This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/15/2021 at 11:15:58 (UTC).

Adibu v. The Trustees of Purdue University

Case Summary

On 11/16/2020 Adibu filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against The Trustees of Purdue University. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Theresa L Springmann and John E Martin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00088

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Theresa L Springmann

Referral Judge

John E Martin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Florence Adibu

Defendant

The Trustees of Purdue University

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason R Ramsland

Attorney at Ramsland Law

8520 Allison Pointe Blvd Ste 223 Pmb 65298

Indianapolis, IN 46250

Defendant Attorney

Emery K Harlan

Attorney at MWH Law Group LLP - Ind/IN

8206 Rockville Rd #321

Indianapolis, IN 46214

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/4/2021 09:30 AM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due 2/26/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 1/8/2021. (smb) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Emery K Harlan on behalf of The Trustees of Purdue University (Harlan, Emery) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#4

(#4) DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED REQUEST FOR AUTOMATIC EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ITS RESPONSIVE PLEADING PURSUANT TO N.D.IND.L.R.6-1(b) by The Trustees of Purdue University . (Harlan, Emery) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R Ramsland on behalf of Florence Adibu (Ramsland, Jason) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

1 #2

Proposed Summons Proposed Summons - Purdue University

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against The Trustees of Purdue University( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4400017.), filed by Florence Adibu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons - Purdue University)(Ramsland, Jason) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/4/2021 09:30 AM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due 2/26/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 1/8/2021. (smb) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 1/8/2021. (smb) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Emery K Harlan on behalf of The Trustees of Purdue University (Harlan, Emery) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED REQUEST FOR AUTOMATIC EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ITS RESPONSIVE PLEADING PURSUANT TO N.D.IND.L.R.6-1(b) by The Trustees of Purdue University . (Harlan, Emery) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to The Trustees of Purdue University. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (bas) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketJudge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (NEW CASE) (bas) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R Ramsland on behalf of Florence Adibu (Ramsland, Jason) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against The Trustees of Purdue University( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4400017.), filed by Florence Adibu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons - Purdue University)(Ramsland, Jason) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Trustees of Purdue University is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason R Ramsland