Susan) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

82 #1

Exhibit 1

#80

(#80) First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by Advanced Training Group Worldwide, Inc.. (Austin, Susan) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#8

(#8) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Mark Gross, CEO of Oak Grove Technologies, LLC by Advanced Training Group Worldwide, Inc.. (Austin, Susan) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

#7

(#7) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Oak Grove Technologies, LLC through its registered agent by Advanced Training Group Worldwide, Inc.. (Austin, Susan) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

#6

(#6) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Timothy Pearson, CEO of F3EA, Inc. by Advanced Training Group Worldwide, Inc.. (Austin, Susan) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

#5

(#5) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint F3EA, Inc. through its Registered Agent by Advanced Training Group Worldwide, Inc.. (Austin, Susan) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Richard Stockton, COO of Proactive Technologies, Inc. by Advanced Training Group Worldwide, Inc.. (Austin, Susan) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Robert Acevado, CEO, Proactive Technologies, Inc. by Advanced Training Group Worldwide, Inc.. (Austin, Susan) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint to Proactive Technologies through its registered agent by Advanced Training Group Worldwide, Inc.. (Austin, Susan) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#80) First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by Advanced Training Group Worldwide, Inc.. (Austin, Susan) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

109 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #83 MOTION to Seal Exhibit to First Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit 1)(Austin, Susan) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) Notice of Hearing Date re #80 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, (Austin, Susan) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Advanced Training Group Worldwide, Inc. re #83 MOTION to Seal Exhibit to First Amended Complaint, #84 Memorandum in Support (Austin, Susan) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) Memorandum in Support re #83 MOTION to Seal Exhibit to First Amended Complaint . (Austin, Susan) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) MOTION to Seal Exhibit to First Amended Complaint by Advanced Training Group Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order)(Austin, Susan) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Advanced Training Group Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Austin, Susan) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) Memorandum in Support re #80 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Austin, Susan) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by Advanced Training Group Worldwide, Inc.. (Austin, Susan) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) Waiver of re #78 MOTION to Strike #59 Memorandum in Opposition by Robert Acevado, Miles & Stockbridge, P.C., Proactive Technologies, Inc., Dick Stockton, Alfred M. Wurglitz (DiMuro, Bernard) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) MOTION to Strike #59 Memorandum in Opposition by Robert Acevado, Miles & Stockbridge, P.C., Proactive Technologies, Inc., Dick Stockton, Alfred M. Wurglitz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DiMuro, Bernard) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
83 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Miles & Stockbridge, P.C. through its registered agent by Advanced Training Group Worldwide, Inc.. (Austin, Susan) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Moner Attwa, CFO of Oak Grove Technologies, LLC by Advanced Training Group Worldwide, Inc.. (Austin, Susan) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Mark Gross, CEO of Oak Grove Technologies, LLC by Advanced Training Group Worldwide, Inc.. (Austin, Susan) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Oak Grove Technologies, LLC through its registered agent by Advanced Training Group Worldwide, Inc.. (Austin, Susan) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Timothy Pearson, CEO of F3EA, Inc. by Advanced Training Group Worldwide, Inc.. (Austin, Susan) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint F3EA, Inc. through its Registered Agent by Advanced Training Group Worldwide, Inc.. (Austin, Susan) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Richard Stockton, COO of Proactive Technologies, Inc. by Advanced Training Group Worldwide, Inc.. (Austin, Susan) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Robert Acevado, CEO, Proactive Technologies, Inc. by Advanced Training Group Worldwide, Inc.. (Austin, Susan) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint to Proactive Technologies through its registered agent by Advanced Training Group Worldwide, Inc.. (Austin, Susan) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with Jury Demand against Proactive Technologies, Inc., F3FA, Inc., Timothy Pearson, Oak Grove Technologies, L.L.C., Mark Gross, Moner Attwa, Robert Acevado, Dick Stockton, Miles & Stockbridge, P.C. , Alfred M. Wurglitz and Civil Cover Sheet ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7241439.), filed by Advanced Training Group Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Austin, Susan) Modified text on 6/11/2020 (klau, ). (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Miles & Stockbridge, P.C. is a litigant