This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/12/2021 at 10:59:55 (UTC).

Admore v. Hospice of Palm Beach County, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/11/2021 Admore filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Hospice of Palm Beach County, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dave Lee Brannon and Donald M. Middlebrooks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:21-CV-80047

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Dave Lee Brannon

Presiding Judge

Donald M. Middlebrooks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shekeara Admore

Defendant

Hospice of Palm Beach County Inc. doing business as Trustbridge Hospice Foundation, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Wolfgang M. Florin

Attorney at Florin Gray Bouzas, Owens, LLC

16524 Pointe Village Drive, Suite 100

Lutz, FL 33558

Christopher D. Gray

Attorney at Law Firm of Florin Gray Bouzas, Owens, LLC

16524 Pointe Village Drive, Suite 100

Lutz, FL 33558

Defendant Attorneys

Riley Francis Kennedy

Attorney at Gunster, Yoakley & Stewart, P.A.

777 South Flagler Drive, Suite 500 East, West Palm Beach

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Roger William Feicht

Attorney at Gunster

777 S. Flagler Drive, Suite 500 East

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Deadlines re #9 Scheduling Order,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,, by Shekeara Admore. Responses due by 3/15/2021 (Gray, Christopher) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #7 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Shekeara Admore. (Gray, Christopher) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

#9

(#9) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: ( Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2021., Discovery due by 6/28/2021. Fact Discovery due by 6/28/2021. Expert Discovery due by 6/28/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 3/15/2021. In Limine Motions due by 7/12/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 7/12/2021. Motions due by 7/12/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 8/16/2021. Jury Trial set for 9/13/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Calendar Call set for 9/8/2021 at 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 2/21/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: Jury Trial set for 9/13/2021 at 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 9/8/2021 at 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon to enter a Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/17/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

7 #1

Exhibit

#7

(#7) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Hospice of Palm Beach County Inc.. Attorney Riley Francis Kennedy added to party Hospice of Palm Beach County Inc.(pty:dft). Responses due by 2/24/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kennedy, Riley) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#5

(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Hospice of Palm Beach County Inc.. Attorney Roger William Feicht added to party Hospice of Palm Beach County Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Feicht, Roger) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Shekeara Admore. Hospice of Palm Beach County Inc. served on 1/13/2021, answer due 2/3/2021. (Gray, Christopher) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Hospice of Palm Beach County Inc. (mee) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

1 #3

Summon(s)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit FCRA Authorization

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Hospice of Palm Beach County, Inc. d/b/a Trustbridge Hospice Foundation, Inc.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14190459, filed by Shekeara Admore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FCRA Authorization, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s))(Gray, Christopher) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Deadlines re #9 Scheduling Order,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,, by Shekeara Admore. Responses due by 3/15/2021 (Gray, Christopher) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff seeks a one-week extension of time to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (DE #7 ), citing the press of other business and recent travel. Because of the brief nature of the requested extension and that it is unopposed, I will grant the Motion. Plaintiff SHALL RESPOND to Docket Entry #7 by March 3, 2021. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/26/2021. (kal) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #7 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Shekeara Admore. (Gray, Christopher) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: ( Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2021., Discovery due by 6/28/2021. Fact Discovery due by 6/28/2021. Expert Discovery due by 6/28/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 3/15/2021. In Limine Motions due by 7/12/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 7/12/2021. Motions due by 7/12/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 8/16/2021. Jury Trial set for 9/13/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Calendar Call set for 9/8/2021 at 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 2/21/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: Jury Trial set for 9/13/2021 at 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 9/8/2021 at 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon to enter a Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/17/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Hospice of Palm Beach County Inc.. Attorney Riley Francis Kennedy added to party Hospice of Palm Beach County Inc.(pty:dft). Responses due by 2/24/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kennedy, Riley) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint. Defendant seeks a one-week extension of the deadline to respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint from February 3, 2021 to February 10, 2021. Defendant's counsel represents that he has been working diligently to prepare a responsive pleading but requires additional time to complete same. I will grant the requested relief. Accordingly, Defendant shall respond to the Complaint by February 10, 2021. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/8/2021. (kal) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Hospice of Palm Beach County Inc.. Attorney Roger William Feicht added to party Hospice of Palm Beach County Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Feicht, Roger) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Shekeara Admore. Hospice of Palm Beach County Inc. served on 1/13/2021, answer due 2/3/2021. (Gray, Christopher) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Hospice of Palm Beach County Inc. (mee) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Hospice of Palm Beach County, Inc. d/b/a Trustbridge Hospice Foundation, Inc.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14190459, filed by Shekeara Admore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FCRA Authorization, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s))(Gray, Christopher) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Riley Francis Kennedy

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Roger William Feicht