Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/12/2019 at 07:09:52 (UTC).

Adidas America, Inc. et al v. Cavalier Closeout Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/13/2019 Adidas America, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Cavalier Closeout Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles F. Eick and Philip S. Gutierrez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05167

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charles F. Eick

Presiding Judge

Philip S. Gutierrez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

adidas International Marketing B.V.

Reebok International Limited

adidas America, Inc.

adidas AG

Reebok International Ltd.

Defendants

Cavalier Closeout Inc.

Eyan Dahan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Trevor Charles Maxim

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend and Stockton LLP

9720 Wilshire Boulevard Ph Suite

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Charles H Hooker, III

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend and Stockton LLP

1100 Peachtree Street Ne Suite 2800

Atlanta, GA 30309-4528

R Charles Henn, Jr

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsent and Stockton LLP

1100 Peachtree Street Ne Suite 2800

Atlanta, GA 30309

H Forrest Flemming, III

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend and Stockton LLP

1100 Peachtree Street Ne Suite 2800

Atlanta, GA 30309

Defendant Attorneys

Beth C Ring

Attorney at Sandler Travis and Rosenberg PA

551 Fifth Avenue Suite 1100

New York, NY 10176

Steven R Tekosky

Attorney at Tatro Tekosky Sadwick LLP

333 South Grand Avenue Suite 4270

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2901

 

Court Documents

#40

(#40) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, (Ring, Beth) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#39

(#39) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer #36 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#37

(#37) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 4/27/2020 at 02:00 PM. (jre) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

36 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

36 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#36

(#36) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, #1 filed by Defendants Cavalier Closeout Inc., Eyan Dahan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Ring, Beth) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#38

(#38) ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLLICATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT #34 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez granting #34 EX PARTE APPLICATION: The Court having considered the Ex Parte Application to Extend Time to Respond to complaint by an Additional 15 Days submitted by the Defendants, and good cause appearing: 1. The Application is approved; 2. Defendants Cavalier Closeouts Inc. and Eyal Dahan are directed to file their response to Plaintiffs' complaint on or before August 12, 2019, subject to further extensions pursuant to agreement of the parties or upon motion by Defendant. (bm) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

34 #1

Proposed Order

#34

(#34) EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 8/12/2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, #1 filed by Defendants Cavalier Closeout Inc., Eyan Dahan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ring, Beth) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

1 #30

Exhibit 19

1 #29

Exhibit 18

1 #28

Exhibit 17

1 #27

Exhibit 16

1 #26

Exhibit 15

1 #25

Exhibit 14

1 #20

Exhibit 9 - 3 of 3

1 #19

Exhibit 9 - 2 of 3

#1

(#34) EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 8/12/2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, #1 filed by Defendants Cavalier Closeout Inc., Eyan Dahan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ring, Beth) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

85 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, (Ring, Beth) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer #36 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 4/27/2020 at 02:00 PM. (jre) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, #1 filed by Defendants Cavalier Closeout Inc., Eyan Dahan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Ring, Beth) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLLICATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT #34 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez granting #34 EX PARTE APPLICATION: The Court having considered the Ex Parte Application to Extend Time to Respond to complaint by an Additional 15 Days submitted by the Defendants, and good cause appearing: 1. The Application is approved; 2. Defendants Cavalier Closeouts Inc. and Eyal Dahan are directed to file their response to Plaintiffs' complaint on or before August 12, 2019, subject to further extensions pursuant to agreement of the parties or upon motion by Defendant. (bm) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) OPPOSITION Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 8/12/2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, #1 #34 Opposition filed by Plaintiffs Adidas AG, Adidas America, Inc., Adidas International Marketing B.V., Reebok International Limited, Reebok International Ltd.. (Maxim, Trevor) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 8/12/2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, #1 filed by Defendants Cavalier Closeout Inc., Eyan Dahan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ring, Beth) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting #30 Non-Resident Attorney Beth C Ring APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Cavalier Closeouts, Inc., Eyan Dahan, designating Steven R Tekosky as local counsel. (bm) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: denying #28 Non-Resident Attorney Beth C Ring APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Cavalier Closeouts, Inc, Eyan Dahan. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that the pro hac vice application fee, if paid, be refunded. Terming Attorney Beth C Ring. (bm) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) Third APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Beth C. Ring to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Cavalier Closeout Inc., Eyan Dahan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 7/8/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24047820) filed by Defendant Cavalier Closeout Inc., Eyan Dahan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tekosky, Steven) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Cavalier Closeout Inc. (lh) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (lh) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Reebok International Limited, Reebok International Ltd., adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V.. (Maxim, Trevor) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Certification and Notice of Interesed Parties of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Reebok International Limited, Reebok International Ltd., adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V., identifying adidas America, Inc., adidas AG, adidas International Marketing, B.V., Reebok International Limited, Reebok Internatioanl Ltd., adidas North America, Inc.. (Maxim, Trevor) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiff Reebok International Limited, Reebok International Ltd., adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V.. (Maxim, Trevor) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiff Reebok International Limited, Reebok International Ltd., adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V.. (Maxim, Trevor) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiff Reebok International Limited, Reebok International Ltd., adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V.. (Maxim, Trevor) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Reebok International Limited, Reebok International Ltd., adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V.. (Maxim, Trevor) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23915880 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff adidas America, Inc., Reebok International Limited, adidas International Marketing B.V., adidas AG, Reebok International Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 1 of 4, #2 Exhibit 1 - 2 of 4, #3 Exhibit 1 - 3 of 4, #4 Exhibit 1 - 4 of 4, #5 Exhibit 2 - Part 1 - 1 of 3, #6 Exhibit 2 - Part 1 - 2 of 3, #7 Exhibit 2 - Part 1- 3 of 3, #8 Exhibit 2 - Part 2 - 1 of 4, #9 Exhibit 2 - Part 2 - 2 of 4, #10 Exhibit 2 - Part 2 - 3 of 4, #11 Exhibit 2 - Part 2 - 4 of 4, #12 Exhibit 3, #13 Exhibit 4, #14 Exhibit 5, #15 Exhibit 6, #16 Exhibit 7, #17 Exhibit 8, #18 Exhibit 9 - 1 of 3, #19 Exhibit 9 - 2 of 3, #20 Exhibit 9 - 3 of 3, #21 Exhibit 10, #22 Exhibit 11, #23 Exhibit 12, #24 Exhibit 13, #25 Exhibit 14, #26 Exhibit 15, #27 Exhibit 16, #28 Exhibit 17, #29 Exhibit 18, #30 Exhibit 19, #31 Exhibit 20, #32 Exhibit 21 - 1 of 2, #33 Exhibit 21 - 2 of 2, #34 Exhibit 22, #35 Exhibit 23 - 1 of 5, #36 Exhibit 23 - 2 of 5, #37 Exhibit 23 - 3 of 5, #38 Exhibit 23 - 4 of 5, #39 Exhibit 23 - 5 of 5) (Attorney Trevor Charles Maxim added to party Reebok International Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Trevor Charles Maxim added to party Reebok International Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney Trevor Charles Maxim added to party adidas AG(pty:pla), Attorney Trevor Charles Maxim added to party adidas America, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Trevor Charles Maxim added to party adidas International Marketing B.V.(pty:pla))(Maxim, Trevor) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Reebok International Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where CAVALIER CLOSEOUTS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA APPAREL LIQUIDATORS is a litigant