This case was last updated from PACER on 01/20/2020 at 08:46:28 (UTC).

Adamson v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 11/21/2019 Adamson filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner, Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard W. Story and J. Clay Fuller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00268

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard W. Story

Referral Judge

J. Clay Fuller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael S. Adamson

Defendant

Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Vincent Hogan

Attorney at The Law Office of John V. Hogan

3465-B Lawrenceville-Suwanee Road

Suwanee, GA 30024

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the Complaint as of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for Plaintiff is to perform service of process in accordance with FED. R. CIV. P. 4(i). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 11/22/2019. (dgr) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Return of Service Executed by Michael S. Adamson. Commissioner, Social Security Administration served on 12/5/2019, answer due 3/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit certified mail return receipts)(Hogan, John) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons US Attorney, #2 Summons Attorney General)(dgr) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT filed by Michael S. Adamson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dgr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the Complaint as of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for Plaintiff is to perform service of process in accordance with FED. R. CIV. P. 4(i). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 11/22/2019. (dgr) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (dgr) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael S. Adamson. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application, #2 Proposed Complaint, #3 Proposed Summons Commissioner, #4 Proposed Summons US Attorney, #5 Proposed Summons Attorney General, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(dgr) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.