This case was last updated from PACER on 09/20/2019 at 07:42:52 (UTC).

Adkins v. Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement Agency

Case Summary

On 07/22/2019 Adkins filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement Agency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Benjamin W. Cheesbro and Lisa G. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00085

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Benjamin W. Cheesbro

Presiding Judge

Lisa G. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

George Wayne Adkins

Lehigh Acres, FL 33973

Defendant

Department Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement Agency

 

Court Documents

32 #1

envelope

#32

(#32) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by George Wayne Adkins. (Attachments: #1 envelope)REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(slt) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#31

(#31) RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 7/23/19. (slt) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#30

(#30) NOTICE of Transfer of Case from Middle District of Florida. (slt) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

29 #1

*Restricted*

#29

(#29) Case transfer in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 2:15-cv-00456. Case transferred electronically (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#28

(#28) OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and deferring in part #24 plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; adopting in part, rejecting in part, and deferring in part #27 Report and Recommendations. The Clerk shall immediately transfer the case to the Southern District of Georgia for all further proceedings. The Clerk is directed to terminate all deadlines and motions in the Fort Myers case and close the file. See Opinion and Order for details. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 12/29/2016. (AMB) (Entered: 12/29/2016)

#27

(#27) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #24 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, recommending that the motion be denied and this matter be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 11/28/2016. (LS) (LS). (Entered: 11/28/2016)

#24

(#24) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 by George Wayne Adkins. (SPB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando. (Entered: 03/29/2016)

#8

(#10) CERTIFICATE of service by George Wayne Adkins re #9 Notice of pendency of related cases, #8 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement, #7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. (SPB) (Entered: 08/20/2015)

#7

(#10) CERTIFICATE of service by George Wayne Adkins re #9 Notice of pendency of related cases, #8 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement, #7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. (SPB) (Entered: 08/20/2015)

#6

(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by George Wayne Adkins. (SPB) (Entered: 08/20/2015)

#5

(#9) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by George Wayne Adkins. Related case(s): yes (SPB) (Entered: 08/20/2015)

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/4/2015. (SPB) (Entered: 08/04/2015)

#3

(#3) APPLICATION TO PROCEED in District Court without prepaying Fees or costs by George Wayne Adkins. (RMT) (Entered: 07/31/2015)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 by George Wayne Adkins. (RMT) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando. (Entered: 07/31/2015)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Department Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement Agency with Jury Demand filed by George Wayne Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RMT) (Entered: 07/31/2015)

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by George Wayne Adkins. (Attachments: #1 envelope)REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(slt) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 7/23/19. (slt) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) NOTICE of Transfer of Case from Middle District of Florida. (slt) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) Case transfer in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 2:15-cv-00456. Case transferred electronically (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • CASE transferred to the Southern District of Georgia via electronic filing. (laf) (Entered: 01/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and deferring in part #24 plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; adopting in part, rejecting in part, and deferring in part #27 Report and Recommendations. The Clerk shall immediately transfer the case to the Southern District of Georgia for all further proceedings. The Clerk is directed to terminate all deadlines and motions in the Fort Myers case and close the file. See Opinion and Order for details. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 12/29/2016. (AMB) (Entered: 12/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #24 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, recommending that the motion be denied and this matter be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 11/28/2016. (LS) (LS). (Entered: 11/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ORDER denying without prejudice #20 plaintiff's Motion Supporting Case. See Order for details. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 9/19/2016. (AMB) (Entered: 09/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) SUPPORTING law by George Wayne Adkins (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (SLU) (Entered: 05/17/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 by George Wayne Adkins. (SPB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando. (Entered: 03/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CERTIFICATE of service by George Wayne Adkins re #9 Notice of pendency of related cases, #8 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement, #7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. (SPB) (Entered: 08/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by George Wayne Adkins. Related case(s): yes (SPB) (Entered: 08/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by George Wayne Adkins. (SPB) (Entered: 08/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION requesting appointment of counsel by George Wayne Adkins. (SPB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando. (Entered: 08/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/26/2015. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/12/2015. (WRW) (Entered: 08/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/26/2015. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 8/12/2015. (WRW) (Entered: 08/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/4/2015. (SPB) (Entered: 08/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPLICATION TO PROCEED in District Court without prepaying Fees or costs by George Wayne Adkins. (RMT) (Entered: 07/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 by George Wayne Adkins. (RMT) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando. (Entered: 07/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Department Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement Agency with Jury Demand filed by George Wayne Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RMT) (Entered: 07/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less