This case was last updated from PACER on 12/07/2019 at 07:36:40 (UTC).

Adomay El v. Esposito et al

Case Summary

On 10/08/2019 a Civil Right - Other Civil Right case was filed by Adomay El against Esposito in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00526

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

Presiding Judges

John J. McConnell, Jr.

Mary S. McElroy

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Julisa Amurra Adomay El

Providence, RI 02903

Julisa Amurra Adonay El

Pawtucket, RI 02860

Defendants

Officer Chotman

Officer Scachelo

LT Esposito

Officer Diaz

Chris

Chotman

Q

Williams

Diaz

Eli

Prete

Scachelo

Rosso

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) JUDGMENT dismissing this civil action - entered by the Clerk of Court on 11/15/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

1 #2

Affidavit

#3

(#3) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Julisa Amurra Adomay El. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) RESPONSE by Julisa Amurra Adonay El re Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Simoncelli, Michael) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Julisa Amurra Adomay El. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit)(Farrell Pletcher, Paula) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Change of Address by Julisa Amurra Adonay El (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) JUDGMENT dismissing this civil action - entered by the Clerk of Court on 11/15/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • TEXT ORDER: By order entered 10/22/2019, the plaintiff was directed to re-file her application to proceed without prepayment of fees and affidavit or, in the alternative, pay the filing fee on or before 11/5/2019, and was warned that failure to do so would lead to dismissal of this action for lack of diligent prosecution. Plaintiff's offer in her 11/1/2019 response of one (1) Troy ounce.999 fine silver-coin is not an acceptable form of payment. Plaintiff having failed to comply with this Court's 10/22/2019 order, it is hereby ordered that the above-captioned case be dismissed for lack of diligent prosecution. The Clerk is hereby directed to enter judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 58 - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 11/15/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RESPONSE by Julisa Amurra Adonay El re Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Simoncelli, Michael) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Change of Address by Julisa Amurra Adonay El (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The Plaintiff shall re-file her motion with the requested financial information or pay the initial filing fee of $400.00 on or before 11/5/2019. Failure to do so may result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 10/22/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • Case reassigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy. District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • TEXT ORDER: This case is transferred to the calendar of Judge Mary S. McElroy- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/9/2019. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Julisa Amurra Adomay El. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Julisa Amurra Adomay El. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit)(Farrell Pletcher, Paula) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Julisa Amurra Adomay El. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Julisa Amurra Adomay El. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit)(Farrell Pletcher, Paula) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.