This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/29/2020 at 08:01:44 (UTC).

Ademola v. Estee Lauder, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/31/2019 Ademola filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Estee Lauder, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph C. Spero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-08473

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph C. Spero

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Ademola

Defendant

Estee Lauder, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Yosef Peretz

Attorney at Peretz & Associates

22 Battery Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94111

Shane Dennis Howarter

Attorney at Peretz & Associates

22 Battery Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorneys

Donald Patrick Sullivan

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

50 California Street, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4615

Atticus Shouyu Lee

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

50 California Street, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4615

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet

#2

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Certificate of Interested Entities by Estee Lauder, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Estee Lauder Companies Inc. for Estee Lauder, Inc.. (Sullivan, Donald) (Filed on 2/18/2020) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Estee Lauder, Inc.. (Sullivan, Donald) (Filed on 2/18/2020) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Estee Lauder, Inc... (Lee, Atticus) (Filed on 2/4/2020) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Estee Lauder shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 2/10/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2020) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER GRANTING re #9 Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant Estee Lauder to Respond to Complaint filed by Estee Lauder, Inc.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/27/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2020) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant Estee Lauder, Inc. to Respond to Complaint filed by Estee Lauder, Inc.. (Sullivan, Donald) (Filed on 1/23/2020) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Ademola (Peretz, Yosef) (Filed on 1/14/2020) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by John Ademola.. (Peretz, Yosef) (Filed on 1/3/2020) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Estee Lauder, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/27/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/3/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED Civil Cover Sheet by John Ademola. (Peretz, Yosef) (Filed on 1/2/2020) Modified on 1/2/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Case has been randomly assigned to judge, however incorrect Civil Cover Sheet JS 44 (Rev. 08/18) used at case opening. Please complete and re-file as a se parate docket entry current Civil Cover Sheet JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 07/19) Re: #1 . #1 Complaint filed by John Ademola (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/14/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2019) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Peretz, Yosef) (Filed on 12/31/2019) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Demand for a Jury Trial against Estee Lauder, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-14028438.). Filed by John Ademola. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Peretz, Yosef) (Filed on 12/31/2019) Modified on 1/2/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE ESTEE LAUDER COMPANIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Yosef Peretz