This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/11/2022 at 07:45:22 (UTC).

Admiral Insurance Company v. Alfagomma Aurora TF LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 Admiral Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Alfagomma Aurora TF LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert M. Dow, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00146

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert M. Dow, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Admiral Insurance Company

Defendants

Alfagomma Aurora TF LLC

Michael Pfotenhauer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian M Reid

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo

303 West Madison Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Admiral Insurance Company; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19040938. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Reid, Brian) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #7

Exhibit G

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Reid, Brian) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Admiral Insurance Company by Brian M Reid (Reid, Brian) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Admiral Insurance Company (Reid, Brian) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#5

(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Joint status report due by 2/22/2022. Initial telephone conference is set for 2/25/2022 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial; (3) The report should include a proposed case management schedule reflecting any disputes between the parties as to the proposed schedule. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least three business days prior to the initial status and all further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Participants should use the Court's toll-free call-in number 877-336-1829, conference access code is 6963747. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

#6

(#6) STATUS Report (Initial) by Admiral Insurance Company (Reid, Brian) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#7

(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Telephone conference held. Initial telephone conference is set for 5/5/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Participants should use the Court's toll-free call-in number 877-336-1829, conference access code is 6963747. Joint status report is due no later than 5/2/2022. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Admiral Insurance Company. Alfagomma Aurora TF LLC waiver sent on 2/10/2022, answer due 4/11/2022. (Reid, Brian) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Admiral Insurance Company. Alfagomma Aurora TF LLC waiver sent on 2/10/2022, answer due 4/11/2022. (Reid, Brian) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Telephone conference held. Initial telephone conference is set for 5/5/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Participants should use the Court's toll-free call-in number 877-336-1829, conference access code is 6963747. Joint status report is due no later than 5/2/2022. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATUS Report (Initial) by Admiral Insurance Company (Reid, Brian) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Joint status report due by 2/22/2022. Initial telephone conference is set for 2/25/2022 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial; (3) The report should include a proposed case management schedule reflecting any disputes between the parties as to the proposed schedule. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least three business days prior to the initial status and all further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Participants should use the Court's toll-free call-in number 877-336-1829, conference access code is 6963747. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (sxh, ) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (sxh, ) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Admiral Insurance Company (Reid, Brian) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Admiral Insurance Company by Brian M Reid (Reid, Brian) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Reid, Brian) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Admiral Insurance Company; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19040938. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Reid, Brian) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Admiral Insurance Group is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian M. Reid