This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/04/2023 at 08:36:10 (UTC).

Adetoro v. DriveTime Car Sales Company LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/03/2023 Adetoro filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DriveTime Car Sales Company LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David L. Horan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-00008

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David L. Horan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patrice Monique Adetoro

Defendants

Bridgecrest Acceptance Corporation

DriveTime Car Sales Company LLC doing business as DriveTime

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Scott W Self

Crystal Gee Gibson

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER: On January 3, 2023, Defendants filed a notice of removal. More than twenty-one days have passed but Plaintiff did not file a Certificate of Interested Persons. By March 10, 2023, Plaintiff must comply with Local Civil Rule 81.2 so that the Court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 2/17/2023) (mcrd) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

#13

(#13) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 6/5/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 6/5/2023. Discovery due by 7/24/2023. Deadline for mediation is on or before 7/10/2023. Motions due by 7/31/2023. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 2/14/2023) (mcrd) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

11 #4

Exhibit(s) C

11 #3

Exhibit(s) B

11 #2

Exhibit(s) A

11 #1

Affidavit(s)

#11

(#11) MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by DriveTime Car Sales Company LLC, Bridgecrest Acceptance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s), #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C) (Self, Scott) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

#10

(#10) Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Scheduling Plan filed by Plaintiff and filed by DriveTime Car Sales Company LLC, Bridgecrest Acceptance Corporation. (Self, Scott) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Serving Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure filed by DriveTime Car Sales Company LLC, Bridgecrest Acceptance Corporation (Gibson, Crystal) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

#8

(#8) ORDER REQUIRING CONFERENCE AND JOINT STATUS REPORT: Plaintiff and Defendant's counsel shall confer in person or by telephone not later than January 19, 2023. The parties shall file a joint status report and proposed scheduling plan by February 9, 2023. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 1/5/2023) (mcrd) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

#7

(#7) STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY AND OTHER NON-DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 1/5/2023) (mcrd) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

#4

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (mlb) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#5

(#5) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter or electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mlb) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint filed by DriveTime Car Sales Company LLC, Bridgecrest Acceptance Corporation. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Self, Scott) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DriveTime Car Sales Company LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Self, Scott) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

1 #10

Exhibit(s)

1 #7

Exhibit(s)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2023
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 14. Fri Feb 17 14:20:34 CST 2023 (crt) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER: On January 3, 2023, Defendants filed a notice of removal. More than twenty-one days have passed but Plaintiff did not file a Certificate of Interested Persons. By March 10, 2023, Plaintiff must comply with Local Civil Rule 81.2 so that the Court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 2/17/2023) (mcrd) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 13. Tue Feb 14 15:40:15 CST 2023 (crt) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 6/5/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 6/5/2023. Discovery due by 7/24/2023. Deadline for mediation is on or before 7/10/2023. Motions due by 7/31/2023. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 2/14/2023) (mcrd) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:12. Mon Feb 13 16:14:18 CST 2023 (crt) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • Docket(#12) ELECTRONIC ORDER OF TRANSFER TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE - Before the Court is the Parties' Joint Status Report, filed on February 9, 2023. It appears the parties have consented in writing to trial of this case before a United States Magistrate Judge in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c). It is therefore ORDERED by the Court that this case be, and it is hereby TRANSFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge David L. Horan entry of judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c), with any appeal therefrom to be taken to the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(3). to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by all parties and Order Reassigning Case. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David L. Horan for all further proceedings. Judge Ed Kinkeade no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 2/13/2023) (chmb) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by DriveTime Car Sales Company LLC, Bridgecrest Acceptance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s), #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C) (Self, Scott) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Scheduling Plan filed by Plaintiff and filed by DriveTime Car Sales Company LLC, Bridgecrest Acceptance Corporation. (Self, Scott) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Serving Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure filed by DriveTime Car Sales Company LLC, Bridgecrest Acceptance Corporation (Gibson, Crystal) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 7, 8. Thu Jan 5 15:58:55 CST 2023 (crt) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REQUIRING CONFERENCE AND JOINT STATUS REPORT: Plaintiff and Defendant's counsel shall confer in person or by telephone not later than January 19, 2023. The parties shall file a joint status report and proposed scheduling plan by February 9, 2023. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 1/5/2023) (mcrd) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY AND OTHER NON-DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 1/5/2023) (mcrd) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) (Document Restricted) Defendants' Counsels' Cell Phone Numbers (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by DriveTime Car Sales Company LLC, Bridgecrest Acceptance Corporation (Self, Scott) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (mlb) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter or electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mlb) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint filed by DriveTime Car Sales Company LLC, Bridgecrest Acceptance Corporation. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Self, Scott) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DriveTime Car Sales Company LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Self, Scott) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by DriveTime Car Sales Company LLC. (Filing fee $402; receipt number ATXNDC-13411178) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s)) (Self, Scott) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less