This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/07/2023 at 11:22:14 (UTC).

ADIM8, LLC v. Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.

Case Summary

On December 10, 2022, Adim8, LLC (“Adim8” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Brett T. Cooke of Brett T. Cooke Law Office, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., (“Defendant”), represented by Lance E. Wyatt, Jr., Neil J. McNabnay, and Rodeen Talebi of Fish & Richardson P.C., seeking declaratory and injunctive relief for alleged infringement of U.S. patents owned by the plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Texas, with Alan D. Albright presiding.

Plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of U.S. patent Nos. 8,107,940 (“the ’940 Patent”) and 8,787,895 (“the ’895 Patent”) (collectively, the “Asserted Patents”) entitled “SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING ADVERTISING ON A MOBILE DEVICE” owned by the plaintiff.

In the complaint, the plaintiff stated, "On a regular basis, digital applications display time indicators, such as hourglasses, rotating circles, and the like, that tell the user that the application is currently unavailable to the user because of processing, transferring data, or waiting or a remote server to complete a task. Adim8, LLC ‘makes this idle time an advertising opportunity using its patented technology. With Icon Advertising, standard idle indictor is replaced with customized animations of an advertiser’s logo, icon, or ad content. Instead of the consumer watching a spinning circle, the consumer sees the advertiser’s logo or animation.”

 The plaintiff further stated, “Adim8, LLC patented icon advertising technology is simple to integrate into any application with a proprietary easy-to-use application program interface (‘API’). The API allows developers to easily replace a software call to the standard waiting indicator with a call to the icon advertising function. There are no other changes to make. Icon advertising manages ad downloads, ad rotation, display statistics, and reporting information back to the hosting server. In addition to developing its patented technology, Adim8, LLC also produces creative content and compelling ad campaigns leveraging this exciting new technology.”

Plaintiff then alleged, “Defendant has directly infringed and continues to directly infringe at least one or more claims of the ’940 Patent, through, among other activities, making, using, and incorporating into Defendant’s website, icon advertising technology. The Defendant’s website (https://catering.chipotle.com/) advertises Chipotle goods and services and is viewable on a mobile device. The Defendant’s website displays a graphic advertisement that includes a time passage indicator.”

Plaintiff also alleged, “Defendant has directly infringed and continues to directly infringe at least one or more claims of the ’895 Patent, through, among other activities, making, using, and incorporating into Defendants’ website, icon advertising technology. Defendant actively induces infringement at least one or more claims of the ’895 Patent, through, among other activities, making, using, and incorporating into Defendant’s website, icon advertising technology.”

The plaintiff additionally alleged, “The electronic device is operable to substitute the graphic advertisement waiting indicator in lieu of a standard waiting indicator. The graphic advertisement waiting indicator is displayed whilst the Chipotle website loads pages or data onto the mobile device. The graphic advertisement waiting indicator is associated with an entity, product and/or service. The electronic device is operable to display the graphic advertisement waiting indicator during an idle time period. The graphic advertisement is animated.”

Plaintiff stated three claims for relief, including from alleged direct and induced infringement of the asserted patents.

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiff requested declaratory and injunctive relief along with an award of damages with pre- and post-judgment interest.

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-01274

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Derek T. Gilliland

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

ADIM8, LLC

Defendant and Counter Plaintiff

Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Brett T. Cooke

Defendant and Counter Plaintiff Attorneys

Alexander H. Martin

Lance E. Wyatt, Jr.

Rodeen Talebi

Neil J. McNabnay

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 1 - U.S. Patent No. 8,107,940

1 #3

Exhibit 2 - U.S. Patent No. 8,787,895

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Cooke, Brett) (Entered: 12/10/2022)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by ADIM8, LLC. (Cooke, Brett) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , Affirmative Defenses. Attorney Neil J. McNabnay added to party Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against ADIM8, LLC by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interested Parties by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lance E. Wyatt, Jr on behalf of Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. Attorney Lance E. Wyatt, Jr added to party Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.(pty:dft) (Wyatt, Lance) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rodeen Talebi on behalf of Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. Attorney Rodeen Talebi added to party Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.(pty:dft) (Talebi, Rodeen) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lance E. Wyatt, Jr as to Alexander H. Martin ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-16969099) by on behalf of Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc... Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Wyatt, Lance) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

#10

(#10) ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alexander H. Martin for Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.,Alexander H. Martin for Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (ad3) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

#11

(#11) PLAINTIFF ADIM8, LLCS ANSWER to #5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by ADIM8, LLC.(Cooke, Brett) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

#12

(#12) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ADIM8, LLC. (Cooke, Brett) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ADIM8, LLC. (Cooke, Brett) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PLAINTIFF ADIM8, LLCS ANSWER to #5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by ADIM8, LLC.(Cooke, Brett) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alexander H. Martin for Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.,Alexander H. Martin for Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (ad3) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lance E. Wyatt, Jr as to Alexander H. Martin ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-16969099) by on behalf of Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc... Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Wyatt, Lance) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rodeen Talebi on behalf of Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. Attorney Rodeen Talebi added to party Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.(pty:dft) (Talebi, Rodeen) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lance E. Wyatt, Jr on behalf of Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. Attorney Lance E. Wyatt, Jr added to party Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.(pty:dft) (Wyatt, Lance) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interested Parties by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , Affirmative Defenses. Attorney Neil J. McNabnay added to party Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against ADIM8, LLC by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by ADIM8, LLC. (Cooke, Brett) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Cooke, Brett) (Entered: 12/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16845353). No Summons requested at this time, filed by ADIM8, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - U.S. Patent No. 8,107,940, #3 Exhibit 2 - U.S. Patent No. 8,787,895)(Cooke, Brett) (Entered: 12/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and Judge Derek T. Gilliland. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. Case was randomly assigned as no open related cases. (sm3) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less