This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/26/2020 at 11:44:02 (UTC).

Addison et al v. American Family Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/27/2020 Addison filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against American Family Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are William J. Martinez and Gordon P. Gallagher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02607

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William J. Martinez

Referral Judge

Gordon P. Gallagher

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Melissa Addison

Beau Addison

Defendant

American Family Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joshua Ty Hotchkiss

Attorney at Franklin D. Azar & Associates PC-Aurora

14426 East Evans Avenue

Aurora, CO 80014-1474

Elisabeth L. Owen

Attorney at Franklin D. Azar & Associates PC-Aurora

14426 East Evans Avenue

Aurora, CO 80014-1474

Defendant Attorneys

Sandy Marie Eloranto

Attorney at Sutton Booker P.C.

4949 South Syracuse Street, Suite 500

Denver, CO 80237

Lily E. Nierenberg

Attorney at Sutton Booker P.C.

4949 South Syracuse Street, Suite 500

Denver, CO 80237

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) NOTICE of designation pursuant to C.R.S. 13-21-111.5 by Defendant American Family Insurance Company (Nierenberg, Lily) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lily E. Nierenberg on behalf of American Family Insurance CompanyAttorney Lily E. Nierenberg added to party American Family Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Nierenberg, Lily) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#18

(#18) ANSWER to #4 Complaint by American Family Insurance Company.(Eloranto, Sandy) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#14

(#14) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Defendant American Family Insurance Company. (Eloranto, Sandy) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#4

(#18) ANSWER to #4 Complaint by American Family Insurance Company.(Eloranto, Sandy) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Eloranto, Sandy) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

1 #11

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Family Insurance Company from Mesa County 21st Judicial District, Case Number 2020CV30192. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7459173), filed by American Family Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Eloranto, Sandy) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of designation pursuant to C.R.S. 13-21-111.5 by Defendant American Family Insurance Company (Nierenberg, Lily) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lily E. Nierenberg on behalf of American Family Insurance CompanyAttorney Lily E. Nierenberg added to party American Family Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Nierenberg, Lily) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ANSWER to #4 Complaint by American Family Insurance Company.(Eloranto, Sandy) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond : American Family is granted two additional weeks, through and including September 17, 2020, to Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/15/20. Text Only Entry(GPG) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • Docket(#16) ORDER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/3/2020 10:30 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Please provide proposed Scheduling Order one week in advance. At the time of the hearing please call 888-363-4749, Access code 3136546#. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on September 4, 2020. Text Only Entry (gpgsec, ) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MEMORANDUM regarding #14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by American Family Insurance Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/3/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Defendant American Family Insurance Company. (Eloranto, Sandy) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • Docket(#13) ORDER: This matter has its factual nexus in Mesa County. According to the Court's Revised Jury Plan for Random Jury Selection, this case is therefore properly designated for Jury Division 3. Because the jury will be drawn from that Division, it is appropriate that the case be managed, for pretrial purposes, by Magistrate Judge Gallagher in Grand Junction. Accordingly, pursuant to D.C. Colo. L. Civ. R. 40.1(a), and as approved by the Chief Judge of the Court, the undersigned directs that the Clerk of the Court reassign this action to Magistrate Judge Gallagher as the referral judge. All further pleadings in this case shall reflect the case number of 20-cv-2607-WJM-GPG.SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/2/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • Docket(#12) ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2019 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/ 2/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • Docket(#11) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Magistrate Judge Wang, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/2/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Elisabeth L. Owen on behalf of Beau Addison, Melissa AddisonAttorney Elisabeth L. Owen added to party Beau Addison(pty:pla), Attorney Elisabeth L. Owen added to party Melissa Addison(pty:pla) (Owen, Elisabeth) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joshua Ty Hotchkiss on behalf of Beau Addison, Melissa AddisonAttorney Joshua Ty Hotchkiss added to party Beau Addison(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua Ty Hotchkiss added to party Melissa Addison(pty:pla) (Hotchkiss, Joshua) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jtorr, ) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • Docket(#7) Case assigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATE COURT ORDER Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. By Matthew David Barrett, Mesa County District Court Judge on 08/19/2020. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, CCCS and Summons upon American Family Insurance Company on 07/28/2020. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT for Damages and Jury Demand against American Family Insurance Company, filed by Melissa Addison, Beau Addison.(jtorr, ) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • Docket(#3) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Eloranto, Sandy) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Family Insurance Company from Mesa County 21st Judicial District, Case Number 2020CV30192. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7459173), filed by American Family Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Eloranto, Sandy) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Family Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sandy Marie Eloranto

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lily E. Nierenberg