This case was last updated from PACER on 03/13/2020 at 07:41:04 (UTC).

Adams v. Symetra Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 Adams filed an Other lawsuit against Symetra Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Raner C Collins. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-MC-00001

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raner C Collins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Adams

Defendant

Symetra Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anthony John Nardone

Attorney at Zebrowski Law

45952 Schoenherr

Shelby Township, MI 48315

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDERED: The Clerk of Court shall docket all documents filed in this case in Case Number CV-18-00378-JGZ (LAB) and close the instant case. The pending Motion to Compel MLS Group of Companies, LLCs Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum (Doc. 1) is referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie A. Bowman. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 1/15/2020. (BAR) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#6

(#6) Miscellaneous Document: Notice to the Eastern District of Michigan advising of receipt of 2:19-mc-51806 case transferred. (DLC) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#5

(#5) This case has been assigned to the Honorable. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: MC-20-00001-TUC-RCC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

4 #1

*Restricted*

#4

(#4) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Michigan Eastern; Case Number 2:19-mc-51806 . Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO TRANSFERMOTION TO COMPEL MLS GROUP OFCOMPANIES, LLCS COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM (ECF NO. 1) TO DISTRICT OF ARIZONA [#2]. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (SSch) [Transferred from mied on 1/13/2020.] (Entered: 01/07/2020)

2 #1

Exhibit

#2

(#2) MOTION transfer to USDC of Arizona by Robert Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Nardone, Anthony) [Transferred from mied on 1/13/2020.] (Entered: 12/20/2019)

1 #6

Exhibit Defendants Expert Disclosure Statement

1 #5

Exhibit August 14, 2019 correspondence from Spencer G. Scharff, Esq

1 #4

Exhibit August 6, 2019 email from Spencer Scharff, Esq.

1 #3

Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Vikram Garg, M.D.

1 #2

Exhibit Pages from report of Vikram Garg, M.D.

1 #1

Exhibit Pages from report of Frank Polanco, M.D.

#1

(#1) INITIATING MOTION Compel Compliance with Subpoena by All Plaintiffs. Receipt No: 0645-7524772 - Fee: 47 dollars (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pages from report of Frank Polanco, M.D., #2 Exhibit Pages from report of Vikram Garg, M.D., #3 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Vikram Garg, M.D., #4 Exhibit August 6, 2019 email from Spencer Scharff, Esq., #5 Exhibit August 14, 2019 correspondence from Spencer G. Scharff, Esq, #6 Exhibit Defendants Expert Disclosure Statement) (Nardone, Anthony) [Transferred from mied on 1/13/2020.] *Modified on 1/13/2020 to add motion event (DLC). (Entered: 12/13/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDERED: The Clerk of Court shall docket all documents filed in this case in Case Number CV-18-00378-JGZ (LAB) and close the instant case. The pending Motion to Compel MLS Group of Companies, LLCs Compliance with Subpoena Duces Tecum (Doc. 1) is referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie A. Bowman. Signed by Senior Judge Raner C Collins on 1/15/2020. (BAR) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Miscellaneous Document: Notice to the Eastern District of Michigan advising of receipt of 2:19-mc-51806 case transferred. (DLC) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) This case has been assigned to the Honorable. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: MC-20-00001-TUC-RCC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Michigan Eastern; Case Number 2:19-mc-51806 . Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO TRANSFERMOTION TO COMPEL MLS GROUP OFCOMPANIES, LLCS COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM (ECF NO. 1) TO DISTRICT OF ARIZONA [#2]. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (SSch) [Transferred from mied on 1/13/2020.] (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION transfer to USDC of Arizona by Robert Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Nardone, Anthony) [Transferred from mied on 1/13/2020.] (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) INITIATING MOTION Compel Compliance with Subpoena by All Plaintiffs. Receipt No: 0645-7524772 - Fee: 47 dollars (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pages from report of Frank Polanco, M.D., #2 Exhibit Pages from report of Vikram Garg, M.D., #3 Exhibit Excerpts from deposition of Vikram Garg, M.D., #4 Exhibit August 6, 2019 email from Spencer Scharff, Esq., #5 Exhibit August 14, 2019 correspondence from Spencer G. Scharff, Esq, #6 Exhibit Defendants Expert Disclosure Statement) (Nardone, Anthony) [Transferred from mied on 1/13/2020.] *Modified on 1/13/2020 to add motion event (DLC). (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.