This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/07/2022 at 07:40:50 (UTC).

Advanced Physical Medicine of Yorkville, Ltd. v. Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 06/08/2022 Advanced Physical Medicine of Yorkville, Ltd filed an Other lawsuit against Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John F. Kness. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02991

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Kness

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Advanced Physical Medicine of Yorkville, Ltd.

Defendants

Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company

American Specialty Health Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenneth Stephen McLaughlin, Jr.

Attorney at Law Offices of McLaughlin & Associates, P.C.

1 East Benton Street, Suite 301

Aurora, IL 60505

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel Keenan Ryan

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

151 N. Franklin Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Jennifer J. Kalas

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

322 Indianapolis Blvd, Suire 201`

Schererville, IN 46375

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #6

Exhibit E

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Advanced Physical Medicine of Yorkville, Ltd. by Kenneth Stephen McLaughlin, Jr (McLaughlin, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

#3

(#3) ORDER signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 6/16/2022: Telephonic initial status hearing is set for 8/23/2022 at 9:40 AM. Consistent with Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference in advance of the initial status hearing. No later than ten days before the status hearing, the parties shall jointly complete and file on the docket a report that provides the information required by the Court's model Joint Initial Status Report, which can be found at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?Iu9/vqz23r5X7AkWx/nLtg== (see link entitled "Joint Initial Status Report"). If all Defendants have not yet been served or have not yet responded to requests to draft the required Joint Initial Status Report, Plaintiff must file the report on its own and must inform the Court of that circumstance. The parties are to use the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, conference code 3796759. The public and media representatives may have access to the hearing via the same number. Audio recording of the hearing is not permitted; violations of this prohibition may result in sanctions. Participants are directed to keep their device muted when they are not speaking. Mailed notice(ef, ) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company by Jennifer J. Kalas (Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company by Daniel Keenan Ryan (Ryan, Daniel) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Advanced Physical Medicine of Yorkville, Ltd.. Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 6/15/2022, answer due 8/15/2022. (McLaughlin, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Advanced Physical Medicine of Yorkville, Ltd. as to American Specialty Health Group, Inc. on 7/28/2022, answer due 8/18/2022. (McLaughlin, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Advanced Physical Medicine of Yorkville, Ltd. as to American Specialty Health Group, Inc. on 7/28/2022, answer due 8/18/2022. (McLaughlin, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant American Specialty Health Group, Inc. (jxj, ) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Advanced Physical Medicine of Yorkville, Ltd.. Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 6/15/2022, answer due 8/15/2022. (McLaughlin, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company by Daniel Keenan Ryan (Ryan, Daniel) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company by Jennifer J. Kalas (Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 6/16/2022: Telephonic initial status hearing is set for 8/23/2022 at 9:40 AM. Consistent with Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference in advance of the initial status hearing. No later than ten days before the status hearing, the parties shall jointly complete and file on the docket a report that provides the information required by the Court's model Joint Initial Status Report, which can be found at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?Iu9/vqz23r5X7AkWx/nLtg== (see link entitled "Joint Initial Status Report"). If all Defendants have not yet been served or have not yet responded to requests to draft the required Joint Initial Status Report, Plaintiff must file the report on its own and must inform the Court of that circumstance. The parties are to use the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, conference code 3796759. The public and media representatives may have access to the hearing via the same number. Audio recording of the hearing is not permitted; violations of this prohibition may result in sanctions. Participants are directed to keep their device muted when they are not speaking. Mailed notice(ef, ) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Advanced Physical Medicine of Yorkville, Ltd. by Kenneth Stephen McLaughlin, Jr (McLaughlin, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (emc, ) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Kness. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (emc, ) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Advanced Physical Medicine of Yorkville, Ltd.; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19542621. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(McLaughlin, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less