This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:49:46 (UTC).

Adams v. Way et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Adams filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Way. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shiva V Hodges and Donald C Coggins, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01446

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Shiva V Hodges

Presiding Judge

Donald C Coggins, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patrick Adams

Defendants

Deresh T. Perez

Tammy L. Barbour

Duane Birchmore

Charles F. Way

Angela Stewart

Lisa S. Lawson

Cekethia A. White

Freddie D. Haubner

Shereeka Shonte Rogers

Anita J. Kimsey

Judy C. Calvert

Tracy A. Fowler

Roselyn Hobbs

Deborah C. Parks

Brandon G. Weaver

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charles William Hinnant, Jr

Attorney at Medicolegal Consultants

112 Essex Drive

Anderson, SC 29621

Defendant Attorney

Christopher R Antley

Attorney at Devlin and Parkinson

Po Box 10387

Greenville, SC 29603-0387

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Pramod Reddy Ganta, MD re #1 Complaint Exhibit 1 by Patrick Adams. (Hinnant, Charles) (Main Document 8 replaced on 7/12/2019 with corrected document submitted by filing user.) (lbak) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#7

(#7) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Tammy L. Barbour, Judy C. Calvert, Tracy A. Fowler, Freddie D. Haubner, Roselyn Hobbs, Lisa S. Lawson, Deborah C. Parks, Shereeka Shonte Rogers, Charles F. Way, Brandon G. Weaver.(Antley, Christopher) (Main Document 7 replaced on 6/21/2019 with corrected document submitted by filing user.) (lbak) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Tammy L. Barbour, Judy C. Calvert, Tracy A. Fowler, Freddie D. Haubner, Roselyn Hobbs, Lisa S. Lawson, Deborah C. Parks, Shereeka Shonte Rogers, Charles F. Way, Brandon G. Weaver.(Antley, Christopher) (Main Document 6 replaced on 6/21/2019 with corrected document submitted by filing user.) (lbak) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R Antley on behalf of Tammy L. Barbour, Judy C. Calvert, Tracy A. Fowler, Freddie D. Haubner, Roselyn Hobbs, Lisa S. Lawson, Deborah C. Parks, Shereeka Shonte Rogers, Charles F. Way, Brandon G. Weaver (Antley, Christopher) (Main Document 5 replaced on 6/21/2019 with corrected document submitted by filing user.) (lbak) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (lbak) (Main Document 4 replaced on 5/20/2019) (lbak, ). Modified on 5/20/2019 with corrected scan of document. (lbak) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Patrick Adams. (lbak) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8450405.), filed by Patrick Adams. Service due by 8/15/2019 (lbak) Affidavit added on 7/10/2019 at #8 . (lbak) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AFFIDAVIT of Pramod Reddy Ganta, MD re #1 Complaint Exhibit 1 by Patrick Adams. (Hinnant, Charles) (Main Document 8 replaced on 7/12/2019 with corrected document submitted by filing user.) (lbak) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Tammy L. Barbour, Judy C. Calvert, Tracy A. Fowler, Freddie D. Haubner, Roselyn Hobbs, Lisa S. Lawson, Deborah C. Parks, Shereeka Shonte Rogers, Charles F. Way, Brandon G. Weaver.(Antley, Christopher) (Main Document 7 replaced on 6/21/2019 with corrected document submitted by filing user.) (lbak) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Tammy L. Barbour, Judy C. Calvert, Tracy A. Fowler, Freddie D. Haubner, Roselyn Hobbs, Lisa S. Lawson, Deborah C. Parks, Shereeka Shonte Rogers, Charles F. Way, Brandon G. Weaver.(Antley, Christopher) (Main Document 6 replaced on 6/21/2019 with corrected document submitted by filing user.) (lbak) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R Antley on behalf of Tammy L. Barbour, Judy C. Calvert, Tracy A. Fowler, Freddie D. Haubner, Roselyn Hobbs, Lisa S. Lawson, Deborah C. Parks, Shereeka Shonte Rogers, Charles F. Way, Brandon G. Weaver (Antley, Christopher) (Main Document 5 replaced on 6/21/2019 with corrected document submitted by filing user.) (lbak) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (lbak) (Main Document 4 replaced on 5/20/2019) (lbak, ). Modified on 5/20/2019 with corrected scan of document. (lbak) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Patrick Adams. (lbak) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8450405.), filed by Patrick Adams. Service due by 8/15/2019 (lbak) Affidavit added on 7/10/2019 at #8 . (lbak) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.