This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/19/2021 at 10:05:20 (UTC).

Admiral Insurance Company v. I.C.E. (US) Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 Admiral Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against I C E US Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Eli J. Richardson and Barbara D. Holmes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00130

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eli J. Richardson

Referral Judge

Barbara D. Holmes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Admiral Insurance Company

Defendant

I.C.E. (US) Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Payton M. Bradford

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd LLC (Nashville)

150 3Rd Avenue South, Suite 1900

Nashville, TN 37201

David Walulik

Attorney at Frost, Brown & Todd, LLC (OH)

3300 Great City Tower, 301 E Fourth Street

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Exhibit A - March 19 20201 Letter from D. Walulik to S. Clancy

#12

11 #1

Attachment Form of Proposed Order

#11

#10

#8

7 #1

Attachment Certificate of Good Standing

#7

#6

#5

#3

#2

#4

1 #4

Exhibit C Shapiro v Marriott 19C2615

1 #3

Exhibit B White v Marriott 18C3148

1 #2

Exhibit A Admiral Policy

1 #1

Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEMORANDUM in Support of #11 MOTION to Strike #10 Letter filed by Admiral Insurance Company . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - March 19 20201 Letter from D. Walulik to S. Clancy)(Bradford, Payton) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Strike #10 Letter by Admiral Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Form of Proposed Order)(Bradford, Payton) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Letter from Sean Clancy of I.C.E. (kc) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #7 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David W. Walulik is granted. Signed by Vicki Kinkade, Chief Deputy Clerk, on 3/2/2021.(vk) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Change of Address by Payton M. Bradford (Bradford, Payton) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for attorney David W. Walulik to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3318403) by Admiral Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Bradford, Payton) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons issued as to I.C.E. (US) Inc. (Service pages returned to counsel by regular mail.) (kc) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference is set for 4/26/2021 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (kc) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO FILER re DE#4 : The form for the Business Entity Disclosure Statement was not used. Counsel shall re-file the document using the form on the Court's website under the Forms section. Counsel shall use the event Business Entity Disclosure Statement under Other Documents when filing this document. (kc) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNSEL David Walulik: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 3/12/2021. (kc) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketOH State Bar status verified as active for David Walulik not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (kc) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Payton M. Bradford admitted to this court. (kc) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Admiral Insurance Company. (kc) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against I.C.E. (US) Inc. (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 0650-3316417), filed by Admiral Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(kc) (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/19/2021) (kc). (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/19/2021) (kc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2021: #2 Exhibit A Admiral Policy, #3 Exhibit B White v Marriott 18C3148, #4 Exhibit C Shapiro v Marriott 19C2615, #5 Exhibit D Schniepp v Marriott 19C2616, #6 Exhibit E Hartle v Marriott 19C2631, #7 Exhibit F Nashville Hospitality v Lee Co 20C2255) (kc). Modified on 2/19/2021 (kc). (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Admiral Insurance Group is a litigant

Latest cases where ICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Payton Bradford