This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 08:21:10 (UTC).

Adetola v. Barclays Bank Delaware

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 Adetola filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Barclays Bank Delaware. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael L. Brown and Catherine M. Salinas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05648

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael L. Brown

Referral Judge

Catherine M. Salinas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kola Adetola

Loganville, GA 30023

Defendant

Barclays Bank Delaware

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING that the -5647 Action, -5648 Action, -5649 Action, and -5650 Action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for noncompliance with a lawful court order. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b); LR 41.3(A)(2), NDGa. See also Hickman v. Hickman, 563 F. Appx 742, 744 (11th Cir. 2014). Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 1/21/2020. (jta) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER for Service of #4 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 1/21/2020. (jta) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#2

(#2) ORDER Granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If Plaintiff wishes to pursue this civil action in federal court, he must file an amended complaint no later than Friday, January 10, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 12/19/19. (bjh) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

3 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT filed by Kola Adetola. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bjh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/19/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kola Adetola re #5 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation,. (jta) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER for Service of #4 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 1/21/2020. (jta) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kola Adetola re #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Complaint, filed by Kola Adetola. (jta) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING that the -5647 Action, -5648 Action, -5649 Action, and -5650 Action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for noncompliance with a lawful court order. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b); LR 41.3(A)(2), NDGa. See also Hickman v. Hickman, 563 F. Appx 742, 744 (11th Cir. 2014). Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 1/21/2020. (jta) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #2 Order directing an amended complaint to be filed by 1/10/2020, to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (bjh) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT filed by Kola Adetola. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bjh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kola Adetola re #2 Order. (bjh) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER Granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If Plaintiff wishes to pursue this civil action in federal court, he must file an amended complaint no later than Friday, January 10, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 12/19/19. (bjh) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (NOS, COA Changed) (aar) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (dmb) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kola Adetola. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmb) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.