This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/10/2021 at 09:29:05 (UTC).

Adkins et al v. Appalachian Power Company et al

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 Adkins filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Appalachian Power Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert C. Chambers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00164

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert C. Chambers

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michael J. Adkins

Kimberly D. Adkins

Defendants

Appalachian Power Company

American Electric Power Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nicholas P. Mooney, II

Attorney at SPILMAN THOMAS & BATTLE

P. O. Box 273

Charleston, WV 25321-0273

Nicholas S. Preservati

Attorney at SPILMAN THOMAS & BATTLE

P. O. Box 273

Charleston, WV 25321-0273

Defendant Attorneys

Rebecca L. Donnellan-Pomeroy

Attorney at BAILEY & GLASSER

P. O. Box 326

Bridgeport, WV 26330

Brian R. Swiger

Attorney at BAILEY & GLASSER

209 Capitol Street

Charleston, WV 25301-1386

Christopher D. Smith

Attorney at BAILEY & GLASSER

209 Capitol Street

Charleston, WV 25301-1386

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

#13

12 #1

Exhibit A

#12

11 #1

Exhibit A

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #1

Exhibit A

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kimberly D. Adkins, Michael J. Adkins for Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents and Request for Admission Directed to Appalachian Power Company. (Preservati, Nicholas)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER GOVERNING THE INADVERTENT DISCLOSURE OF DOCUMENTS OR OTHER MATERIAL UNDER RULE 502(d) directing that the following procedures shall govern the inadvertent production of privileged or confidential documents, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 4/28/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (hkl)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER setting forth the terms for the handling of confidential documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 4/28/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (hkl)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #11 JOINT MOTION by Michael J. Adkins, Kimberly D. Adkins, American Electric Power Company, Inc., Appalachian Power Company for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order and #12 JOINT MOTION by Michael J. Adkins, Kimberly D. Adkins, American Electric Power Company, Inc., Appalachian Power Company for Entry of Order Governing the Inadvertent Disclosure of Documents or Other Material Under Rule 502(d). (mkw) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) JOINT MOTION by Michael J. Adkins, Kimberly D. Adkins, American Electric Power Company, Inc., Appalachian Power Company for Entry of Order Governing the Inadvertent Disclosure of Documents or Other Material Under Rule 502(d). (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Donnellan-Pomeroy, Rebecca) (Modified on 4/28/2021 to add party filers) (mkw).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) JOINT MOTION by Michael J. Adkins, Kimberly D. Adkins, American Electric Power Company, Inc., Appalachian Power Company for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Donnellan-Pomeroy, Rebecca) (Modified on 4/28/2021 to add party filers) (mkw).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 6/9/2021. Discovery requests to be completed by 10/12/2021 and all depositions by 11/26/2021. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 9/27/2021, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 10/27/2021, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 11/12/2021. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 12/16/2021; any response shall be filed within 14 days of the filing of the motion, with replies due within 7 days of the filing of the response. Settlement Meeting and Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures by 2/28/2022. Plaintiff's portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 3/7/2022; Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 3/14/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 3/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Proposed Jury Charges due by 3/29/2022. Final Settlement Conference at 9:30 AM on 4/4/2022 in Huntington. Trial set for 4/5/2022 at 8:30 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers; further canceling the scheduling conference set for 5/10/2021. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 4/27/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION GOVERNING THE PRODUCTION OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION by Michael J. Adkins, Kimberly D. Adkins, American Electric Power Company, Inc., Appalachian Power Company; the parties stipulate and agree to governing the production of electronically stored information, as more fully set forth herein. (Donnellan-Pomeroy, Rebecca) (Modified on 4/27/2021 to add party filers) (mkw).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Michael J. Adkins, Kimberly D. Adkins, American Electric Power Company, Inc., Appalachian Power Company. (Donnellan-Pomeroy, Rebecca) (Modified on 4/26/2021 to add party filers) (mkw).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Appalachian Power Company (Donnellan-Pomeroy, Rebecca)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant American Electric Power Company, Inc. (Donnellan-Pomeroy, Rebecca)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 4/5/2021. Rule 26(f) Meeting 4/19/2021. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 4/26/2021. Scheduling/status Conference at 11:30 AM on 5/10/2021 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order 5/17/2021. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 5/24/2021. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/16/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (hkl)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Appalachian Power Company. (Donnellan-Pomeroy, Rebecca) (Modified on 3/12/2021 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (mkw).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Electric Power Company, Inc. (Donnellan-Pomeroy, Rebecca) (Modified on 3/12/2021 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (mkw).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Appalachian Power Company, American Electric Power Company, Inc. with summons, complaint, stipulation extending time to answer complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Wayne County. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7901595. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Appalachian Power Company is a litigant

Latest cases where American Electric Power Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas P. Mooney, II

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas S. Preservati