This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/17/2020 at 20:49:27 (UTC).

Adkins et al v. Danly Machine Division of Connell Limited Partnership et al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2019 Adkins filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Danly Machine Division of Connell Limited Partnership. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John R. Adams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02143

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John R. Adams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brenda Adkins

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Claimants

Toledo Press Company, Inc.

SPX Corporation

Clark Industrial Insulation Co.

Aida-America Corporation

Crosby Valve, LLC

Circor Naval Solutions, LLC

Bliss Clearing Niagara, Inc.

Air & Liquid Systems Corporation

Pentair PLC

Cleaver Brooks

3M Company

Kelsey-Hayes Company

Flowserve Corporation

Westinghouse Electric Corporation

They Marley-Wylain Company and its Weil-McLain Division

Jacuzzi Brands, Inc.

JOHN DOES (1-100)

DeLaval, Inc.

Dana Companies LLC

91 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William D. Mason, Jr.

Attorney at Kelley & Ferraro

1300 Ernst & Young Bldg., 950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

John M. Murphy

Attorney at Kelley & Ferraro

1300 Ernst & Young Bldg., 950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

Joyce Chambers Reichard

Attorney at Kelley & Ferraro

1300 Ernst & Young Bldg., 950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

Shawn M. Acton

Attorney at Kelley & Ferraro

1300 Ernst & Young Bldg., 950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

Edward J. Kelley, III

Attorney at Kelley & Ferraro

1300 Ernst & Young Bldg., 950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

John A. Kristan, Jr.

Attorney at Kelley Jasons McGowan Spinelli & Hanna - Cleveland

1220 West Sixth Street

Cleveland, OH 44113

David A. Westrup

Attorney at Von Briesen & Roper - Milwaukee

411 East Wisconsin Avenue

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Joni M. Selep

Attorney at Zimmer Kunz

310 Grant Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Derek M. Brondou

Attorney at Dickie McCamey & Chilcote - Pittsburgh

Two Ppg Place

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Other Attorneys

Nicholas L. Evanchan, Jr.

Attorney at Evanchan & Palmisano

388 South Main Street

Akron, OH 44311

Ralph J. Palmisano

Attorney at Evanchan & Palmisano

388 South Main Street

Akron, OH 44312

Sarena M. Holder

Attorney at Tucker Ellis - Cleveland

950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

Melanie M. Irwin

Attorney at Willman & Silvaggio

5500 Corporate Drive

Pittsburgh, PA 15237

Nathan F. Studeny

Attorney at Sutter O'Connell - Cleveland

3600 Erieview Tower, 1301 East Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

Julian T. Emerson

Attorney at Reminger Co. - Cleveland

1400 Midland Bldg., 101 Prospect Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44115

Stephen H. Daniels

Attorney at McMahon DeGulis - Cleveland

650 Caxton Bldg., 812 Huron Road

Cleveland, OH 44115

Nicole E.B. Lewis

Attorney at Tucker Ellis - Cleveland

950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

Thomas R. Wolf

Attorney at Reminger Co. - Cleveland

1400 Midland Bldg., 101 Prospect Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44115

Joseph A. Manno

Attorney at Tucker Ellis - Cleveland

950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

Elisabeth C. Arko

Attorney at Tucker Ellis - Cleveland

950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

22 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#241

#240

#239

#238

237 #1

Exhibit A - "B" Division photos

#237

#236

#235

#234

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Exhibit D - Betts Affidavit

1 #3

Exhibit C - Schroppe Affidavit

1 #2

Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Responses to Plaintiff's Master Consolidated

1 #1

Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint

#1

291 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#241) Joint Motion to Extend Expert Report Deadlines for 45 days filed by Brenda Adkins, Harold Adkins. (Acton, Shawn) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#240) Joint Motion to dismiss party DeLaval Inc., filed by Defendant DeLaval, Inc.. (Brondou, Derek) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#239) Notice of Service of Responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Production to Each Named Defendant filed by Connell Limited Partnership, Danly Machine Corporation. (Brondou, Derek) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#238) Notice of Service of Responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Production to Each Named Defendant filed by Enprotech Corp.. (Brondou, Derek) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#237) Preliminary Fact Witness List filed by all Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - "B" Division photos)(Acton, Shawn) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#236) Stipulated Motion to substitute party filed by Defendant SPX Corporation. (Cozza, Piero) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#235) Notice of Service of Responses to First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents filed by ZF Active Safety US Inc.. (Doran, Perry) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#234) Answer to #145 Amended complaint and all cross-claims and/or third-party claims filed by ArvinMeritor, Inc. (Alexandersen, Kevin) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#233) Notice to take Deposition of Plaintiff Harold Adkins on March 16, 2020 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Acton, Shawn) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#232) Notice of Service of Responses to Request for Production of Documents filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Evanchan, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
228 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Rockwell International Corp.. (Holder, Sarena) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Answer to Complaint, Cross-Claims, and Third-Party Claims(Present and Future) with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Rockwell International Corp.. (Holder, Sarena) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Attorney Appearance by Sarena M. Holder filed by on behalf of Rockwell International Corp.. (Holder, Sarena) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Answer to Complaint and to Any Cross-Claims Filed or to be Filed with Jury Demand filed by Nidec Minster Corporation. (Kline, James) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent John Wood Group PLC for Foster Wheeler Energy Co. filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Co.. (Evanchan, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (Y,A) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (Y,A) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketJudge John R. Adams assigned to case, (Y,A) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Supplement to Notice of Removal, - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Co.. Related document(s) #1 . (Evanchan, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV 19 918967 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $400, receipt number 0647-9526946. Filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Responses to Plaintiff's Master Consolidated Discovery Requests, #3 Exhibit C - Schroppe Affidavit, #4 Exhibit D - Betts Affidavit) (Evanchan, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jacuzzi Brands, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Clark Industrial Insulation Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where Toledo Press Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Aida-America Corporation is a litigant