This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/13/2021 at 07:40:55 (UTC).

Advance Magazine Publishers Inc. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 Advance Magazine Publishers Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven C. Seeger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-05473

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven C. Seeger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Advance Magazine Publishers Inc.

Defendant

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr., Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Abby Marie Neu

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 S Wacker, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

RiKaleigh C. Johnson

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) STATEMENT by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc. Regarding #25 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#25

(#25) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Status hearing held on November 10, 2021. The Court expressed its concerns to Plaintiff's counsel about recent communications. Plaintiff's counsel acknowledged that they heard and understood the message from the Court, without the need for a written opinion. By November 30, 2021, Plaintiff must file a spreadsheet that identifies, by Defendant, the amount of funds frozen under this Court's temporary restraining order. That obligation will continue to apply even if this Court enters final judgment in the meantime. Mailed notice (jjr, ) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#24

(#24) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: On November 4, 2021, this Court set a hearing for November 10, 2021 and 9:00 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel filed a motion, stating that they have a conflict with other court hearings that morning. The motion is granted in part and denied in part. This Court resets the hearing for 8:30 a.m. on November 10, 2021. All attorneys for Plaintiff must participate, in person. No exceptions. No telephonic participation. Mailed notice (jjr, ) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#23

(#23) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: The Court will preside over an in-person hearing on November 10, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 2319. Each and every attorney who has entered an appearance for Plaintiff in this case must appear, in person. Participation by telephone is not permitted. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

22 #2

Exhibit 2

22 #1

Exhibit 1

#22

(#22) STATEMENT by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc. re #21 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#21

(#21) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: By November 1, 2021, Plaintiff's counsel must file a spreadsheet that lists each and every Schedule A case filed in this District by Greer, Burns, & Crain since January 1, 2020. The spreadsheet must include the name of each case, the case number, and the assigned judge. Separately, Plaintiff's counsel must file a second spreadsheet that identifies every Schedule A case filed by Greer, Burns, & Crain that was assigned to Judge Seeger since January 1, 2020. Plaintiff's counsel also must submit an Excel version of the spreadsheets by emailing them to Judge Seeger's proposed order inbox. No extensions.Mailed notice (jjr, ) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#20

(#20) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

#5

#4

#3

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) STATEMENT by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc. Regarding #25 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Status hearing held on November 10, 2021. The Court expressed its concerns to Plaintiff's counsel about recent communications. Plaintiff's counsel acknowledged that they heard and understood the message from the Court, without the need for a written opinion. By November 30, 2021, Plaintiff must file a spreadsheet that identifies, by Defendant, the amount of funds frozen under this Court's temporary restraining order. That obligation will continue to apply even if this Court enters final judgment in the meantime. Mailed notice (jjr, ) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: On November 4, 2021, this Court set a hearing for November 10, 2021 and 9:00 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel filed a motion, stating that they have a conflict with other court hearings that morning. The motion is granted in part and denied in part. This Court resets the hearing for 8:30 a.m. on November 10, 2021. All attorneys for Plaintiff must participate, in person. No exceptions. No telephonic participation. Mailed notice (jjr, ) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: The Court will preside over an in-person hearing on November 10, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 2319. Each and every attorney who has entered an appearance for Plaintiff in this case must appear, in person. Participation by telephone is not permitted. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) STATEMENT by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc. re #21 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: By November 1, 2021, Plaintiff's counsel must file a spreadsheet that lists each and every Schedule A case filed in this District by Greer, Burns, & Crain since January 1, 2020. The spreadsheet must include the name of each case, the case number, and the assigned judge. Separately, Plaintiff's counsel must file a second spreadsheet that identifies every Schedule A case filed by Greer, Burns, & Crain that was assigned to Judge Seeger since January 1, 2020. Plaintiff's counsel also must submit an Excel version of the spreadsheets by emailing them to Judge Seeger's proposed order inbox. No extensions.Mailed notice (jjr, ) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #17 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MEMORANDUM by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc. in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #16 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (cp, ) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mxo, ) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Advance Magazine Publishers Inc. by Abby Marie Neu (Neu, Abby) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Advance Magazine Publishers Inc. by RiKaleigh C. Johnson (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Advance Magazine Publishers Inc. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Advance Magazine Publishers Inc. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION by Plaintiff Advance Magazine Publishers Inc. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Advance Magazine Publishers Inc. Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Advance Magazine Publishers Inc.; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18769526. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Advance Magazine Publishers Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RiKaleigh C. Johnson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Justin R. Gaudio