This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/11/2022 at 07:37:36 (UTC).

Advance Magazine Publishers Inc. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 Advance Magazine Publishers Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jorge L. Alonso. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00142

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jorge L. Alonso

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Advance Magazine Publishers Inc.

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Mericiny

Champer Art Store

gongzhi Official Store

7-Space Official Store

COLORFUL BOY Official Store

Icanvas Art Store

Bao Decoration Painting Store

What Art-Home Store

BAKE Wall Art Store

New Life Decor Store

IOIOI Store

Penguin Art Store

Boom Art Store

Ashes of Tiem Store

Happiness Wall&Art Store

Elk Forest Store

Chasoe Decor Store

HM Art Store

182 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jake Michael Christensen

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 S Wacker Drive, #2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Martin Francis Trainor

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr., Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Abby Marie Neu

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 S Wacker, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Marcella Deshonda Slay

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain Ltd.

300 South Wacker Dr. Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorney

Shengmao Mu

Attorney at Whitewood Law Pllc

57 West, 57Th Street, 3Rd And 4Th Floors

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#47

(#47) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Advance Magazine Publishers Inc. by Jake Michael Christensen (Christensen, Jake) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#46

(#46) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's Motion to withdraw as counsel #44 is granted. Attorney Martin Francis Trainor is given leave to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff. Motion hearing date of 3/2/22 is stricken. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#45

(#45) NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #44 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 3/2/2022 at 09:30 AM. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#44

(#44) MOTION by Attorney Martin F. Trainor to withdraw as attorney for Advance Magazine Publishers Inc.. No party information provided (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#43

(#43) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc. as to certain defendants (Neu, Abby) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#42

(#42) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc. as to certain defendants (Neu, Abby) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#41

(#41) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Order. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 2/22/2022. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

35 #1

Exhibit A

#35

(#40) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Telephonic motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's Motion for preliminary injunction #35 is granted. Enter preliminary injunction order. The Clerk is directed to unseal all previously sealed documents. Plaintiff is ordered to add all Defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days. Instructions can be found on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Telephonic Status hearing is set for 3/25/22 at 9:30 a.m. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 888-808-6929 and the access code is 4911854. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#4

(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#3

(#3) MOTION by Plaintiff Advance Magazine Publishers Inc. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#2) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Advance Magazine Publishers Inc. Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Advance Magazine Publishers Inc. by Jake Michael Christensen (Christensen, Jake) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's Motion to withdraw as counsel #44 is granted. Attorney Martin Francis Trainor is given leave to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff. Motion hearing date of 3/2/22 is stricken. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #44 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 3/2/2022 at 09:30 AM. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) MOTION by Attorney Martin F. Trainor to withdraw as attorney for Advance Magazine Publishers Inc.. No party information provided (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc. as to certain defendants (Neu, Abby) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc. as to certain defendants (Neu, Abby) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: Champer Art Store, gongzhi Official Store, 7-Space Official Store, COLORFUL BOY Official Store, Icanvas Art Store, Bao Decoration Painting Store, What Art-Home Store, BAKE Wall Art Store, New Life Decor Store, IOIOI Store, Penguin Art Store, Boom Art Store, Ashes of Tiem Store, Happiness Wall&Art Store, Elk Forest Store, Chasoe Decor Store, HM Art Store, Shop910645054 Store, Chick Art Store, Cozy Wall&Art Store, Jvogue Wall&Art Store, Mingsong Lifecloth Store, Nari Art Store, Shop911325171 Store, CICIKUO Art Prints Store, Luna Art Store, 8788 Store, Newnesses Wall Art Store, BABY 521 Store, ChenLin Wall Art Store, HUIJUN Decor Store, Inewsun Wall Art Store, shop0128 Store, MZUN DECORATION Store, Homepop Painting Store, ChuFengFuMianLuHuaNong Store, YOUYI Painting Store, PlQueen Painting Store, SFRoom Painting Store, Rice Wall Art Shop Store, DexterArt Store, QQL Art Store, 66painting ART Store, Durant Store, EasyArt Store, Art Wall Gallery Store, Annadream Art Store, 69 Whimsy Store, Good life painting Store, PP-ART Store, LaLaFang Art Store, 74 Decoration Painting Store, Living Art Store Store, AsianBillion Store, Niche art Store, Turquoise Art Gallery Store, li211046 Store, Pleasing Art Store, Baileys Art Store, Colorful-85 Store, walls tin sign Store, Katie Art Store, Ozma Wall&Art Store, Muronda Decor Store, Yi Jianmeihua Co,. Ltd Store, ATTRAYANT Store, DHROOM Official Store, Jasber Wall Art Store, Nannapat Official Store, Fonseca Decor Store, Zenobia Decor Painting Store, RONGHAO Store, gongzhi decor painting museum Store, Beautiful Zhi Store, Asaph Official Store, Shop911424631 Store, Yang Wall Art Store, COICO ART Store, Luyao Artwork Store, KAYU Store, Vorfreude Store, onemo art Store, Insistance Wall Art Store, Wait day Store, Maria Life Store, 169art Store, SPARKLET Painting Store, Homelsss, LadyIron, JQNdedian, ZhouJiemin Art, Wyatn, zhoukouzhioushangmao, Yokishy, zhichaoqijiandianpu, ZHIWENZIFA, worTH, yuanyongjie, yizhihu shop, ZHANGWENYUAN, Yongxiu electronic grocery store, Creat ur Goods, Lai Zhang xing Art, mikevann, YueQingJuWeiXiDianQiYouXianGongSi, xiaodongmeiguodian, Cai Jia fu Art, nonghengbaihuodian, us-lingpu, CC-POSTER, Blanksong, Oriental Treasure Store, JERRT, Snow love store, Lantart, Chen Ya ping Art, GUOQIANG666, YY-CLL, Yi Fan Art Shop, kunmingshiguanduquchaopaimeirongdian, anhuiangusidianzishangwuyouxiangongsi, Sky shopping cart, yanjinxianfeiyushangmaoyouxianzerengongsi, Unong, Zhang Lang xing Art, Top Stores in Wuzhi County, Huang Yan huang Art, GLXDD, muzitop, NingYU, xiweiershangmaoyouxiangongsi, lijuanmai, wantongshangmao, xiongchumei, SHUAI LING, ETGYH, damaihaibao, Shi Zhi sen Art, A38202H3I7AA6Y, xumeiquan, yangqingfudaye, shanghaiyounuoqichekejiyouxiangongsi, Witchy Decor, xuliangliangmaileihao, jinghexinchenggongfenfeibaihuoshangdian, QIFANMAOYI, ET poster, CHENFYWENXUE, Youth T, Noapasa, shanghaiqiudao, MK case, wanyanggwuding, ChenCCCC, aganshangmao, xinjiuan888, Freubat, XCCDD, eixoal, Sukkicos, BingChengBaiHuoDian, Doolin-Dalton, HZX ART, andreschaller, A7IJTFWNVPUQP, A8Y2KQVVISBQW, nostalgic, zhaobinbinshenghuomeirongguan, Lingering love, irinaclescenco, bao ji shi jin lu si dian zi shang wu you xian gon, changyuanshilianmeishangmaoyouxiangongsi, Chenjianwei, XiaoLiXiaoDian, FEGUW, Sunset Store, love home art, Secreteternal, lailai1238, lan fang520, wangting6688, dianshang001hao, zhangsan660, Jayahh, Daniellesmgl, medhurstdomingo, 78zuiua, Karen & Eric Richards, shixiangru, Robert Dunn45, Grenpoem Labiko, luoyuhua159, zhangguangyin1987, MA2zujie28WS, Xinyi Art, chenlong65984, jinlei1604, gejing1569 and zszlkansdau added to case caption. (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Order. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 2/22/2022. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Telephonic motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's Motion for preliminary injunction #35 is granted. Enter preliminary injunction order. The Clerk is directed to unseal all previously sealed documents. Plaintiff is ordered to add all Defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days. Instructions can be found on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Telephonic Status hearing is set for 3/25/22 at 9:30 a.m. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 888-808-6929 and the access code is 4911854. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Telephonic status and motion hearing held. Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion for extension of temporary restraining order #32 is granted in part. As stated on the record, although the Court is reluctant to extend temporary restraining orders beyond the 28 day period set out in Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(b)(2), the unusual circumstances here occasioned by the delay in third-parties effectuating the temporary restraining order justifies the extension to and including 2/22/2022. The Seventh Circuit has stated, "the language of Rule 65(b)(2) and the great weight of authority support the view that 28 days is the outer limit for a TRO without the consent of the enjoined party, regardless of whether the TRO was issued with or without notice." H-D Michigan, LLC v. Hellenic Duty Free Shops S.A., 694 F.3d 827, 844 (7th Cir. 2012). The Seventh Circuit, however, also recognizes that a TRO can be extended beyond the 28 day period and remains effective when it is so extended, although it becomes in effect an immediately appealable preliminary injunction as long as the order comports with the formal requirements for a preliminary injunction. Id. at 845. Following the Seventh Circuit's guidance, the Court has reviewed the original TRO granted in this case [see #24 ] and believes that the explanation given to support its entry is sufficient to support the entry of a preliminary injunction as well. The Court further finds that the substantial harm may befall the Plaintiff if the TRO is not extended because the Defendants may attempt to move any assets obtained from the alleged counterfeiting from their bank accounts to offshore accounts. Moreover, the Court notes that Plaintiff indicates that it has finally resolved the issue with the last third-party to effectuate the TRO and has simultaneously provided notice to the Defendants and filed a motion for a preliminary injunction set for 2/22/2022. Accordingly, the Court finds good cause to extend the TRO for an additional 7 days until the Court can rule on the pending motion for preliminary injunction. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Advance Magazine Publishers Inc. by Marcella Deshonda Slay (Slay, Marcella) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Advance Magazine Publishers Inc. by Abby Marie Neu (Neu, Abby) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Advance Magazine Publishers Inc. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Advance Magazine Publishers Inc. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION by Plaintiff Advance Magazine Publishers Inc. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Advance Magazine Publishers Inc. Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc.; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19040365. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Advance Magazine Publishers Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shengmao Mu