This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/16/2022 at 10:22:44 (UTC).

ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY v. SHEET METAL MASTERS, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against SHEET METAL MASTERS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are T KENT WETHERELL II and ZACHARY C BOLITHO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-08448

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

T KENT WETHERELL II

Referral Judge

ZACHARY C BOLITHO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants and Counter Claimants

SHEET METAL MASTERS INC

WHITESELL-GREEN INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

WILLIAM H BUECHNER, JR

Attorney at FREEMAN MATHIS & GARY LLP - ATLANTA GA

100 Galleria Parkway, Suite 1600

Atlanta, GA 30009

PHILIP WADE SAVRIN

Attorney at FREEMAN MATHIS & GARY LLP - ATLANTA GA

100 Galleria Pkwy, Ste 1600

Atlanta, GA 30339-5948

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

MATTHEW ADAM BUSH

Attorney at MCDONALD FLEMING LLP - PENSACOLA FL

Po Box 12388

Pensacola, FL 32591

HAROLD WESLEY REEDER

Attorney at EMMANUEL SHEPPARD & CONDON - PENSACOLA FL

30 S Spring St

Pensacola, FL 32502

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, and attorney William H. Buechner, Jr. is authorized to appear pro hac vice for Plaintiff. (Appointed WILLIAM H BUECHNER, JR for ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY) Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 8/11/2022. (mb) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

#14

(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent BERKLEY INSURANCE COMPANY, Corporate Parent W.R. Berkley Corporation for ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY, ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY.. (SAVRIN, PHILIP) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

13 #1

Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing

13 #13

Main Document

#12

(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by SHEET METAL MASTERS INC. (BUSH, MATTHEW) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by SHEET METAL MASTERS INC. (BUSH, MATTHEW) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#10

(#10) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 8/17/2022. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/16/2022. Discovery due by 11/30/2022. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 8/3/2022. (mb) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

1 #10

SUMMONS - Whitesell-Green, Inc.

1 #9

SUMMONS - Sheet Metal Masters, Inc.

1 #8

Exhibit H - Admiral Policy 2017

1 #7

Exhibit G - Admiral Policy 2016

1 #6

Exhibit F - Admiral Policy 2015

1 #5

Exhibit E - Interim Award

1 #4

Exhibit D - WGI Detailed Statement of Claim

1 #3

Exhibit C - Arbitration Claim 10.15.19

1 #2

Exhibit B - SMM Roof Contract

1 #1

Exhibit A - Steel Erection Contract

1 #1

Main Document

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, and attorney William H. Buechner, Jr. is authorized to appear pro hac vice for Plaintiff. (Appointed WILLIAM H BUECHNER, JR for ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY) Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 8/11/2022. (mb) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent BERKLEY INSURANCE COMPANY, Corporate Parent W.R. Berkley Corporation for ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY, ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY.. (SAVRIN, PHILIP) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William H. Buechner, Jr..( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7375716.) by ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing) (BUECHNER, WILLIAM) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by SHEET METAL MASTERS INC. (BUSH, MATTHEW) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by SHEET METAL MASTERS INC. (BUSH, MATTHEW) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 8/17/2022. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/16/2022. Discovery due by 11/30/2022. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 8/3/2022. (mb) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #7 Answer to Complaint (please see proposed ISO). (mb) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) COUNTERCLAIM against ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by WHITESELL-GREEN INC. (REEDER, HAROLD) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by WHITESELL-GREEN INC. (REEDER, HAROLD) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by WHITESELL-GREEN INC. (REEDER, HAROLD) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW ADAM BUSH on behalf of SHEET METAL MASTERS INC (BUSH, MATTHEW) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY. SHEET METAL MASTERS INC served on 7/19/2022, answer due 8/9/2022. (SAVRIN, PHILIP) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY. WHITESELL-GREEN INC served on 7/12/2022, answer due 8/2/2022. (SAVRIN, PHILIP) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to SHEET METAL MASTERS INC, (#1 Summons - WHITESELL). (mb) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SAVRIN, PHILIP) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7203880.), filed by ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Steel Erection Contract, #2 Exhibit B - SMM Roof Contract, #3 Exhibit C - Arbitration Claim 10.15.19, #4 Exhibit D - WGI Detailed Statement of Claim, #5 Exhibit E - Interim Award, #6 Exhibit F - Admiral Policy 2015, #7 Exhibit G - Admiral Policy 2016, #8 Exhibit H - Admiral Policy 2017, #9 SUMMONS - Sheet Metal Masters, Inc., #10 SUMMONS - Whitesell-Green, Inc.) (SAVRIN, PHILIP) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Admiral Insurance Group is a litigant