This case was last updated from PACER on 04/04/2021 at 08:04:41 (UTC).

ADDISON v. WELLPATH

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 ADDISON filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against WELLPATH. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maureen P. Kelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00168

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maureen P. Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAYMEL ADDISON

Defendants

WELLPATH

CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John F. Mizner

Attorney at Mizner Firm

311 West Sixth Street

Erie, PA 16507

Defendant Attorneys

Samuel H. Foreman

Attorney at Weber Gallagher Simpson Stapleton Fires & Newby

4 Ppg Place, 5Th Floor, Two Gateway Center

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Benjamin M. Lombard

Attorney at Weber Gallagher Simpson Stapleton Fires & Newby LLP

4 Ppg Place, 5Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#13

RESTRICTED

#12

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/15/2021. (Court Reporter: none) (et) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WELLPATH. WELLPATH waiver sent on 2/4/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. (Foreman, Samuel) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel H. Foreman on behalf of WELLPATH. (Foreman, Samuel) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin M. Lombard on behalf of WELLPATH. (Lombard, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Merit as to Wellpath by John F. Mizner on behalf of RAYMEL ADDISON (Mizner, John) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

3 #1

Exhibit

#3

(#3) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by RAYMEL ADDISON. WELLPATH served on 2/8/2021, answer due 3/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Mizner, John) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to WELLPATH (ma) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against WELLPATH (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6306568), filed by RAYMEL ADDISON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by WELLPATH. (Lombard, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by RAYMEL ADDISON. (Mizner, John) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • Docket(#11) TEXT ORDER: In accordance with the case management system in place in this district, this case has been assigned to the undersigned for all pretrial matters. Therefore, it is ORDERED that on or before 4/5/2021, the parties shall complete an election form either consenting to jurisdiction by the Magistrate Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned to the case, and shall file the form with the Clerk's Office. A copy of the form can be found on this Court's website at: http://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Consent-to-Mag.pdf. Consent to Jurisdiction by Mag. Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned due by 4/5/2021; Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 3/15/2021. (et) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/15/2021. (Court Reporter: none) (et) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/15/2021 at 09:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 3/3/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (et) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WELLPATH. WELLPATH waiver sent on 2/4/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. (Foreman, Samuel) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel H. Foreman on behalf of WELLPATH. (Foreman, Samuel) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin M. Lombard on behalf of WELLPATH. (Lombard, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Merit as to Wellpath by John F. Mizner on behalf of RAYMEL ADDISON (Mizner, John) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by RAYMEL ADDISON. WELLPATH served on 2/8/2021, answer due 3/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Mizner, John) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to WELLPATH (ma) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against WELLPATH (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6306568), filed by RAYMEL ADDISON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wellpath LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS LLC is a litigant