This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/03/2020 at 12:06:53 (UTC).

ADCARE HOSPITAL - WORCESTER et al v. AZAR II

Case Summary

On 11/19/2019 ADCARE HOSPITAL - WORCESTER filed a Government Benefit - Medicare lawsuit against AZAR II. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03484

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Medicare

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colleen Kollar-Kotelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMITA HEALTH ALEXIAN BROTHERS MEDICAL CENTER ELK GROVE VILLAGE

ADVOCATE LUTHERAN GENERAL HOSPITAL

AMITA HEALTH SAINT ALEXIUS MEDICAL CENTER HOFFMAN ESTATES

AMITA HEALTH SAINT FRANCIS HOSPITAL EVANSTON

AURORA LAKELAND MEDICAL CENTER

ALLIANCE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

AULTMAN HOSPITAL

ASCENSION BRIGHTON CENTER FOR RECOVERY

ANMED HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER

ADVOCATE BROMENN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

ASPIRUS RIVERVIEW HOSPITAL

ASANTE ASHLAND COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

ASCENSION COLUMBIA SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL OZAUKEE

ASCENSION MACOMB-OAKLAND HOSPITAL, WARREN CAMPUS

ADVOCATE TRINITY HOSPITAL

ASCENSION ALL SAINTS HOSPITAL

ASANTE THREE RIVERS MEDICAL CENTER

ASCENSION PROVIDENCE HOSPITAL, SOUTHFIELD CAMPUS

ASCENSION RIVER DISTRICT HOSPITAL

ASCENSION GENESYS HOSPITAL

33 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sara Jean MacCarthy

Attorney at HALL RENDER KILLIAN HEATH & LYMAN, P.C.

330 E. Kilbourn Avenue, Suite 1250

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Other Attorneys

Liam Holland

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

1100 L Street Nw, Room 11318

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#9

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

#7

#6

#5

4 #1

Notice and Consent

#4

#3

#2

1 #8

Summons to US District Atty DC

1 #7

Summons to US Atty General

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Errata 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1-14-2020. (lcckk3) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Holland, Liam) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Liam Holland on behalf of All Defendants (Holland, Liam) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 12/4/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/2/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/11/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/9/2020.) (MacCarthy, Sara) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/25/19. (DM) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zmc) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 18cv867. (MacCarthy, Sara) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ADCARE HOSPITAL - WORCESTER, ADENA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE BROMENN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE CHRIST MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE CONDELL MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE GOOD SHEPHERD HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE ILLINOIS MASONIC MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE LUTHERAN GENERAL HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE SHERMAN HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE SOUTH SUBURBAN HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE TRINITY HOSPITAL, ALAMANCE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ALLEGHENY GENERAL HOSPITAL, ALLEGHENY VALLEY HOSPITAL, ALLIANCE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, AMITA HEALTH ALEXIAN BROTHERS MEDICAL CENTER ELK GROVE VILLAGE, AMITA HEALTH SAINT ALEXIUS MEDICAL CENTER HOFFMAN ESTATES, AMITA HEALTH SAINT FRANCIS HOSPITAL EVANSTON, AMITA HEALTH SAINT JOSEPH HOSPITAL ELGIN, ANDERSON HOSPITAL, ANDERSON REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER NORTH, ANMED HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER, ASANTE ASHLAND COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ASANTE ROGUE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ASANTE THREE RIVERS MEDICAL CENTER, ASCENSION ALL SAINTS HOSPITAL, ASCENSION BRIGHTON CENTER FOR RECOVERY, ASCENSION COLUMBIA SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL MILWAUKEE, ASCENSION COLUMBIA SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL OZAUKEE, ASCENSION CRITTENTON HOSPITAL, ASCENSION GENESYS HOSPITAL, ASCENSION MACOMB-OAKLAND HOSPITAL, WARREN CAMPUS, ASCENSION NORTH EAST WISCONSIN - MERCY CAMPUS, ASCENSION NORTHEAST WISCONSIN SAINT ELIZABETH CAMPUS, ASCENSION PROVIDENCE HOSPITAL, SOUTHFIELD CAMPUS, ASCENSION RIVER DISTRICT HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SAINT CLARE'S HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SAINT JOHN HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SAINT MICHAEL'S HOSPITAL, ASPIRUS RIVERVIEW HOSPITAL, ASPIRUS WAUSAU HOSPITAL, ATHENS-LIMESTONE HOSPITAL, ATMORE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ATRIUM MEDICAL CENTER, AULTMAN HOSPITAL, AURORA BAYCARE MEDICAL CENTER, AURORA LAKELAND MEDICAL CENTER, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER GRAFTON, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER IN SUMMIT (MacCarthy, Sara) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6575339) filed by ASCENSION MACOMB-OAKLAND HOSPITAL, WARREN CAMPUS, ASCENSION GENESYS HOSPITAL, ANDERSON HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE GOOD SHEPHERD HOSPITAL, ASANTE THREE RIVERS MEDICAL CENTER, AMITA HEALTH ALEXIAN BROTHERS MEDICAL CENTER ELK GROVE VILLAGE, ADENA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ADCARE HOSPITAL - WORCESTER, AMITA HEALTH SAINT ALEXIUS MEDICAL CENTER HOFFMAN ESTATES, ASCENSION COLUMBIA SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL OZAUKEE, ALLIANCE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ATMORE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ASCENSION ALL SAINTS HOSPITAL, ASANTE ROGUE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ASCENSION BRIGHTON CENTER FOR RECOVERY, ASCENSION SAINT MICHAEL'S HOSPITAL, AMITA HEALTH SAINT JOSEPH HOSPITAL ELGIN, ALLEGHENY GENERAL HOSPITAL, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER GRAFTON, ASANTE ASHLAND COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE SHERMAN HOSPITAL, ASCENSION CRITTENTON HOSPITAL, ASCENSION NORTHEAST WISCONSIN SAINT ELIZABETH CAMPUS, ADVOCATE SOUTH SUBURBAN HOSPITAL, AURORA LAKELAND MEDICAL CENTER, ASPIRUS WAUSAU HOSPITAL, ANDERSON REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER NORTH, AULTMAN HOSPITAL, ALAMANCE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ANMED HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER, ASCENSION COLUMBIA SAINT MARY'S HOSPITAL MILWAUKEE, ADVOCATE GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, AURORA MEDICAL CENTER IN SUMMIT, ASCENSION SAINT JOHN HOSPITAL, ASCENSION PROVIDENCE HOSPITAL, SOUTHFIELD CAMPUS, ADVOCATE BROMENN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE LUTHERAN GENERAL HOSPITAL, ASPIRUS RIVERVIEW HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE TRINITY HOSPITAL, AURORA BAYCARE MEDICAL CENTER, ALLEGHENY VALLEY HOSPITAL, ASCENSION SAINT CLARE'S HOSPITAL, ADVOCATE ILLINOIS MASONIC MEDICAL CENTER, ADVOCATE CHRIST MEDICAL CENTER, ASCENSION NORTH EAST WISCONSIN - MERCY CAMPUS, ATRIUM MEDICAL CENTER, ASCENSION RIVER DISTRICT HOSPITAL, ATHENS-LIMESTONE HOSPITAL, AMITA HEALTH SAINT FRANCIS HOSPITAL EVANSTON, ADVOCATE CONDELL MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Errata 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons to Alex M Azar II, #7 Summons to US Atty General, #8 Summons to US District Atty DC)(MacCarthy, Sara) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIANCE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where ASCENSION GENESYS HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where ASANTE ASHLAND COMMUNITY HOSPITAL is a litigant