Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/13/2020 at 08:36:10 (UTC).

ADAMS v. MANN

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 ADAMS filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against MANN. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is CLAY D LAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00030

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CLAY D LAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SHERMAN ADAMS

Columbus, GA 31902

SHERMAN ADAMS, JR

Columbus, GA 31902

Defendants

JASON MANN

DELBERT MONTGOMERY

DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY AND CHILDREN SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

SALLY N DILLS

600 Brookstone Centre Pkwy

Columbus, GA 31904

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SHERMAN ADAMS, JR. as to JASON MANN (esl) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

#16

(#16) USM 285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for JASON MANN (esl) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

#15

(#15) AMENDED #1 Complaint, against DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY AND CHILDREN SERVICES, JASON MANN, DELBERT MONTGOMERY by SHERMAN ADAMS, JR (esl) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #12 Motion to Amend Complaint; denying #13 Motion for Reconsideration re #4 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint by March 24, 2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 3/6/2020. (ggs) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#13

(#13) MOTION for Reconsideration (RESPONSE in Opposition construed as a motion) re #4 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel (esl) Modified on 3/6/2020 (ggs). (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#12

(#12) MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, #7 Amended Complaint/Petition Filed by SHERMAN ADAMS, JR.(esl) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 2-18-20 (jdl) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

1 #10

Copy of Envelope for DFCS

1 #9

Legal Research

1 #8

Letter from Georgia Legal Services

1 #7

Client/Case Notes

1 #6

Letter to Mr. Neal

1 #5

Medication List

1 #4

Criminal History

1 #3

Apartment Rental Contract

1 #2

Food Stamp Eligibility Notice

1 #1

SSI Notice of Payment

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against JASON MANN - filed by SHERMAN ADAMS. (Attachments: #1 SSI Notice of Payment, #2 Food Stamp Eligibility Notice, #3 Apartment Rental Contract, #4 Criminal History, #5 Medication List, #6 Letter to Mr. Neal, #7 Client/Case Notes, #8 Letter from Georgia Legal Services, #9 Legal Research, #10 Copy of Envelope for DFCS)(tlp) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SHERMAN ADAMS, JR. as to JASON MANN (esl) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) USM 285 Process Receipt and Return EXECUTED for JASON MANN (esl) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) AMENDED #1 Complaint, against DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY AND CHILDREN SERVICES, JASON MANN, DELBERT MONTGOMERY by SHERMAN ADAMS, JR (esl) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #12 Motion to Amend Complaint; denying #13 Motion for Reconsideration re #4 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint by March 24, 2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 3/6/2020. (ggs) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Reconsideration (RESPONSE in Opposition construed as a motion) re #4 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel (esl) Modified on 3/6/2020 (ggs). (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, #7 Amended Complaint/Petition Filed by SHERMAN ADAMS, JR.(esl) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) USM 285 Process Receipt and Return MAILED for DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY AND CHILDREN SERVICES, JASON MANN, DELBERT MONTGOMERY (esl) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) USM 285 Process Receipt and Return ISSUED for DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY AND CHILDREN SERVICES (esl) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) USM 285 Process Receipt and Return ISSUED for DELBERT MONTGOMERY (esl) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) USM 285 Process Receipt and Return ISSUED for JASON MANN (esl) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing service by USMS. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 2-18-20. (jdl) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 2-18-20 (jdl) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFERRED #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and #2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel to US Magistrate Judge STEPHEN HYLES (tlf). (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, against DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY AND CHILDREN SERVICES, JASON MANN, DELBERT MONTGOMERY - filed by SHERMAN ADAMS, JR (tlp) Modified on 2/19/2020 (esl). (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint - Filed by SHERMAN ADAMS, JR.(tlp) (Main Document 6 replaced on 2/19/2020) (ans). (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - Filed by SHERMAN ADAMS. (Attachments: #1 Miscellaneous Page - Blank)(tlp) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Appoint Counsel - Filed by SHERMAN ADAMS, JR.(tlp) Modified on 2/20/2020 (esl). (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against JASON MANN - filed by SHERMAN ADAMS. (Attachments: #1 SSI Notice of Payment, #2 Food Stamp Eligibility Notice, #3 Apartment Rental Contract, #4 Criminal History, #5 Medication List, #6 Letter to Mr. Neal, #7 Client/Case Notes, #8 Letter from Georgia Legal Services, #9 Legal Research, #10 Copy of Envelope for DFCS)(tlp) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less