This case was last updated from PACER on 08/13/2019 at 07:38:27 (UTC).

Adeyinka v. Barrs et al

Case Summary

On 06/14/2019 Adeyinka filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Barrs. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Youlee Yim You. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00943

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Youlee Yim You

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka

Portland, OR 97209

Defendants

Brady Barrs

Ms. Armstong

Texas Department of Justice

C. Aquilera

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Order to Show Cause #7 . Filed by Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka. (joha) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

#7

(#7) Order to Show Cause. Signed on 7/18/2019 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/18/2019.) (pvh) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

#6

(#6) Notice titled "Amendment Claim". Filed by Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka. (joha) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#5

(#5) Exhibits re Complaint #2 . Filed by Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka. (joha) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#4

(#4) Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 6/14/2019.) (joha) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#3

(#3) Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka. (joha) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka against C. Aquilera, Armstong, Brady Barrs, Texas Department of Justice (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (joha) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#1

(#1) Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka. (joha) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER: Plaintiff has filed a Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Order to Show Cause #8 . In his motion, plaintiff does not specify how much time he is seeking, but states generally that he intends to travel to Houston, Texas, to obtain documents regarding his parole and sex offender registration. As explained in the Order to Show Cause #7 , plaintiff's allegations against Texas defendants are not properly before this court. However, because plaintiff is a pro se litigant, this court grants an extension until August 15, 2019, for plaintiff to respond to the Order to Show Cause or file an amended complaint curing the defects identified in said order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/1/2019.) (pvh) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Order to Show Cause #7 . Filed by Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka. (joha) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Order to Show Cause. Signed on 7/18/2019 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/18/2019.) (pvh) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice titled "Amendment Claim". Filed by Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka. (joha) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Exhibits re Complaint #2 . Filed by Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka. (joha) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 6/14/2019.) (joha) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka. (joha) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka against C. Aquilera, Armstong, Brady Barrs, Texas Department of Justice (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (joha) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka. (joha) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.