This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/10/2020 at 08:45:06 (UTC).

Admore v. Hospice of Palm Beach County, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/11/2020 Admore filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Hospice of Palm Beach County, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dave Lee Brannon and Donald M. Middlebrooks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:20-CV-81295

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Dave Lee Brannon

Presiding Judge

Donald M. Middlebrooks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shekeara Admore

Defendant

Hospice of Palm Beach County, Inc. doing business as Trustbridge Hospice Foundation, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Wolfgang M. Florin

Attorney at Florin Gray Bouzas, Owens, LLC

16524 Pointe Village Drive, Suite 100

Lutz, FL 33558

Christopher D. Gray

Attorney at Law Firm of Florin Gray Bouzas, Owens, LLC

16524 Pointe Village Drive, Suite 100

Lutz, FL 33558

Defendant Attorneys

Riley Francis Kennedy

Attorney at Gunster, Yoakley & Stewart, P.A.

777 South Flagler Drive, Suite 500 East, West Palm Beach

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Roger William Feicht

Attorney at Gunster

777 S. Flagler Drive, Suite 500 East

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Robyn S. Hankins as Mediator. (Feicht, Roger) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#11

(#11) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Shekeara Admore (Gray, Christopher) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#10

(#10) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Amended Pleadings due by 10/13/2020., All Discovery due by 1/25/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 10/13/2020., In Limine Motions due by 2/8/2021., Motions due by 2/8/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/15/2021.), and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 9/25/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: ( Jury Trial set for 4/12/2021 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 4/7/2021 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 9/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (jao) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#8

(#8) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Shekeara Admore (Gray, Christopher) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#7

(#7) Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hospice of Palm Beach County, Inc. (Kennedy, Riley) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Riley Francis Kennedy on behalf of Hospice of Palm Beach County, Inc.. Attorney Riley Francis Kennedy added to party Hospice of Palm Beach County, Inc.(pty:dft). (Kennedy, Riley) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Hospice of Palm Beach County, Inc.. Attorney Roger William Feicht added to party Hospice of Palm Beach County, Inc.(pty:dft). (Feicht, Roger) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Shekeara Admore. Hospice of Palm Beach County, Inc. served on 8/17/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Gray, Christopher) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Hospice of Palm Beach County, Inc. (jbs) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Hospice of Palm Beach County, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13330082, filed by Shekeara Admore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Gray, Christopher) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Robyn S. Hankins as Mediator. (Feicht, Roger) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Shekeara Admore (Gray, Christopher) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Amended Pleadings due by 10/13/2020., All Discovery due by 1/25/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 10/13/2020., In Limine Motions due by 2/8/2021., Motions due by 2/8/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/15/2021.), and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 9/25/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: ( Jury Trial set for 4/12/2021 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 4/7/2021 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 9/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (jao) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Shekeara Admore (Gray, Christopher) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hospice of Palm Beach County, Inc. (Kennedy, Riley) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Riley Francis Kennedy on behalf of Hospice of Palm Beach County, Inc.. Attorney Riley Francis Kennedy added to party Hospice of Palm Beach County, Inc.(pty:dft). (Kennedy, Riley) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Hospice of Palm Beach County, Inc.. Attorney Roger William Feicht added to party Hospice of Palm Beach County, Inc.(pty:dft). (Feicht, Roger) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Shekeara Admore. Hospice of Palm Beach County, Inc. served on 8/17/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Gray, Christopher) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Hospice of Palm Beach County, Inc. (jbs) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Hospice of Palm Beach County, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13330082, filed by Shekeara Admore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Gray, Christopher) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Riley Francis Kennedy

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Roger William Feicht