Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/11/2021 at 15:26:46 (UTC).

Admiral Insurance Company v. Pete's Electric, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 Admiral Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Pete's Electric, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ronald G Morgan and Fernando Rodriguez, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00049

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ronald G Morgan

Presiding Judge

Fernando Rodriguez, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Admiral Insurance Company

Defendants

American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas

Pete's Electric, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher W Martin

Attorney at Martin Disiere et al

808 Travis Street, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77002

William Edward McMichael

Attorney at Martin Disiere et al

808 Travis, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorneys

Guy Hubert Riddle

Attorney at Anderson & Riddle LLP

1604 8Th Avenue

Fort Worth, TX 76104

Forrest Jacob Wynn

Attorney at Hicks Davis Wynn, P.C.

3700 Buffalo Speeway, Ste 1111

Houston, TX 77098

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Pete's Electric, LLC, filed.(Wynn, Forrest) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Pete's Electric, LLC, filed.(Wynn, Forrest) ( Per attorney filed in error) Modified on 5/17/2021 (mmapps, 4). (Entered: 05/17/2021)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas, filed.(Riddle, Guy) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) STIPULATION by Pete's Electric, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wynn, Forrest) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas, filed.(Riddle, Guy) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Admiral Insurance Company, filed.(McMichael, William) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#7

(#7) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/5/2021, filed.(McMichael, William) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#6

(#6) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Pete's Electric, LLC served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/5/2021, filed.(McMichael, William) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

5 #1

Continuation

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to 1.) American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas, 2.) Pete's Electric, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation)(JenniferLongoria, 1) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/13/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26260363) filed by Admiral Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin, Christopher) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Pete's Electric, LLC, filed.(Wynn, Forrest) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Pete's Electric, LLC, filed.(Wynn, Forrest) ( Per attorney filed in error) Modified on 5/17/2021 (mmapps, 4). (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas, filed.(Riddle, Guy) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION by Pete's Electric, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wynn, Forrest) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas, filed.(Riddle, Guy) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Admiral Insurance Company, filed.(McMichael, William) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/5/2021, filed.(McMichael, William) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Pete's Electric, LLC served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/5/2021, filed.(McMichael, William) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to 1.) American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas, 2.) Pete's Electric, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation)(JenniferLongoria, 1) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/13/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald G Morgan) Parties notified.(JenniferLongoria, 1) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas, filed.(Martin, Christopher) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Pete's Electric, LLC, filed.(Martin, Christopher) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26260363) filed by Admiral Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin, Christopher) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas is a litigant

Latest cases where Admiral Insurance Group is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Forrest Jacob Wynn