This case was last updated from PACER on 02/20/2021 at 13:23:29 (UTC).

Adr1assist, LLC v. Lima One Capital, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/22/2020 Adr1assist, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Lima One Capital, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven D. Grimberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-05184

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Grimberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Adr1assist, LLC

Defendant

Lima One Capital, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gregory John Bosseler

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, PLLC - Atl

Suite 4200, 191 Peachtree St., Ne

Atlanta, GA 30306

Marie Noel Appel

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan

700 Van Ness Avenue, Suite 511

San Francisco, CA 94102

Michael Francis Ram

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan Mass Tort Dept.

711 Van Ness Avenue, Suite 500

San Francisco, CA 94102

Defendant Attorney

Matthew Robert Rosenkoff

Attorney at Taylor English Duma LLP

Suite 200, 1600 Parkwood Circle

Atlanta, GA 30339

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the #15 Amended Complaint. Lima One Capital, LLC shall Answer by 3/12/2021. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 2/17/2021. (jed) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael Francis Ram. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on February 16, 2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ash) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Marie Noel Appel. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on February 16, 2021. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ash) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lima One Capital, LLC by Lima One Capital, LLC.(Rosenkoff, Matthew) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #15 Amended Complaint, by Lima One Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenkoff, Matthew) Modified on 2/17/2021 to link to correct document (jed). (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #12 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Francis Ram Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10706435).. Attorney Michael Francis Ram added appearing on behalf of Adr1assist, LLC (nmb) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Marie Noel Appel Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10706434).. Attorney Marie Noel Appel added appearing on behalf of Adr1assist, LLC (nmb) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) APPLICATION for Admission of Michael Francis Ram Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10706435).by Adr1assist, LLC. (Bosseler, Gregory) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) APPLICATION for Admission of Marie Noel Appel Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10706434).by Adr1assist, LLC. (Bosseler, Gregory) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotification of Docket Correction re #10 Return of Service Executed by Adr1assist, LLC. Lima One Capital, LLC served on 1/29/2021. Answer due 2/19/2021. (Bosseler, Gregory) Modified on 2/4/2021 to add dates to text (jed). (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Electronic Summons Issued as to Lima One Capital, LLC. (jed) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lima One Capital, LLC with Jury Demand filed by Adr1assist, LLC.(jed) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 2/17/2021 to correct file date (rvb). (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ---FILED INCORRECTLY- REDOCKETED AT #15 --- AMENDED COMPLAINT against Adr1assist, LLC with Jury Demand filed by Adr1assist, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons)(Bosseler, Gregory) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 2/17/2021 to add red text (jed). (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Bosseler, Gregory) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on December 28, 2020. (ash) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lima One Capital, LLC filed by Adr1assist, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Bosseler, Gregory) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/8/2020. (rjs) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Lima One Capital, LLC. (rjs) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-10520873) filed by Adr1assist, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rjs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lima One Capital, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Robert Rosenkoff