Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/19/2019 at 07:33:32 (UTC).

Adidas AG et al v. The Individuals, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 05/20/2019 Adidas AG filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Individuals, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ursula Ungaro and Patrick M. Hunt. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-61264

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ursula Ungaro

Referral Judge

Patrick M. Hunt

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Adidas International Marketing B.V.

Adidas America, Inc.

Adidas AG

Defendants

The Individuals, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

magicworld99

chunhol

sale--store

flay_item

nogajoe

TIANMUMAOYI

adriansmb

business-572

og2000

baimu_store

lasuagr

agas6480

sainvh

kongwwei

Boost-Sneaker

oneplg

26 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen Michael Gaffigan

Attorney at Stpehen M. Gaffigan, P.A.

401 East Las Olas Blvd., #130-453

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316

T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez

Attorney at Stephen M. Gaffigan, P.A.

401 East Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 130-453

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33301

Virgilio Gigante

Attorney at Stephen M Gaffigan PA

401 E Las Olas Boulevard, #130-453

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

48 #1

Final Default Judgment

#48

(#48) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Final Default Judgment) (drz) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#47

(#47) FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Adidas America, Inc. against 1001customstore, 248652, Annie Trade A, Boost-Sneaker, Gritusale, Parkins official boutique, Ponshteny, TIANMUMAOYI, The Individuals, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A", adriansmb, agas6480, badrameda_0, baimu_store, business-572, bvs262511-8, canameti.com2019, cerzstore, chunhol, duan-11, flay_item, hellouser22, hiran8416, kongwwei, lasuagr, llxin0807_1, magicworld99, maotengh, newcoverscustom, nogajoe, og2000, omani8616, oneplg, onmart, sainvh, sale--store, sedmall, starcovercase, sue-phone, sum886ssm, thebestproducts-3, us2015.ohayo, veD50gSk1AcD, vpmax, and PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 7/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#46

(#46) ORDER granting #45 Motion for Final Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 7/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

45 #3

Declaration of Virgilio Gigante in Support of Motion for Final Default Judgment

45 #2

Text of Proposed Order Final Judgment and Permanent Injunction

45 #1

Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Final Default Judgment

#45

(#45) Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Adidas AG, Adidas America, Inc., Adidas International Marketing B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Final Default Judgment, #2 Text of Proposed Order Final Judgment and Permanent Injunction, #3 Declaration of Virgilio Gigante in Support of Motion for Final Default Judgment)(Gigante, Virgilio) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#44

(#44) ORDER requiring that Plaintiffs SHALL file a Motion for Final Default Judgment against Defendants, duly supported by affidavits and other documentation and a proposed Final Order by Thursday, July 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 7/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

6 #7

Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Virgilio Gigante

#6

(#9) ORDER REFERRING #6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Entry of Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Adidas America, Inc., Adidas International Marketing B.V., Adidas AG. Motions referred to Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 5/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (nc) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#5

(#8) ORDER Granting #5 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 5/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (nc) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Adidas AG, Adidas America, Inc., Adidas International Marketing B.V. identifying Corporate Parent adidas North America, Inc. for Adidas America, Inc. (Gigante, Virgilio) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#3

(#3) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (ar2) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit 1 to the Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the adidas Marks

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11658141, filed by adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the adidas Marks)(Gaffigan, Stephen) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

76 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Final Default Judgment) (drz) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline: All Defendants. (drz) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Adidas America, Inc. against 1001customstore, 248652, Annie Trade A, Boost-Sneaker, Gritusale, Parkins official boutique, Ponshteny, TIANMUMAOYI, The Individuals, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A", adriansmb, agas6480, badrameda_0, baimu_store, business-572, bvs262511-8, canameti.com2019, cerzstore, chunhol, duan-11, flay_item, hellouser22, hiran8416, kongwwei, lasuagr, llxin0807_1, magicworld99, maotengh, newcoverscustom, nogajoe, og2000, omani8616, oneplg, onmart, sainvh, sale--store, sedmall, starcovercase, sue-phone, sum886ssm, thebestproducts-3, us2015.ohayo, veD50gSk1AcD, vpmax, and PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 7/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) ORDER granting #45 Motion for Final Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 7/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Adidas AG, Adidas America, Inc., Adidas International Marketing B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Final Default Judgment, #2 Text of Proposed Order Final Judgment and Permanent Injunction, #3 Declaration of Virgilio Gigante in Support of Motion for Final Default Judgment)(Gigante, Virgilio) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) ORDER requiring that Plaintiffs SHALL file a Motion for Final Default Judgment against Defendants, duly supported by affidavits and other documentation and a proposed Final Order by Thursday, July 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 7/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) Clerks Entry of Default as to Schedule A - Motions Terminated: #38 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default,,, Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 7/1/2019. (dj) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK. (Attachments: #1 Order of Dismissal of Defendants) (drz) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Numbers 39 and 41, sum886ssm and us2015.ohayo Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 7/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) ORDER granting #39 Motion to Continue. Joint Scheduling Report due by 7/26/2019. Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 8/2/2019 10:30 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 6/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2019
  • Set/Deadlines: The Parties SHALL contact Magistrate Judge PATRICK M. HUNT's chambers no later than Tuesday, May 28, 2019, to schedule a hearing, and the Parties SHALL file a Notice of Compliance with this Order by Friday, May 31, 2019. (nc) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER REFERRING #6 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Entry of Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by Adidas America, Inc., Adidas International Marketing B.V., Adidas AG. Motions referred to Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 5/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (nc) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER Granting #5 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 5/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (nc) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Adidas AG, Adidas America, Inc., Adidas International Marketing B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Virgilio Gigante in Support of Ex Parte Motion for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process, #3 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Virgilio Gigante) (Gigante, Virgilio) Modified by Unsealing Document per #22 Order on 6/4/2019 (nc). (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Entry of Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Adidas AG, Adidas America, Inc., Adidas International Marketing B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Mia Nidia Gutierrez in Support of Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #3 Declaration of Kathleen Burns in Support of Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #4 Exhibit 1 - to the Declaration of Kathleen Burns, #5 Declaration of Virgilio Gigante in Support of Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #6 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Virgilio Gigante, #7 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Virgilio Gigante) (Gigante, Virgilio) Modified by Unsealing Document per #22 Order on 6/4/2019 (nc). (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Adidas AG, Adidas America, Inc., Adidas International Marketing B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Gigante, Virgilio) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Adidas AG, Adidas America, Inc., Adidas International Marketing B.V. identifying Corporate Parent adidas North America, Inc. for Adidas America, Inc. (Gigante, Virgilio) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (ar2) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11658141, filed by adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the adidas Marks)(Gaffigan, Stephen) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations is a litigant

Latest cases where Adidas AG is a litigant

Latest cases where Adidas America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez