This case was last updated from PACER on 03/15/2020 at 07:36:44 (UTC).

adidas AG et al v. adidas2019sale.com et al

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 adidas AG filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against adidas2019sale com. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy K. Altman and Patrick M. Hunt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-60085

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roy K. Altman

Referral Judge

Patrick M. Hunt

 

Party Details

Defendants

cheapjerseys13.com

22nfl.club

bestuniformsonline.com

adidas-outlet.ca

cheapmanchesterunitedsoccerjerseys.com

fakeyeezys.cn

eliteusajersey.com

adidasorjinalayakkabi.com

2018jerseyshop.com

cheap350v2yeezyboost.com

cheaphotspurjersey.com

00jerseys.com

reebokprincess.com

americacheapjerseys.com

cheapprobowljerseys.com

bizwholesalejerseyonline.us

21nflmall.store

2020nfl.top

adidasshoescheapuk.com

cheapwholesalejerseystop.com

340 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Stephen Michael Gaffigan

Attorney at Stpehen M. Gaffigan, P.A.

401 East Las Olas Blvd., #130-453

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316

T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez

Attorney at Stephen M. Gaffigan, P.A.

401 East Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 130-453

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33301

Virgilio Gigante

Attorney at Stephen M Gaffigan PA

401 E Las Olas Boulevard, #130-453

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

25 #2

Text of Proposed Order

25 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan in Support of Request for Clerk'

#25

(#25) Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to 00jerseys.com, 2018jerseyshop.com, 2019yeezyboost.com, 2020nfl.top, 21nflmall.store, 22nfl.club, 55jerseys.com, AdWeb2.com, Adias-Online.com, FunMukI.com, InnrGoddessQuiz.com, SapatilhasSuperstar.com, Total-Fencing.co.uk, UbunTard.com, adeaby.top, adidas--trainers.co.uk, adidas--yeezy.co.uk, adidas-belgie.com, adidas-outlet.ca, adidas-sale.store, adidas2019sale.com, adidasadidasiromania.com, adidasalpha.com, adidasankara.com, adidasarrow.com, adidasathletic.top, adidasau.com, adidasboostportugal.com, adidasbuys.com, adidasbwarmy.com, adidascheap.com, adidascheapsales.com, adidascipohungary.com, adidascipowebaruhaz.com, adidascreate.com, adidasenter.com, adidasfalconportugal.com, adidasfell.com, adidasflag.com, adidasgazelleuk.co.uk, adidasgreeceonline.com, adidashardenshoes.com, adidashit.com, adidashoeskutu.co.uk, adidashu.com, adidasiieftiniro.com, adidasiniki.co.uk, adidaskonorge.com, adidaslovensko.com, adidasmagazin.com, adidasnext.com, adidasnmddanmark.com, adidasof.com, adidasoriginalscheaps.co.uk, adidasoriginalskengat.com, adidasorjinalayakkabi.com, adidasosterreich.com, adidasoutletbudapest.com, adidasoutletstoreus.com, adidasoutletus.com, adidasoutletusa.us, adidaspopular.co.uk, adidaspro.co.uk, adidaspt.com, adidasrapidarun.com, adidasrunningsale.com, adidassalemall.com, adidasserbia.com, adidasshoescheapuk.com, adidasshoesoutletonline.com, adidasshoessale.com, adidasshoeswholesale.com, adidasstansmithfr.com, adidasstore.net, adidassuomi.com, adidassuomihalvalla.com, adidassuperstar-femme.com, adidasterrex.co.uk, adidasterrexcmtk.com, adidastoronto.com, adidastrainersireland.com, adidasuks.co.uk, adidasuomi.com, adidasview.com, adidasvip.com, adidaswomenssale.com, adidasworlds.com, adidasxnike.com, adidasyeezy-it.com, adidaszlava.com, adidaszxflux.com, adidaszxrm.com, adnmdromania.com, adsapatos.net, aitoboost.com, americacheapjerseys.com, artemisoutlet.me, autouniononline.com, baratoreeboksapatos.com, basketsnmdpk.com, bestuniformsonline.com, bizwholesalejerseyonline.us, blackadidassneakers.com, bondyeezy123.com, boostskor.com, businessfootballjerseyscheap.com, buyyeezy350.com, camisetasadidasfutbol.com, captainspor.com, chaussureadidassport.com, chaussuresadidas.com, cheap350v2yeezyboost.com, cheapadidasshoes.co.uk, cheapasicsmensshoes.com, cheapcollegejerseys.com, cheaperadidasshops.co.uk, cheaphotspurjersey.com, cheapjerseys13.com, cheapjerseyss17.com, cheapmanchesterunitedsoccerjerseys.com, cheapprobowljerseys.com, cheapwholesalejerseystop.com, cheapyeezy350sale.com, cheapyeezyboostsale.com, cheapyeezysnz.com, chinacheapnfljerseyfu.com, chinacheapsjersey2019.com, chinajerseyusaonline.com, coorners.com, dealjerseys.top, dghh.biz, elitejerseysboutique.com, eliteusajersey.com, elmontyouthsoccer.run, faceyeezy.com, fakeyeezys.cn, feargodyeezy.com, fitsandtips.com, fourthfriday.co.uk, fr-adidas-nmd.com, gaelledumortier.com, gahc.biz, goodshoesheaven.com, happinessoutlet.shoes, jayhawksteamfanstore.com, jersey247.org, jerseyscheapcustomnflsale.com, jerseyspromart.com, kankenmini.com, kort.biz, lojareebok.com, mecty.com, mensadidas.com, metyeezy.com, modellerskor.com, n7-kits.co, newcheapwholesalejerseys.com, newstyleadidas.us, newtrainers.org.uk, newyeezy2020.com, niceadidasnmd.com, nmds.org.uk, nmdshoes.org.uk, nmdxr1.us, nyeadskoudsalg.com, officialvipjersey.com, outletnmd.com, pearltatman.com, rebokaztrekuk.com, rebokitalia.com, reebokchiletiendas.com, reebokclassicshoes.ca, reebokclubc.co.uk, reebokcrossfittraining.com, reebokdk.com, reebokfiyat.com, reebokfurylite.com, reebokgl6000.com, reebokhungaryshop.com, reebokmagyarorszag.com, reebokoutletportugal.com, reebokportugal.com, reebokprincess.com, reebokroyalcipoeladas.com, reeboksale.online, reeboksaleau.com, reeboksapatilhas.com, reebokshoescanada.com, reebokshop.online, reeboksk.com, reeboktopankysklad.com, reebokusashoes.com, reebokworkoutlo.com, releaseadidasdata.co.uk, rtdd.biz, runshoesmall.co.uk, saldiadidas.com, scarpereebokonline.it, schoenenada.com, schoenenprofile.com, shoesclearancesale.org, showyeezy.com, skornmdadidas.com, sneakerstores.eu, soccerjerseys-online.co, soccersoccersoccer.net, sparta7.net, sport-pokret.com, stansmithportugal.com, storeadidasoutletus.com, superstarstrainers.org.uk, taoki.eu, tenisreebokbrasil.com, topsneakers.shop, topyeezy.net, trainersoutlet.org.uk, trainersoutletuk.co.uk, trainerssale.org.uk, uayeezys.co, ucuzadidasturkiye.com, uknewmall.co.uk, ultraboost.org.uk, ultraboost4uk.com, usadidasshops.com, vipjerseyshop.top, vipofficialjersey.com, vipstylejerseys.com, wholesale-soccer-jerseys168.com, wholesalejerseystoreaces.com, wrapartists.co.uk, yeezy--shoes.co.uk, yeezy-350.co.uk, yeezy-global.com, yeezy-trainers.org.uk, yeezy350.co.uk, yeezy350sale.com, yeezyage.com, yeezyaustralia.com, yeezybeast.com, yeezybelgie.com, yeezyboost-350.uk, yeezyboost.me, yeezyboost750dk.co, yeezyboostaustralia.com, yeezybooststore.com, yeezyforsale.club, yeezyonsale.com, yeezysaleuk.co.uk, yeezyuk.org.uk, yeezyvipshop.us, yes-yeezy.com by Reebok International Ltd., adidas AG, adidas International Marketing B.V., adidas America, Inc., Reebok International Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan in Support of Request for Clerk's Entry of Default, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaffigan, Stephen) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

#24

(#24) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reebok International Limited, Reebok International Ltd., adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V. re #20 Order on Ex Parte Motion, upon Defendants via website posting (Gaffigan, Stephen) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

#23

(#23) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reebok International Limited, Reebok International Ltd., adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V. re #20 Order on Ex Parte Motion, upon Defendants via Registrar (Gaffigan, Stephen) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

#22

(#22) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reebok International Limited, Reebok International Ltd., adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V. re #20 Order on Ex Parte Motion, upon Defendants via Electronic Mail (Gaffigan, Stephen) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

21 #1

Affidavit of Service

#21

(#21) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Reebok International Ltd., adidas AG, adidas International Marketing B.V., adidas America, Inc., Reebok International Limited. 00jerseys.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; 2018jerseyshop.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; 2019yeezyboost.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; 2020nfl.top served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; 21nflmall.store served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; 22nfl.club served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; 55jerseys.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; AdWeb2.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; Adias-Online.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; FunMukI.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; InnrGoddessQuiz.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; SapatilhasSuperstar.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; Total-Fencing.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; UbunTard.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adeaby.top served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidas--trainers.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidas--yeezy.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidas-belgie.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidas-outlet.ca served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidas-sale.store served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidas2019sale.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasadidasiromania.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasalpha.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasankara.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasarrow.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasathletic.top served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasau.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasboostportugal.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasbuys.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasbwarmy.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidascheap.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidascheapsales.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidascipohungary.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidascipowebaruhaz.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidascreate.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasenter.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasfalconportugal.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasfell.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasflag.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasgazelleuk.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasgreeceonline.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidashardenshoes.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidashit.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidashoeskutu.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidashu.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasiieftiniro.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasiniki.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidaskonorge.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidaslovensko.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasmagazin.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasnext.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasnmddanmark.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasof.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasoriginalscheaps.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasoriginalskengat.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasorjinalayakkabi.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasosterreich.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasoutletbudapest.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasoutletstoreus.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasoutletus.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasoutletusa.us served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidaspopular.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidaspro.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidaspt.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasrapidarun.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasrunningsale.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidassalemall.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasserbia.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasshoescheapuk.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasshoesoutletonline.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasshoessale.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasshoeswholesale.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasstansmithfr.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasstore.net served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidassuomi.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidassuomihalvalla.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidassuperstar-femme.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasterrex.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasterrexcmtk.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidastoronto.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidastrainersireland.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasuks.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasuomi.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasview.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasvip.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidaswomenssale.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasworlds.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasxnike.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasyeezy-it.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidaszlava.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidaszxflux.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidaszxrm.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adnmdromania.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adsapatos.net served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; aitoboost.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; americacheapjerseys.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; artemisoutlet.me served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; autouniononline.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; baratoreeboksapatos.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; basketsnmdpk.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; bestuniformsonline.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; bizwholesalejerseyonline.us served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; blackadidassneakers.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; bondyeezy123.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; boostskor.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; businessfootballjerseyscheap.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; buyyeezy350.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; camisetasadidasfutbol.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; captainspor.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; chaussureadidassport.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; chaussuresadidas.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheap350v2yeezyboost.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheapadidasshoes.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheapasicsmensshoes.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheapcollegejerseys.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheaperadidasshops.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheaphotspurjersey.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheapjerseys13.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheapjerseyss17.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheapmanchesterunitedsoccerjerseys.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheapprobowljerseys.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheapwholesalejerseystop.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheapyeezy350sale.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheapyeezyboostsale.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheapyeezysnz.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; chinacheapnfljerseyfu.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; chinacheapsjersey2019.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; chinajerseyusaonline.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; coorners.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; dealjerseys.top served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; dghh.biz served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; elitejerseysboutique.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; eliteusajersey.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; elmontyouthsoccer.run served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; faceyeezy.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; fakeyeezys.cn served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; feargodyeezy.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; fitsandtips.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; fourthfriday.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; fr-adidas-nmd.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; gaelledumortier.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; gahc.biz served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; goodshoesheaven.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; happinessoutlet.shoes served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; jayhawksteamfanstore.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; jersey247.org served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; jerseyscheapcustomnflsale.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; jerseyspromart.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; kankenmini.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; kort.biz served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; lojareebok.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; mecty.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; mensadidas.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; metyeezy.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; modellerskor.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; n7-kits.co served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; newcheapwholesalejerseys.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; newstyleadidas.us served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; newtrainers.org.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; newyeezy2020.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; niceadidasnmd.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; nmds.org.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; nmdshoes.org.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; nmdxr1.us served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; nyeadskoudsalg.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; officialvipjersey.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; outletnmd.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; pearltatman.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; rebokaztrekuk.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; rebokitalia.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokchiletiendas.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokclassicshoes.ca served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokclubc.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokcrossfittraining.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokdk.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokfiyat.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokfurylite.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokgl6000.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokhungaryshop.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokmagyarorszag.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokoutletportugal.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokportugal.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokprincess.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokroyalcipoeladas.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reeboksale.online served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reeboksaleau.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reeboksapatilhas.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokshoescanada.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokshop.online served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reeboksk.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reeboktopankysklad.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokusashoes.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokworkoutlo.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; releaseadidasdata.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; rtdd.biz served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; runshoesmall.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; saldiadidas.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; scarpereebokonline.it served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; schoenenada.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; schoenenprofile.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; shoesclearancesale.org served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; showyeezy.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; skornmdadidas.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; sneakerstores.eu served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; soccerjerseys-online.co served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; soccersoccersoccer.net served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; sparta7.net served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; sport-pokret.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; stansmithportugal.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; storeadidasoutletus.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; superstarstrainers.org.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; taoki.eu served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; tenisreebokbrasil.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; topsneakers.shop served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; topyeezy.net served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; trainersoutlet.org.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; trainersoutletuk.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; trainerssale.org.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; uayeezys.co served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; ucuzadidasturkiye.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; uknewmall.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; ultraboost.org.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; ultraboost4uk.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; usadidasshops.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; vipjerseyshop.top served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; vipofficialjersey.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; vipstylejerseys.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; wholesale-soccer-jerseys168.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; wholesalejerseystoreaces.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; wrapartists.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezy--shoes.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezy-350.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezy-global.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezy-trainers.org.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezy350.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezy350sale.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezyage.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezyaustralia.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezybeast.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezybelgie.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezyboost-350.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezyboost.me served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezyboost750dk.co served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezyboostaustralia.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezybooststore.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezyforsale.club served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezyonsale.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezysaleuk.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezyuk.org.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezyvipshop.us served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yes-yeezy.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Affidavit of Service, #3 Affidavit of Service)(Gaffigan, Stephen) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

#20

(#20) ORDER granting #5 EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V.. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 2/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

3 #3

Supplement Complaint and Exhibits Part 3

3 #1

Supplement Complaint and Exhibits Part 1

1 #6

Exhibit 3 to the Complaint - Website Captures - Part 3

1 #5

Exhibit 3 to the Complaint - Website Captures - Part 2

1 #4

Exhibit 3 to the Complaint - Website Captures - Part 1

1 #3

Exhibit 2 to the Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the Reebok Marks

1 #2

Exhibit 1 to the Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the adidas Marks

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#21) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Reebok International Ltd., adidas AG, adidas International Marketing B.V., adidas America, Inc., Reebok International Limited. 00jerseys.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; 2018jerseyshop.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; 2019yeezyboost.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; 2020nfl.top served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; 21nflmall.store served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; 22nfl.club served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; 55jerseys.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; AdWeb2.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; Adias-Online.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; FunMukI.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; InnrGoddessQuiz.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; SapatilhasSuperstar.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; Total-Fencing.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; UbunTard.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adeaby.top served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidas--trainers.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidas--yeezy.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidas-belgie.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidas-outlet.ca served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidas-sale.store served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidas2019sale.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasadidasiromania.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasalpha.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasankara.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasarrow.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasathletic.top served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasau.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasboostportugal.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasbuys.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasbwarmy.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidascheap.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidascheapsales.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidascipohungary.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidascipowebaruhaz.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidascreate.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasenter.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasfalconportugal.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasfell.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasflag.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasgazelleuk.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasgreeceonline.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidashardenshoes.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidashit.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidashoeskutu.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidashu.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasiieftiniro.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasiniki.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidaskonorge.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidaslovensko.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasmagazin.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasnext.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasnmddanmark.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasof.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasoriginalscheaps.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasoriginalskengat.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasorjinalayakkabi.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasosterreich.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasoutletbudapest.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasoutletstoreus.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasoutletus.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasoutletusa.us served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidaspopular.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidaspro.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidaspt.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasrapidarun.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasrunningsale.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidassalemall.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasserbia.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasshoescheapuk.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasshoesoutletonline.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasshoessale.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasshoeswholesale.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasstansmithfr.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasstore.net served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidassuomi.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidassuomihalvalla.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidassuperstar-femme.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasterrex.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasterrexcmtk.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidastoronto.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidastrainersireland.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasuks.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasuomi.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasview.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasvip.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidaswomenssale.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasworlds.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasxnike.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasyeezy-it.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidaszlava.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidaszxflux.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidaszxrm.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adnmdromania.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adsapatos.net served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; aitoboost.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; americacheapjerseys.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; artemisoutlet.me served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; autouniononline.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; baratoreeboksapatos.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; basketsnmdpk.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; bestuniformsonline.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; bizwholesalejerseyonline.us served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; blackadidassneakers.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; bondyeezy123.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; boostskor.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; businessfootballjerseyscheap.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; buyyeezy350.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; camisetasadidasfutbol.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; captainspor.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; chaussureadidassport.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; chaussuresadidas.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheap350v2yeezyboost.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheapadidasshoes.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheapasicsmensshoes.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheapcollegejerseys.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheaperadidasshops.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheaphotspurjersey.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheapjerseys13.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheapjerseyss17.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheapmanchesterunitedsoccerjerseys.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheapprobowljerseys.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheapwholesalejerseystop.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheapyeezy350sale.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheapyeezyboostsale.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheapyeezysnz.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; chinacheapnfljerseyfu.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; chinacheapsjersey2019.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; chinajerseyusaonline.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; coorners.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; dealjerseys.top served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; dghh.biz served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; elitejerseysboutique.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; eliteusajersey.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; elmontyouthsoccer.run served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; faceyeezy.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; fakeyeezys.cn served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; feargodyeezy.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; fitsandtips.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; fourthfriday.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; fr-adidas-nmd.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; gaelledumortier.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; gahc.biz served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; goodshoesheaven.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; happinessoutlet.shoes served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; jayhawksteamfanstore.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; jersey247.org served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; jerseyscheapcustomnflsale.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; jerseyspromart.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; kankenmini.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; kort.biz served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; lojareebok.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; mecty.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; mensadidas.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; metyeezy.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; modellerskor.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; n7-kits.co served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; newcheapwholesalejerseys.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; newstyleadidas.us served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; newtrainers.org.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; newyeezy2020.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; niceadidasnmd.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; nmds.org.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; nmdshoes.org.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; nmdxr1.us served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; nyeadskoudsalg.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; officialvipjersey.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; outletnmd.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; pearltatman.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; rebokaztrekuk.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; rebokitalia.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokchiletiendas.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokclassicshoes.ca served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokclubc.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokcrossfittraining.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokdk.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokfiyat.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokfurylite.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokgl6000.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokhungaryshop.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokmagyarorszag.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokoutletportugal.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokportugal.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokprincess.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokroyalcipoeladas.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reeboksale.online served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reeboksaleau.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reeboksapatilhas.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokshoescanada.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokshop.online served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reeboksk.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reeboktopankysklad.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokusashoes.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokworkoutlo.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; releaseadidasdata.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; rtdd.biz served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; runshoesmall.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; saldiadidas.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; scarpereebokonline.it served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; schoenenada.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; schoenenprofile.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; shoesclearancesale.org served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; showyeezy.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; skornmdadidas.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; sneakerstores.eu served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; soccerjerseys-online.co served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; soccersoccersoccer.net served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; sparta7.net served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; sport-pokret.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; stansmithportugal.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; storeadidasoutletus.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; superstarstrainers.org.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; taoki.eu served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; tenisreebokbrasil.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; topsneakers.shop served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; topyeezy.net served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; trainersoutlet.org.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; trainersoutletuk.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; trainerssale.org.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; uayeezys.co served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; ucuzadidasturkiye.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; uknewmall.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; ultraboost.org.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; ultraboost4uk.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; usadidasshops.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; vipjerseyshop.top served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; vipofficialjersey.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; vipstylejerseys.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; wholesale-soccer-jerseys168.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; wholesalejerseystoreaces.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; wrapartists.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezy--shoes.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezy-350.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezy-global.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezy-trainers.org.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezy350.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezy350sale.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezyage.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezyaustralia.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezybeast.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezybelgie.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezyboost-350.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezyboost.me served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezyboost750dk.co served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezyboostaustralia.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezybooststore.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezyforsale.club served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezyonsale.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezysaleuk.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezyuk.org.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezyvipshop.us served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yes-yeezy.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Affidavit of Service, #3 Affidavit of Service)(Gaffigan, Stephen) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Clerks Entry of Default as to 00jerseys.com, 2018jerseyshop.com, 2019yeezyboost.com, 2020nfl.top, 21nflmall.store, 22nfl.club, 55jerseys.com, AdWeb2.com, Adias-Online.com, FunMukI.com, InnrGoddessQuiz.com, SapatilhasSuperstar.com, Total-Fencing.co.uk, UbunTard.com, adeaby.top, adidas--trainers.co.uk, adidas--yeezy.co.uk, adidas-belgie.com, adidas-outlet.ca, adidas-sale.store, adidas2019sale.com, adidasadidasiromania.com, adidasalpha.com, adidasankara.com, adidasarrow.com, adidasathletic.top, adidasau.com, adidasboostportugal.com, adidasbuys.com, adidasbwarmy.com, adidascheap.com, adidascheapsales.com, adidascipohungary.com, adidascipowebaruhaz.com, adidascreate.com, adidasenter.com, adidasfalconportugal.com, adidasfell.com, adidasflag.com, adidasgazelleuk.co.uk, adidasgreeceonline.com, adidashardenshoes.com, adidashit.com, adidashoeskutu.co.uk, adidashu.com, adidasiieftiniro.com, adidasiniki.co.uk, adidaskonorge.com, adidaslovensko.com, adidasmagazin.com, adidasnext.com, adidasnmddanmark.com, adidasof.com, adidasoriginalscheaps.co.uk, adidasoriginalskengat.com, adidasorjinalayakkabi.com, adidasosterreich.com, adidasoutletbudapest.com, adidasoutletstoreus.com, adidasoutletus.com, adidasoutletusa.us, adidaspopular.co.uk, adidaspro.co.uk, adidaspt.com, adidasrapidarun.com, adidasrunningsale.com, adidassalemall.com, adidasserbia.com, adidasshoescheapuk.com, adidasshoesoutletonline.com, adidasshoessale.com, adidasshoeswholesale.com, adidasstansmithfr.com, adidasstore.net, adidassuomi.com, adidassuomihalvalla.com, adidassuperstar-femme.com, adidasterrex.co.uk, adidasterrexcmtk.com, adidastoronto.com, adidastrainersireland.com, adidasuks.co.uk, adidasuomi.com, adidasview.com, adidasvip.com, adidaswomenssale.com, adidasworlds.com, adidasxnike.com, adidasyeezy-it.com, adidaszlava.com, adidaszxflux.com, adidaszxrm.com, adnmdromania.com, adsapatos.net, aitoboost.com, americacheapjerseys.com, artemisoutlet.me, autouniononline.com, baratoreeboksapatos.com, basketsnmdpk.com, bestuniformsonline.com, bizwholesalejerseyonline.us, blackadidassneakers.com, bondyeezy123.com, boostskor.com, businessfootballjerseyscheap.com, buyyeezy350.com, camisetasadidasfutbol.com, captainspor.com, chaussureadidassport.com, chaussuresadidas.com, cheap350v2yeezyboost.com, cheapadidasshoes.co.uk, cheapasicsmensshoes.com, cheapcollegejerseys.com, cheaperadidasshops.co.uk, cheaphotspurjersey.com, cheapjerseys13.com, cheapjerseyss17.com, cheapmanchesterunitedsoccerjerseys.com, cheapprobowljerseys.com, cheapwholesalejerseystop.com, cheapyeezy350sale.com, cheapyeezyboostsale.com, cheapyeezysnz.com, chinacheapnfljerseyfu.com, chinacheapsjersey2019.com, chinajerseyusaonline.com, coorners.com, dealjerseys.top, dghh.biz, elitejerseysboutique.com, eliteusajersey.com, elmontyouthsoccer.run, faceyeezy.com, fakeyeezys.cn, feargodyeezy.com, fitsandtips.com, fourthfriday.co.uk, fr-adidas-nmd.com, gaelledumortier.com, gahc.biz, goodshoesheaven.com, happinessoutlet.shoes, jayhawksteamfanstore.com, jersey247.org, jerseyscheapcustomnflsale.com, jerseyspromart.com, kankenmini.com, kort.biz, lojareebok.com, mecty.com, mensadidas.com, metyeezy.com, modellerskor.com, n7-kits.co, newcheapwholesalejerseys.com, newstyleadidas.us, newtrainers.org.uk, newyeezy2020.com, niceadidasnmd.com, nmds.org.uk, nmdshoes.org.uk, nmdxr1.us, nyeadskoudsalg.com, officialvipjersey.com, outletnmd.com, pearltatman.com, rebokaztrekuk.com, rebokitalia.com, reebokchiletiendas.com, reebokclassicshoes.ca, reebokclubc.co.uk, reebokcrossfittraining.com, reebokdk.com, reebokfiyat.com, reebokfurylite.com, reebokgl6000.com, reebokhungaryshop.com, reebokmagyarorszag.com, reebokoutletportugal.com, reebokportugal.com, reebokprincess.com, reebokroyalcipoeladas.com, reeboksale.online, reeboksaleau.com, reeboksapatilhas.com, reebokshoescanada.com, reebokshop.online, reeboksk.com, reeboktopankysklad.com, reebokusashoes.com, reebokworkoutlo.com, releaseadidasdata.co.uk, rtdd.biz, runshoesmall.co.uk, saldiadidas.com, scarpereebokonline.it, schoenenada.com, schoenenprofile.com, shoesclearancesale.org, showyeezy.com, skornmdadidas.com, sneakerstores.eu, soccerjerseys-online.co, soccersoccersoccer.net, sparta7.net, sport-pokret.com, stansmithportugal.com, storeadidasoutletus.com, superstarstrainers.org.uk, taoki.eu, tenisreebokbrasil.com, topsneakers.shop, topyeezy.net, trainersoutlet.org.uk, trainersoutletuk.co.uk, trainerssale.org.uk, uayeezys.co, ucuzadidasturkiye.com, uknewmall.co.uk, ultraboost.org.uk, ultraboost4uk.com, usadidasshops.com, vipjerseyshop.top, vipofficialjersey.com, vipstylejerseys.com, wholesale-soccer-jerseys168.com, wholesalejerseystoreaces.com, wrapartists.co.uk, yeezy--shoes.co.uk, yeezy-350.co.uk, yeezy-global.com, yeezy-trainers.org.uk, yeezy350.co.uk, yeezy350sale.com, yeezyage.com, yeezyaustralia.com, yeezybeast.com, yeezybelgie.com, yeezyboost-350.uk, yeezyboost.me, yeezyboost750dk.co, yeezyboostaustralia.com, yeezybooststore.com, yeezyforsale.club, yeezyonsale.com, yeezysaleuk.co.uk, yeezyuk.org.uk, yeezyvipshop.us, yes-yeezy.com - Motions Terminated: #25 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 3/11/2020. (scn) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to 00jerseys.com, 2018jerseyshop.com, 2019yeezyboost.com, 2020nfl.top, 21nflmall.store, 22nfl.club, 55jerseys.com, AdWeb2.com, Adias-Online.com, FunMukI.com, InnrGoddessQuiz.com, SapatilhasSuperstar.com, Total-Fencing.co.uk, UbunTard.com, adeaby.top, adidas--trainers.co.uk, adidas--yeezy.co.uk, adidas-belgie.com, adidas-outlet.ca, adidas-sale.store, adidas2019sale.com, adidasadidasiromania.com, adidasalpha.com, adidasankara.com, adidasarrow.com, adidasathletic.top, adidasau.com, adidasboostportugal.com, adidasbuys.com, adidasbwarmy.com, adidascheap.com, adidascheapsales.com, adidascipohungary.com, adidascipowebaruhaz.com, adidascreate.com, adidasenter.com, adidasfalconportugal.com, adidasfell.com, adidasflag.com, adidasgazelleuk.co.uk, adidasgreeceonline.com, adidashardenshoes.com, adidashit.com, adidashoeskutu.co.uk, adidashu.com, adidasiieftiniro.com, adidasiniki.co.uk, adidaskonorge.com, adidaslovensko.com, adidasmagazin.com, adidasnext.com, adidasnmddanmark.com, adidasof.com, adidasoriginalscheaps.co.uk, adidasoriginalskengat.com, adidasorjinalayakkabi.com, adidasosterreich.com, adidasoutletbudapest.com, adidasoutletstoreus.com, adidasoutletus.com, adidasoutletusa.us, adidaspopular.co.uk, adidaspro.co.uk, adidaspt.com, adidasrapidarun.com, adidasrunningsale.com, adidassalemall.com, adidasserbia.com, adidasshoescheapuk.com, adidasshoesoutletonline.com, adidasshoessale.com, adidasshoeswholesale.com, adidasstansmithfr.com, adidasstore.net, adidassuomi.com, adidassuomihalvalla.com, adidassuperstar-femme.com, adidasterrex.co.uk, adidasterrexcmtk.com, adidastoronto.com, adidastrainersireland.com, adidasuks.co.uk, adidasuomi.com, adidasview.com, adidasvip.com, adidaswomenssale.com, adidasworlds.com, adidasxnike.com, adidasyeezy-it.com, adidaszlava.com, adidaszxflux.com, adidaszxrm.com, adnmdromania.com, adsapatos.net, aitoboost.com, americacheapjerseys.com, artemisoutlet.me, autouniononline.com, baratoreeboksapatos.com, basketsnmdpk.com, bestuniformsonline.com, bizwholesalejerseyonline.us, blackadidassneakers.com, bondyeezy123.com, boostskor.com, businessfootballjerseyscheap.com, buyyeezy350.com, camisetasadidasfutbol.com, captainspor.com, chaussureadidassport.com, chaussuresadidas.com, cheap350v2yeezyboost.com, cheapadidasshoes.co.uk, cheapasicsmensshoes.com, cheapcollegejerseys.com, cheaperadidasshops.co.uk, cheaphotspurjersey.com, cheapjerseys13.com, cheapjerseyss17.com, cheapmanchesterunitedsoccerjerseys.com, cheapprobowljerseys.com, cheapwholesalejerseystop.com, cheapyeezy350sale.com, cheapyeezyboostsale.com, cheapyeezysnz.com, chinacheapnfljerseyfu.com, chinacheapsjersey2019.com, chinajerseyusaonline.com, coorners.com, dealjerseys.top, dghh.biz, elitejerseysboutique.com, eliteusajersey.com, elmontyouthsoccer.run, faceyeezy.com, fakeyeezys.cn, feargodyeezy.com, fitsandtips.com, fourthfriday.co.uk, fr-adidas-nmd.com, gaelledumortier.com, gahc.biz, goodshoesheaven.com, happinessoutlet.shoes, jayhawksteamfanstore.com, jersey247.org, jerseyscheapcustomnflsale.com, jerseyspromart.com, kankenmini.com, kort.biz, lojareebok.com, mecty.com, mensadidas.com, metyeezy.com, modellerskor.com, n7-kits.co, newcheapwholesalejerseys.com, newstyleadidas.us, newtrainers.org.uk, newyeezy2020.com, niceadidasnmd.com, nmds.org.uk, nmdshoes.org.uk, nmdxr1.us, nyeadskoudsalg.com, officialvipjersey.com, outletnmd.com, pearltatman.com, rebokaztrekuk.com, rebokitalia.com, reebokchiletiendas.com, reebokclassicshoes.ca, reebokclubc.co.uk, reebokcrossfittraining.com, reebokdk.com, reebokfiyat.com, reebokfurylite.com, reebokgl6000.com, reebokhungaryshop.com, reebokmagyarorszag.com, reebokoutletportugal.com, reebokportugal.com, reebokprincess.com, reebokroyalcipoeladas.com, reeboksale.online, reeboksaleau.com, reeboksapatilhas.com, reebokshoescanada.com, reebokshop.online, reeboksk.com, reeboktopankysklad.com, reebokusashoes.com, reebokworkoutlo.com, releaseadidasdata.co.uk, rtdd.biz, runshoesmall.co.uk, saldiadidas.com, scarpereebokonline.it, schoenenada.com, schoenenprofile.com, shoesclearancesale.org, showyeezy.com, skornmdadidas.com, sneakerstores.eu, soccerjerseys-online.co, soccersoccersoccer.net, sparta7.net, sport-pokret.com, stansmithportugal.com, storeadidasoutletus.com, superstarstrainers.org.uk, taoki.eu, tenisreebokbrasil.com, topsneakers.shop, topyeezy.net, trainersoutlet.org.uk, trainersoutletuk.co.uk, trainerssale.org.uk, uayeezys.co, ucuzadidasturkiye.com, uknewmall.co.uk, ultraboost.org.uk, ultraboost4uk.com, usadidasshops.com, vipjerseyshop.top, vipofficialjersey.com, vipstylejerseys.com, wholesale-soccer-jerseys168.com, wholesalejerseystoreaces.com, wrapartists.co.uk, yeezy--shoes.co.uk, yeezy-350.co.uk, yeezy-global.com, yeezy-trainers.org.uk, yeezy350.co.uk, yeezy350sale.com, yeezyage.com, yeezyaustralia.com, yeezybeast.com, yeezybelgie.com, yeezyboost-350.uk, yeezyboost.me, yeezyboost750dk.co, yeezyboostaustralia.com, yeezybooststore.com, yeezyforsale.club, yeezyonsale.com, yeezysaleuk.co.uk, yeezyuk.org.uk, yeezyvipshop.us, yes-yeezy.com by Reebok International Ltd., adidas AG, adidas International Marketing B.V., adidas America, Inc., Reebok International Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan in Support of Request for Clerk's Entry of Default, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaffigan, Stephen) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reebok International Limited, Reebok International Ltd., adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V. re #20 Order on Ex Parte Motion, upon Defendants via website posting (Gaffigan, Stephen) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reebok International Limited, Reebok International Ltd., adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V. re #20 Order on Ex Parte Motion, upon Defendants via Registrar (Gaffigan, Stephen) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reebok International Limited, Reebok International Ltd., adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V. re #20 Order on Ex Parte Motion, upon Defendants via Electronic Mail (Gaffigan, Stephen) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Reebok International Ltd., adidas AG, adidas International Marketing B.V., adidas America, Inc., Reebok International Limited. 00jerseys.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; 2018jerseyshop.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; 2019yeezyboost.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; 2020nfl.top served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; 21nflmall.store served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; 22nfl.club served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; 55jerseys.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; AdWeb2.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; Adias-Online.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; FunMukI.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; InnrGoddessQuiz.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; SapatilhasSuperstar.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; Total-Fencing.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; UbunTard.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adeaby.top served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidas--trainers.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidas--yeezy.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidas-belgie.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidas-outlet.ca served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidas-sale.store served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidas2019sale.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasadidasiromania.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasalpha.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasankara.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasarrow.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasathletic.top served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasau.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasboostportugal.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasbuys.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasbwarmy.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidascheap.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidascheapsales.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidascipohungary.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidascipowebaruhaz.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidascreate.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasenter.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasfalconportugal.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasfell.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasflag.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasgazelleuk.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasgreeceonline.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidashardenshoes.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidashit.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidashoeskutu.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidashu.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasiieftiniro.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasiniki.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidaskonorge.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidaslovensko.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasmagazin.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasnext.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasnmddanmark.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasof.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasoriginalscheaps.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasoriginalskengat.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasorjinalayakkabi.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasosterreich.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasoutletbudapest.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasoutletstoreus.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasoutletus.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasoutletusa.us served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidaspopular.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidaspro.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidaspt.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasrapidarun.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasrunningsale.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidassalemall.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasserbia.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasshoescheapuk.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasshoesoutletonline.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasshoessale.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasshoeswholesale.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasstansmithfr.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasstore.net served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidassuomi.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidassuomihalvalla.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidassuperstar-femme.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasterrex.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasterrexcmtk.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidastoronto.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidastrainersireland.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasuks.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasuomi.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasview.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasvip.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidaswomenssale.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasworlds.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasxnike.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidasyeezy-it.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidaszlava.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidaszxflux.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adidaszxrm.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adnmdromania.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; adsapatos.net served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; aitoboost.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; americacheapjerseys.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; artemisoutlet.me served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; autouniononline.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; baratoreeboksapatos.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; basketsnmdpk.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; bestuniformsonline.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; bizwholesalejerseyonline.us served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; blackadidassneakers.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; bondyeezy123.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; boostskor.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; businessfootballjerseyscheap.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; buyyeezy350.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; camisetasadidasfutbol.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; captainspor.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; chaussureadidassport.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; chaussuresadidas.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheap350v2yeezyboost.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheapadidasshoes.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheapasicsmensshoes.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheapcollegejerseys.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheaperadidasshops.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheaphotspurjersey.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheapjerseys13.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheapjerseyss17.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheapmanchesterunitedsoccerjerseys.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheapprobowljerseys.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheapwholesalejerseystop.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheapyeezy350sale.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheapyeezyboostsale.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; cheapyeezysnz.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; chinacheapnfljerseyfu.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; chinacheapsjersey2019.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; chinajerseyusaonline.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; coorners.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; dealjerseys.top served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; dghh.biz served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; elitejerseysboutique.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; eliteusajersey.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; elmontyouthsoccer.run served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; faceyeezy.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; fakeyeezys.cn served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; feargodyeezy.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; fitsandtips.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; fourthfriday.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; fr-adidas-nmd.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; gaelledumortier.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; gahc.biz served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; goodshoesheaven.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; happinessoutlet.shoes served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; jayhawksteamfanstore.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; jersey247.org served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; jerseyscheapcustomnflsale.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; jerseyspromart.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; kankenmini.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; kort.biz served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; lojareebok.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; mecty.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; mensadidas.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; metyeezy.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; modellerskor.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; n7-kits.co served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; newcheapwholesalejerseys.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; newstyleadidas.us served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; newtrainers.org.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; newyeezy2020.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; niceadidasnmd.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; nmds.org.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; nmdshoes.org.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; nmdxr1.us served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; nyeadskoudsalg.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; officialvipjersey.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; outletnmd.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; pearltatman.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; rebokaztrekuk.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; rebokitalia.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokchiletiendas.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokclassicshoes.ca served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokclubc.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokcrossfittraining.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokdk.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokfiyat.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokfurylite.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokgl6000.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokhungaryshop.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokmagyarorszag.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokoutletportugal.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokportugal.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokprincess.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokroyalcipoeladas.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reeboksale.online served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reeboksaleau.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reeboksapatilhas.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokshoescanada.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokshop.online served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reeboksk.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reeboktopankysklad.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokusashoes.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; reebokworkoutlo.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; releaseadidasdata.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; rtdd.biz served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; runshoesmall.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; saldiadidas.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; scarpereebokonline.it served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; schoenenada.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; schoenenprofile.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; shoesclearancesale.org served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; showyeezy.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; skornmdadidas.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; sneakerstores.eu served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; soccerjerseys-online.co served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; soccersoccersoccer.net served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; sparta7.net served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; sport-pokret.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; stansmithportugal.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; storeadidasoutletus.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; superstarstrainers.org.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; taoki.eu served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; tenisreebokbrasil.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; topsneakers.shop served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; topyeezy.net served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; trainersoutlet.org.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; trainersoutletuk.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; trainerssale.org.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; uayeezys.co served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; ucuzadidasturkiye.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; uknewmall.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; ultraboost.org.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; ultraboost4uk.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; usadidasshops.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; vipjerseyshop.top served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; vipofficialjersey.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; vipstylejerseys.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; wholesale-soccer-jerseys168.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; wholesalejerseystoreaces.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; wrapartists.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezy--shoes.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezy-350.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezy-global.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezy-trainers.org.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezy350.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezy350sale.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezyage.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezyaustralia.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezybeast.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezybelgie.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezyboost-350.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezyboost.me served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezyboost750dk.co served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezyboostaustralia.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezybooststore.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezyforsale.club served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezyonsale.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezysaleuk.co.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezyuk.org.uk served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yeezyvipshop.us served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020; yes-yeezy.com served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Affidavit of Service, #3 Affidavit of Service)(Gaffigan, Stephen) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting #5 EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V.. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 2/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance by Unsealing #5 , #6 pursuant to #7 Order (nc) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • Docket(#18) PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing: **TIME CHANGE ONLY** Preliminary Injunction Hearing reset for 2/12/2020 01:30 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Roy K. Altman. (vve) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Reebok International Limited, Reebok International Ltd., adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V. re 12 Notice re Hearing upon Defendants via Registrar (Gaffigan, Stephen) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (pes) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Reebok International Limited, Reebok International Ltd., adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Wiborg-Rodriguez, T.) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #6 Ex Parte Motion for Alternate Service. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 1/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (cbr) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Ex Parte Application for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 2/10/2020 09:45 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Roy K. Altman. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 1/28/2020. The Clerk is directed to UNSEAL all docket entries in this case. See attached document for full details. (cbr) Modified docket text on 2/12/2020 (nc). (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) EX PARTE MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f)(3) and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Reebok International Limited, Reebok International Ltd., adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Virgilio Gigante in Support of Ex Parte Motion for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process, #3 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Virgilio Gigante) (Gigante, Virgilio) Modified by Unsealing Document per #7 Order on 2/12/2020 (nc). (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Mia Nidia Gutierrez in Support of Ex Parte Application for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #3 Declaration of Virgilio Gigante in Support of Ex Parte Application for Entry of Temporary Restraining Orderand Preliminary Injunction, #4 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Virgilio Gigante) (Gigante, Virgilio) Modified by Unsealing Document per #7 Order on 2/12/2020 (nc). (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Reebok International Limited, Reebok International Ltd., adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V. identifying Corporate Parent adidas North America, Inc. for Reebok International Ltd., adidas America, Inc. (Gigante, Virgilio) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Supplement Complaint and Exhibits Part 1, #2 Supplement Complaint and Exhibits Part 2, #3 Supplement Complaint and Exhibits Part 3) (jao) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT For Injunctive Relief And Damages against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12308139, filed by Reebok International Ltd., adidas AG, adidas International Marketing B.V., adidas America, Inc., Reebok International Limited. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the adidas Marks, #3 Exhibit 2 to the Complaint - Certificates of Registration for the Reebok Marks, #4 Exhibit 3 to the Complaint - Website Captures - Part 1, #5 Exhibit 3 to the Complaint - Website Captures - Part 2, #6 Exhibit 3 to the Complaint - Website Captures - Part 3)(Gaffigan, Stephen) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where adidas-outlet.net is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer T. Raquel Wiborg-Rodriguez