This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/14/2021 at 12:39:05 (UTC).

Adkins et al v. OnPoint Community Credit Union

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 Adkins filed a Finance - Banking lawsuit against OnPoint Community Credit Union. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Marco A. Hernandez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00567

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Banking

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marco A. Hernandez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cindy Adkins

Paiton Campbell

Timothy South

Defendant

OnPoint Community Credit Union

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David F. Sugerman

Attorney at David F. Sugerman Attorney, PC

707 Sw Washington Street, Suite 600

Portland, OR 97205

Nadia H. Dahab

Attorney at Sugerman Law Office

707 Sw Washington Street, Ste. 600

Portland, OR 97205

Lynn A. Toops

Attorney at Cohen & Malad, LLP

One Indiana Square, Suite 1400

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Defendant Attorneys

Frederick B. Burnside

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine, LLP (Seattle)

920 Fifth Avenue, Suite 3300

Seattle, WA 98104-1610

Timothy M. Cunningham

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine, LLP

1300 Sw Fifth Avenue, Suite 2400

Portland, OR 97201-5630

 

Court Documents

#12

11 #2

Appendix 2

11 #1

Appendix 1

#11

#9

#8

7 #1

Appendix 1

#7

#6

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Reply to Motion to Remand to State Court #8 . Filed by Timothy South. (Sugerman, David) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Remand to State Court #8 . Filed by OnPoint Community Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Appendix 2) (Cunningham, Timothy) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: Granting Motion to Stay Briefing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #9 . If the Court denies Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court #8 , Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is due 14 days after the Court enters the order denying Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed Motion to Stay Briefing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion to Remand to State Court. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Filed by OnPoint Community Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1) (Cunningham, Timothy) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Dismissal of Party Plaintiffs Cindy Atkins and Paiton Campbell Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dahab, Nadia) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Granting Lynn A. Toops' Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #4 on behalf of Plaintiffs. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Lynn A. Toops. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8043315 #4 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Lynn A. Toops. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8043315. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Toops, Lynn) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Marco A. Hernandez and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 8/16/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/13/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 9/13/2021. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (kgc) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by OnPoint Community Credit Union. (Cunningham, Timothy) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal of Case Number 21CV06289 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8041347 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by OnPoint Community Credit Union (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Cunningham, Timothy) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OnPoint Community Credit Union is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy M. Cunningham

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frederick B. Burnside