This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 10:28:52 (UTC).

Adams v. Gomez

Case Summary

On 03/25/2019 Adams filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Gomez. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert W. Trumble and Gina M. Groh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00043

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Robert W. Trumble

Presiding Judge

Gina M. Groh

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Deontrayvia Adams

Glenville, WV 26351

Respondent

C. Gomez

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) RETURN RECEIPT as to #9 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 06/10/2019. (cwm) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 06/06/2019. Copy mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/6/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm). (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#7

(#7) LETTER from C. Mullen - Deputy Clerk to Deborah F. Moore re: returning personal check sent in for petitioner's filing fee. (cwm) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

5 #2

Certified Mail Return Receipt

5 #1

Court-Approved Form

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachment: #1 Court-Approved Forms) Notice and forms mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/25/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm). (Entered: 03/25/2019)

4 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Original notice mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/25/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm). (Entered: 03/25/2019)

3 #1

Envelope

#3

(#3) LETTER from Deontrayvia Adams to Clerk regarding filings. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

2 #1

Envelope

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Memorandum of Law

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against C. Gomez, filed by Deontrayvia Adams. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, and #2 Envelope) Magistrate Judge Robert Trumble and PSLC B. Sims assigned. (cwm) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RETURN RECEIPT as to #9 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 06/10/2019. (cwm) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 06/06/2019. Copy mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/6/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm). (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Habeas Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number WVNM001485 (cmd) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) LETTER from C. Mullen - Deputy Clerk to Deborah F. Moore re: returning personal check sent in for petitioner's filing fee. (cwm) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING and #4 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 03/29/2019. (cwm) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachment: #1 Court-Approved Forms) Notice and forms mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/25/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm). (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Original notice mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/25/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm). (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) LETTER from Deontrayvia Adams to Clerk regarding filings. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Extend Limit Pursuant to 28 USC 2241 Petition to Inlcude a Memorandum of Law in Support by Deontrayvia Adams. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against C. Gomez, filed by Deontrayvia Adams. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, and #2 Envelope) Magistrate Judge Robert Trumble and PSLC B. Sims assigned. (cwm) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.